SOTO GARCIA v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: JOSE M SOTO GARCIA
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 5:2022cv04695
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SCOTT W REID
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JOSE M SOTO GARCIA.. (FRIEDMAN, F.)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 Notice CONSENTING Magistrate Consent by JOSE M SOTO GARCIA.(FRIEDMAN, F.)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FORM WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 1/19/23. 1/19/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 11/28/22 Entered and copies e-mailed. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Procedural Order)(fdc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/29/2022) (tjd).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT #1 IS DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 11/28/22.11/28/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 28, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (fdc)
November 25, 2022 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent)(mas)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOSE M SOTO GARCIA..(FRIEDMAN, F.)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by JOSE M SOTO GARCIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(FRIEDMAN, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOTO GARCIA v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE M SOTO GARCIA
Represented By: F. MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?