LOYKO v. OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LINDA LOYKO
Defendant: OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC doing business as PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION (OLD ORCHARD) doing business as PROMEDICA SNF OLD ORCHARD, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC. and PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE
Case Number: 5:2024cv00360
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF 3/13/24 THAT FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE OPINION ISSUED THIS DATE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL ECF NO. 7 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ETC. THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS DENIED AS TO COUNT III AND V AND SHALL BE STAYED TO PERMIT THE ARBITRATION TO PROCEED. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT ON THE FIRST DAY OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING ON JUNE 1, 2024, TO REPORT ON THE STATUS OF THE ARBITRATION. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 3/13/24. 3/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
March 13, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 3/13/24. 3/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
February 28, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit Memorandum)(HORST, ERIC)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LINDA LOYKO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit)(HABERMAN, LEONARD)
February 10, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by LEONARD P. HABERMAN on behalf of LINDA LOYKO(HABERMAN, LEONARD)
February 10, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT MERIT by LINDA LOYKO. (HABERMAN, LEONARD)
February 10, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT by LINDA LOYKO. (HABERMAN, LEONARD)
February 10, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of MERIT by LINDA LOYKO. (HABERMAN, LEONARD)
February 1, 2024 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Anderson opinion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - ProMedica Seniorcare Trademark Registration)(HORST, ERIC)
January 29, 2024 Filing 6 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (CCP - Montgomery County, )
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/25/24. 1/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ProMedica Health System, Inc. with Certificate of Service by OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE.(HORST, ERIC)
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC., PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE . (HORST, ERIC)
January 25, 2024 Filing 2 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE, OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BPAEDC-17214304), filed by PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE, OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC, PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Montgomery County Docket, #2 Designation Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(HORST, ERIC) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/25/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/25/2024) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/25/2024) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOYKO v. OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA LOYKO
Represented By: CAROLYN HAHN
Represented By: LEONARD P. HABERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD ORCHARD HEALTH CARE CENTER-EASTON PA, LLC doing business as PROMEDICA SKILLED NURSING AND REHABILITATION (OLD ORCHARD) doing business as PROMEDICA SNF OLD ORCHARD
Represented By: ERIC B. HORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA HEALTH SYSTEM INC.
Represented By: ERIC B. HORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMEDICA SENIOR CARE
Represented By: ERIC B. HORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?