Smith v. Hanuska et al
Plaintiff: Stewart C. Smith
Defendant: John Hanuska, David Bixler, Brian Shaffer and John Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2009cv00889
Filed: May 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Blewitt
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying pltf's motion to alter judgment 180 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/17/12. (ki)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying motion for entry of judgment or, in alternative, for issuance of a certificate of appealability 131 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/22/11. (ki)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying pltf's motion for summary judgment 132 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/19/11. (ki)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying pltf's 3rd motion for reconsideration 123 , directing that the ct will not entertain any new motions for reconsideration re: either denial of Smith's MSJ or ct orders denying reconsideration of denial of Smith's MSJ, & directing that any such motion for reconsideration filed by Smith shall be stricken from the record. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/21/11. (ki)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 2nd motion for reconsideration 109 & amended 2nd motion for reconsideration 113 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/06/11. (ki)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying request for subpoena forms 95 pending attempts to secure pro bono cnsl. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/20/11. (ki)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying pltf's motion for reconsideration 98 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/06/11. (ki)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Report & Recommendation of the magistrate judge 87 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Report & recommendation 87 ADOPTED in part & REJECTED in part - a. Adopted w/ re: false arrest claim against David Bixler & the illegal se arch & seizure claim against Officer John Hanuska, b. Rejected w/ re: false arrest claim against Officer Hanuska.; 2. Defts' motion 76 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part - a. Granted as to claim against David Bixler, b. Denied in all other respe cts.; 3. Pltf's MSJs 41 , 61 & 73 DENIED.; 4. Clrk of Ct to defer entry of jdgmt on claims in Para 2a until resolution of all claims.; 5. Scheduling order shall issue by further order of court. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/17/11. (ki)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Re: report & recommendation of the magistrate judge 22 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The report & recommendation of the magistrate judge 22 is REJECTED insofar as it recommends tht pltf's action be dismissed in its entirety.; 2. Pltf 's deficiently-pled claims id'd in Para 1(b) of the order of ct 21 dated 9/11/09 are DISMISSED with prejudice.; 3. Case REMANDED to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/21/10. (ki)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed on the basis of plf Smith's failure to timely file his Amended Complaint and for his failure to comply with an Order of the Court. NOTICE; Exceptions to be filed within l0 days. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2009Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt on 10/19/09. (jb, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: report & recommendations of magistrate judge 11 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Report & recommendation ADOPTED in part & REJECTED in part as follows... (see Paras 1a, 1b & 1c for specifics).; 2. Pltf permitted to file by 10/9/09 an amended complaint that complies w/ this order.; 3. Case REMANDED to magistrate judge for further proceedings. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/11/09. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hanuska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hanuska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?