MCINNIS v. ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY et al
Plaintiff: LISA MCINNIS
Defendant: ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY, AEROQUIP, ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, CARBOLINE, CRANE CO., DINGS COMPANY, EXACTO INC., FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS INC., GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION, ITT BELL GOSSET, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, MONSEY PRODUCTS, MSA, NARMCO, OTIS ELEVATOR, PARKER HANNIFIN, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, SQUARE D COMPANY, STEARNS, TITEFLEX CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, VELLUMOID, INC. and WARREN PUMPS LLC
Cross Defendant: ARROWHEAD PRODUCTS, ATLANTIC CRANES, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, CBS CORPORATION, CHALMERS & KUBECK, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE COCHRANE, CYTEC SOLVAY, DANA CORPORATION, DEXTER CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, HENKEL, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, HYSOL AEROSPACE & INDUSTRIAL ADHESIVES, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., PECORA CORPORATION, PNEUMO ABEX LLC, REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., SIKORSKY HELICOPTER, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., WYETH HOLDING, PFIZER INC. and AMERICAN CYANAMID
Case Number: 5:2022cv02779
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 85 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DINGS COMPANY.(STOKES, GREGORY)
September 15, 2022 Filing 84 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DINGS COMPANY.(STOKES, GREGORY)
September 15, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of DINGS COMPANY with Jury Demand(STOKES, GREGORY)
September 15, 2022 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
September 15, 2022 Filing 81 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
September 15, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
September 15, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. HADDEN on behalf of AMERICAN CYANAMID with Certificate of Service(HADDEN, JAMES)
September 15, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of GARDNER DENVER (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
September 14, 2022 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by LISA MCINNIS..(PAUL, ROBERT)
September 14, 2022 Filing 76 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 75 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
September 8, 2022 Filing 73 DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLCs ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLIES TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Parties by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
September 7, 2022 Filing 72 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint ,Reply to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL.(NEESON, PETER)
September 2, 2022 Filing 71 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY, AEROQUIP, ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, ARROWHEAD PRODUCTS, ATLANTIC CRANES, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CARBOLINE, CBS CORPORATION, CHALMERS & KUBECK, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE CO., CRANE COCHRANE, CYTEC SOLVAY, DEXTER CORPORATION, DINGS COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, EXACTO INC., FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, GOULDS PUMPS INC., GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION, HENKEL, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, HYSOL AEROSPACE & INDUSTRIAL ADHESIVES, ITT BELL GOSSET, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, MONSEY PRODUCTS, MSA, NARMCO, OTIS ELEVATOR, PARKER HANNIFIN, PECORA CORPORATION, PFIZER INC., PNEUMO ABEX LLC, REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., SQUARE D COMPANY, STEARNS, TITEFLEX CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, VELLUMOID, INC., WYETH HOLDING by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
September 2, 2022 Filing 70 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by TITEFLEX CORPORATION.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
September 1, 2022 Filing 69 Defendant FMC Corporation's ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC CORPORATION.(REBER, W.)
September 1, 2022 Filing 68 Defendant Rexnord Industries, LLC's ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by STEARNS.(REBER, W.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by VELLUMOID, INC..(Calati, Anthony) Modified on 8/29/2022 (lisad, ).
August 25, 2022 Filing 66 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by DANA CORPORATION.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 25, 2022 Filing 65 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Enstar Holding (US) LLC with Certificate of Service by DANA CORPORATION.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 25, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of DANA CORPORATION with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 23, 2022 Filing 63 Summons Issued as to ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY, AEROQUIP, ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, ARROWHEAD PRODUCTS, ATLANTIC CRANES, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CARBOLINE, CHALMERS & KUBECK, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE CO., CRANE COCHRANE, CYTEC SOLVAY, DEXTER CORPORATION, DINGS COMPANY, EXACTO INC., FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST, GARDNER DENVER, GOULDS PUMPS INC., HENKEL, HYSOL AEROSPACE & INDUSTRIAL ADHESIVES, ITT BELL GOSSET, MONSEY PRODUCTS, MSA, NARMCO, OTIS ELEVATOR, PECORA CORPORATION, REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., VELLUMOID, INC., WYETH HOLDING. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/23/2022 (sg) (sg).
August 23, 2022 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 23, 2022 Filing 61 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 23, 2022 Filing 60 ANSWER to #58 Amended Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 23, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
August 19, 2022 Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LISA MCINNIS.(PAUL, ROBERT)
August 18, 2022 Filing 57 ALIAS Summons Issued as to GARDNER DENVER. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/18/2022 (sg) Modified on 8/19/2022 (lisad, ).
