MALDONADO v. RANKIN
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO
Defendant: DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN
Case Number: 5:2023cv03942
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #10 , 1 COPY OF REQUEST OF WAIVER 398 , 2 COPIES OF REQUEST WAIVER 399 AND AMENDED COMPLAINT #9 TO DEFENDANT DEPUTY SHERIFF RANKIN ON 12/6/23. (jaa, )
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #10 AND NOTICE #12 TO PLAINTIFF ON 12/6/23. (jaa, )
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE to Plaintiff, re: Waiver of Service. (va)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN on 12/5/23. Waiver of Service due by 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(va)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS SPECIALLY APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ON THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANT(S), PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(D), TO EFFECT WAIVER OF SERVICE: DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN. THE WAIVER OF SERVICE REQUESTS SHALL BE ACCOMPANIED BY A COPY OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 9) AND SHALL INFORM THE DEFENDANT OF THE CONSEQUENCES OF COMPLIANCE AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE REQUESTS. THE REQUESTS SHALL ALLOW THE DEFENDANT AT LEAST 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE THEY ARE SENT (60 DAYS IF ADDRESSED OUTSIDE ANY JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF THE UNITED STATES) TO RETURN THE SIGNED WAIVERS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/5/23. 12/5/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN, filed by CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO. Envelope. (va)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order COPY OF DOC. NOS. 7, 8 AND COMPLAINT FORMS HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR IFP. CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO, #03-0234, SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE COURT DIRECTS THE WARDEN OF LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON OR OTHER APPROPRIATE OFFICIAL TO ASSESS AN INITIAL FILING FEE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(E)(2)(B)(II) FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM. MALDONADO MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND MALDONADO A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/8/23. 11/8/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/8/23. 11/8/23 ENTERED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Copy of #8 Order faxed to Lancaster County Warden. (va)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerks Office Response to Status Update (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(sbt)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Status Update dated 10/23/23 by CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO (sbt)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO MALDONADO. (fdc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO. (fdc)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN, filed by CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO. *IFP PENDING*(fdc) Modified on 10/12/2023 (md).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO..(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALDONADO v. RANKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MALDONADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY SHERRIFF RANKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?