FELTON v. WETZEL et al
Petitioner: STEVEN FELTON
Respondent: JOHN WETZEL, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 5:2022cv01014
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAMELA A CARLOS
Referring Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, with Certificate of Service, by THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH. (GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY (ECF 11), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 4/19/22.4/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER AND E-MAILED.(er)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 PERMISSION TO FILE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY filed by STEVEN FELTON.Motions referred to PAMELA A. CARLOS.(bw)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of LEHIGH COUNTY County. (Attachments: #1 STEVEN FELTON RECORD, #2 TRANSCRIPT 8-4-15, #3 TRANSCRIPT 8-5-15, #4 TRANSCRIPT 8-6-15, #5 TRANSCRIPT 8-7-15, #6 TRANSCRIPT 9-21-15)(bw)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT ALL RECORDS IN THE CASE LABELED IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. FELTON, CP-39-CR-0000857-2013 IN THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS, AND IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, HAS REQUESTED PERMISSION TO SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, AND IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT THIS COURT HAS DETERMINED THAT SUBMISSION OF THE AFORESAID RECORDS IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT SHOULD BE APPROVED, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/6/22. 4/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw)
April 6, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 9 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER F. GALLAGHER on behalf of THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
March 24, 2022 PAPER #7 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
March 23, 2022 Doc. 7 E-mailed to DA of Lehigh County, faxed to Lehigh County Court of Common Pleas. (er)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS IN THE HABEAS PETITION AND A SUPPORTING LEGAL MEMORANDUM, WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. 2254. ALL STATE COURT OPINIONS AND RELEVANT RECORDS MUST BE ATTACHED AS EXHIBITS. THE CLERK FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 3/23/22. 3/23/22 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE).(er)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT HAVING RECEIVED FELTONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 , IT IS ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS MOOT, BECAUSE FELTON HAS ALREADY PAID THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE. THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE PAMELA A. CARLOS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 72.1.IV(C), ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND THAT NEW ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL NOT BE RAISED AFTER THE FILING OF THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IF THEY COULD HAVE BEEN PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/22/22. 3/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw)
March 22, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 6 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
March 22, 2022 COPY OF ORDER NO. 6 AND PETITION HAS BEEN E-MAILED TO LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND TO PA. ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE. (bw)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number PPE238079 (bw)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by STEVEN FELTON. (er)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (MAILED TO PETITIONER)(er)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (IFP PENDING), filed by STEVEN FELTON. No envelope included. (er) Modified on 3/18/2022 (er). Modified on 3/18/2022 (lisad, ).
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by STEVEN FELTON. (er) Modified on 3/18/2022 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELTON v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEVEN FELTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH
Represented By: HEATHER F. GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?