AUSTIN et al v. GILLIG, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN AUSTIN and LORI AUSTIN
Defendant: GILLIG, LLC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., ZF AUTOMOTIVE US, INC., ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC, DOE DEFENDANTS, ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC., and DOE DEFENDANTS 1-8
Case Number: 5:2023cv04553
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE #17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/11/24.1/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE #18 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/11/24.1/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17186208.) filed by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17186070.) filed by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2024 11:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/28/23. 12/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/28/23. 12/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant, ZF ASE by GILLIG, LLC.(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 PAGES 80-163)(ke)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GILLIG, LLC by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC.(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES GILLIAM-BROWNLEE on behalf of ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC (GILLIAM-BROWNLEE, CHARLES)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Arkay Acquisition LLC with Certificate of Service by GILLIG, LLC.(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST ONLY DEFENDANTS ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (ZF NA) AND ZF AUTOMOTIVE US INC. (F/K/A TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC.) (ZF AU) ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ALL AVAILABLE CAUSES OF ACTION, INCLUDING APPEALS, AS TO THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS SHALL REMAIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/5/23. 12/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., ZF AUTOMOTIVE US, INC., and ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC. by TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC, ZF AUTOMOTIVE US, INC., ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, BRADLEY)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS P. ZIEMBA on behalf of GILLIG, LLC with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC.(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ZF HOLDINGS BV with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC, ZF AUTOMOTIVE US, INC., ZF OF NORTH AMERICA.(TOOMEY, CHARLES)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17080880), filed by ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2023.10.10 Comp, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 2023.10.30 Aff of Service (upon ZF North America and ZF Active Safety), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2023.10.31 Aff of Service (upon Gillig, TRW, and ZF Auto), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4- 2023.11.09 NOI Subpoena upon Red Rose Transit Auth, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 2023.11.17 Gillig's Consent to Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 2023.11.17 NR ZF' Consent to Removal)(TOOMEY, CHARLES) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/20/2023) (sbt).
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES SCOTT TOOMEY on behalf of ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(TOOMEY, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUSTIN et al v. GILLIG, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN AUSTIN
Represented By: BRADLEY R. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI AUSTIN
Represented By: BRADLEY R. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILLIG, LLC
Represented By: DENNIS P. ZIEMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES SCOTT TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF AUTOMOTIVE US, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES SCOTT TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC
Represented By: CHARLES SCOTT TOOMEY
Represented By: CHARLES GILLIAM-BROWNLEE
Represented By: DAVID R. TIPPETTS
Represented By: PHILIP R. MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF NORTH AMERICA, INC.,
Represented By: CHARLES SCOTT TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?