DOLLAK v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: James Dollak
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security and KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 5:2022cv05088
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN F MURPHY
Referring Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders 2/2/23 Entered and copies e-mailed. (amas)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/2/23.2/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
February 2, 2023 Service made electronically as to the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (amas)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 1/24/23 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN F. MURPHY. ETC. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE WYLESOL ON 1/24/23. 1/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A.SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/3/23. 1/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURTS STANDING ORDER FOR DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES PILOT PROGRAM AND PLAINTIFF HAVING DECLINED CONSENT, THIS CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/28/22. 12/29/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by JAMES DOLLAK.. (MANNICCI, LORI)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSTENT TO PROCEED TO MAGISTRATE)(dt)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Dollak.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNICCI, LORI)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security, filed by James Dollak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MANNICCI, LORI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOLLAK v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dollak
Represented By: LORI L. MANNICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi,Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?