Heleva v. Brooks et al
Petitioner: |
Daniel Arthur Heleva |
Respondent: |
Mrs. M. Brooks and PA State Attorney General |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv01398 |
Filed: |
August 1, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Harrisburg Office |
County: |
Adams |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher C. Conner |
Presiding Judge: |
EC |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
124
ORDER denying ptnr's motion 93 for consideration & jdgmt on Doc. 86. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/19/18. (ki)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
92
ORDER (Memorandum 91 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING amended petition for writ of habeas corpus 35 , noting no basis for issuance of certificate of appealability, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/9/18. (ki)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing
76
ORDER construing ptnr's motion motion to commence action 74 as motion to reopen & granting same, directing Clrk of Ct to REOPEN matter & to STRIKE supp 69 to petition, directing respondents to file answer to petition 35 & memo of law... by 8/10/16, permitting ptnr to file reply to answer w/in 14 days of date answer filed, & noting ct will determine whether ptnr to be produced for hrg pending filing of answer & reply, if filed.(See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/20/16. (ki)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
68
ORDER denying petitioner's motion 67 for preliminary injunction. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/25/15. (ki)
|
August 23, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER DENYING ptnr's motion for appointment of counsel 56 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/23/13. (ki)
|
December 9, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER re: judgment of 3rd Circuit Court of Appeals 31 - It is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in the above-captioned case are STAYED & that the court will hold its ruling on the petition for writ of habeas corpus in abeyance, pending ptnr' s exhaustion of state remedies, provided that ptnr commences exhaustion of proceedings in state ct forthwith & returns to this ct w/in 60 days of completing the exhaustion; Clrk of Ct directed to mark this matter closed for statistical purposes only. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/09/09. (ki)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?