August 18, 2022 per #56 the claims of three defendants Raytheon, Hexcel, andSikorsky only are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (sg)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED THAT: 1. THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY RAYTHEON, HEXCEL, AND SIKORSKY (ECF NOS. 16, 29, 39) ARE GRANTED BECAUSE THE COURT LACKS PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THESE DEFENDANTS. PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.A. 1631, THE CLAIMS OF THESE THREE DEFENDANTS ONLY ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE, WHICH APPEARS TO HAVE PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER THE THREE DEFENDANTS. 2. THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY CBS (ECF NO. 48) IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE REMAINDER OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.2 PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 26, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/16/2022.8/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
August 11, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service.(SMITH, WILLIAM)
August 11, 2022 Filing 54 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by LISA MCINNIS. (PAUL, ROBERT)
August 10, 2022 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 10, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 10, 2022 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PNEUMO ABEX LLC.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 10, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of PNEUMO ABEX LLC with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 9, 2022 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 9, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 5, 2022 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Raytheon filed by LISA MCINNIS. (PAUL, ROBERT)
August 5, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Hexcel filed by LISA MCINNIS. (PAUL, ROBERT)
August 5, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Sikorsky filed by LISA MCINNIS. (PAUL, ROBERT)
August 2, 2022 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group plc with Certificate of Service by TITEFLEX CORPORATION.(TURNER, TIFFANY)
August 2, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of TITEFLEX CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(TURNER, TIFFANY)
August 1, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by NEAL C. GLENN on behalf of PFIZER INC. with Certificate of Service(GLENN, NEAL)
August 1, 2022 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PFIZER INC..(HANNA, THOMAS)
August 1, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. HANNA on behalf of PFIZER INC. with Certificate of Service(HANNA, THOMAS)
July 29, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SIKORSKY HELICOPTER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
July 29, 2022 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Emerson Electric Co. with Certificate of Service by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
July 29, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
July 29, 2022 Filing 36 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
July 29, 2022 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
July 29, 2022 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
July 29, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
July 29, 2022 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SQUARE D COMPANY.(REBER, W.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SQUARE D COMPANY with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HEXCEL CORPORATION.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
July 29, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HEXCEL CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
July 28, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of PARKER HANNIFIN (RYAN, DANIEL)
July 27, 2022 Filing 27 3M COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint & REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS &, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
July 27, 2022 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
July 27, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand & Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
July 26, 2022 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ESAB Corporation by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
July 26, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
July 26, 2022 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL.(NEESON, PETER)
July 26, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
July 26, 2022 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FMC CORPORATION.(REBER, W.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of FMC CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STEARNS.(REBER, W.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of STEARNS with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
July 25, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(SMITH, WILLIAM)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Verizon Communications Inc. with Certificate of Service by GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION.(BOYD, CHRISTINE)
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE O. BOYD on behalf of GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BOYD, CHRISTINE)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
July 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (RAU, TIMOTHY)
July 22, 2022 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lockheed Martin Corporation with Certificate of Service by SIKORSKY HELICOPTER.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by SIKORSKY HELICOPTER re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) (Notice of Joinder in Removal) (ADAMS, WILLIAM)
July 21, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
July 21, 2022 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED BAKRY on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL (BAKRY, MOHAMED)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SMITH, WILLIAM)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16049604), filed by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SMITH, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCINNIS v. ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MCINNIS
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADC CONTRACTING & SUPPLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROQUIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Represented By: MOHAMED BAKRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBOLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINGS COMPANY
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXACTO INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTINE O. BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT BELL GOSSET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSEY PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NARMCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTIS ELEVATOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER HANNIFIN
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEARNS
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITEFLEX CORPORATION
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELLUMOID, INC.
Represented By: Anthony James Calati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ARROWHEAD PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ATLANTIC CRANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CHALMERS & KUBECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CRANE COCHRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CYTEC SOLVAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DEXTER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HENKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HEXCEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HYSOL AEROSPACE & INDUSTRIAL ADHESIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PECORA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: SIKORSKY HELICOPTER
Represented By: WILLIAM R. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: WYETH HOLDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: NEAL C. GLENN
Represented By: THOMAS P. HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AMERICAN CYANAMID
Represented By: JAMES P. HADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?