Keller v. Menu Foods Limited et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dixie Keller
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc. and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 1:2007cv00929
Filed: May 22, 2007
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2007 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Case file transferred RECEIVED on 7/23/07 from USDC New Jersey. (ts, )
July 24, 2007 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on MDL stating that this order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the USDC for the District of New Jersey. The transmittal of this order to said clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel w/in this 15-day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jc)
July 20, 2007 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Docket No. 1850. Case transfered to the District of New Jersey. (aaa)
July 20, 2007 4 TRANSFER LETTER sent with certified copy of docket sheet re MDL-1850 to the District of New Jersey with request for verification of receipt. (aaa )
June 5, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Judge Sylvia H. Rambo on 06/05/07. (ma, )
May 22, 2007 2 COMPLAINT -.(Moore, J.)
May 22, 2007 Summons Issued as to DOES 1-100, Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. and provided to Attorney for service on Defendant(s). (aaa )
May 22, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 1036223), filed by Dixie Keller. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Menu Foods Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie Keller
Represented By: J. Chad Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?