BROOKS v. STEBERGER et al
Plaintiff: CORRY M. BROOKS
Defendant: CHERL STEBERGER and PRIMECARE MED. INC.
Case Number: 5:2023cv04535
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1915. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/4/24. 1/4/24 ENTERED AND COPY OF THIS ORDER AND BLANK PRISONER COMPLAINT FORM MAILED TO BROOKS. COPY E-MAILED TO WARDEN OF LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON.(fdc)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/4/24. 1/4/24 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO BROOKS.(fdc)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CORRY M. BROOKS. (jaa, )
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order DOC. NO. #5 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 11/29/23. (amas)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, AS REQUIRED, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS CANNOT BE ADJUDICATED AT THIS TIME. PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT. ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFF CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS v. STEBERGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORRY M. BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERL STEBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMECARE MED. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?