TAYLOR v. CHILDREN AND YOUTH et al
Plaintiff: KATHY L. TAYLOR
Defendant: CHILDREN AND YOUTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPT. and AFFIANT PETER LABIAK
Case Number: 5:2024cv01411
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order DOC. 10 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF 5/30/24 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, ECF NO. 9, AND IT APPEARING THAT SERVICE WAS NOT PROPER AS TO DEFENDANTS PETER LABIAK AND THE BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPARTMENT, IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL MAKE PROPER SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS PETER LABIAK AND THE BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 4(m) NO LATER THAN JULY 1, 2024. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 5/30/24. 5/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by KATHY L TAYLOR re: served SUMMONS upon CHILDREN AND YOUTH, BETHLEHEM, POLICE DEPT., DEFT. LABIAK, COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON DA, BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPARTMENT by CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARDS) on 5/7/24. (PERSONALLY DELIVERED) (er) Modified on 5/23/2024 (er).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (RETURN RECEIPT CARDS ATTACHED) BY KATHY L. TAYLOR. (DELIVERED PERSONALLY). (er)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (GONZALES, JOHN)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHILDREN AND YOUTH. CHILDREN AND YOUTH waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (GONZALES, JOHN)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of CHILDREN AND YOUTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPT., CHILDREN AND YOUTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, PETER LABIAK. (rf, )
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order 4 SUMMONS MAILED TO PRO SE ON 4/16/24. (amas)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20019291 (sg)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (MAILED TO PRO SE)(er)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order MAILED PRO SE E-NOTICE CONSENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (er)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPT., CHILDREN AND YOUTH, DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, PETER LABIAK (FILING FEE PAID), filed by KATHY L. TAYLOR.(er) Modified on 4/4/2024 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. CHILDREN AND YOUTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY L. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Represented By: JOHN P. GONZALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: JOHN P. GONZALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHLEHEM POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFFIANT PETER LABIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?