U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Healy et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Sean Nathan Healy, Shalese Rania Healy and Sand Dollar Investing Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv01331
Filed: July 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER deeming motion to approve final distribution 151 unopposed, granting motion 151 , approving final distribution of pymt of fees & costs & other relief... (see Paras 2a-g for specifics) & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/02/12. (ki)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re: 9th motion for order auth pymt of fees & expenses 148 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion 148 is DEEMED unopposed. 2. Motion 148 is GRANTED - ct approves full amt of fees & costs req'd & auth pymt of 80% of fees sought & full amt of costs sought as follows... (see Paras 2a-c for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/08/11. (ki)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER deeming 8th motion for order authorizing payment of fees & expenses 143 unopposed & GRANTING same. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/12/11. (ki)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER deeming motin for order aproving initial distribution of funds to claimants w/ allowed claims 138 unopposed, GRANTING motion 138 , authorizing receiver to make initial distribution totaling $3,276,144.80...to Mr. Wright & Madiera Group, & authorizing receiver to retain reserve fund in amt of $378,177.01... (see order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/21/11. (ki)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER deeming 7th motion for order authorizing payment of fees & expenses 136 unopposed & GRANTING same. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/31/11. (ki)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER deeming motion 128 to compel relief deft Shalese Healy to cooperate w/ the receiver unopposed, GRANTING motion 128 & directing relief deft Shalese Healy shall cooperate w/ receiver during remaining of receivership... as follow in Paras 2i, 2ii & 2iii. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/05/11. (ki)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 6th motion for pymt of fees & expenses 126 & approving amts for same (see Paras 2a & 2b for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/09/11. (ki)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER deeming Receiver's motion requesting ct approve prop claims procedure & plan of distribution of assets 118 unopposed, GRANTING said motion & setting forth specific instructions & authorizations re: same (see Paras 2a-d for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/02/10. (ki)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 5th interim motion for order authorizing pymt of fees & expenses 116 - Ct approves full amt of fees & costs req'd & authorizes pymt of 80% of fees sought & full amt of costs sought as follows... (See Paras 1a & 1b for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/18/10. (ki)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motion to compel receiver to return certain assets 86 ... (see Paras 1 & 2 for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/28/10. (ki )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting motion to approve pymt of taxes 100 - ct authorizes receiver to pay taxes incurred by the estate of deft Sean Healy & of certain assets of relief defts & ct further authorizes receiver to pay all other taxes incurred by estate from inception of receivership through closing of the above-captioned case w/out req'ng further process &/or ct approval. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/20/10. (ki)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CONSENT ORDER of Permanent Injunction, Disgorgement, Civil Monetary Penalty, & Equitable Relief Against Defendant Sean Nathan Healy & Relief Defendant Sand Dollar Investing Partners, LLC. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/22/10. (ki)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re: 3rd motion for order authorizing pymt of fees & expenses 84 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion 84 DEEMED unopposed.; 2. Motion 84 GRANTED - ct approves full amt of fees & costs requested & authorizes pymt of 80% of fees sought & full amt of costs sought as follows... (see Paras 2a & 2b for specific amts). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/08/10. (ki)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re: 2nd interim motion for pymt of fees & expenses 73 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion 73 is DEEMED unopposed.; 2. Motion 73 is GRANTED - ct approves full amt of fees & costs requested & authorizes pymt of 80% of fees sought & full amt of costs sought as follows... (see Paras 2a-2d for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/08/10. (ki)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER deeming first interim motion for order authorizing payment of fees & expenses 54 unopposed & GRANTING same. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/08/09. (ki)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re: 10/21/09 order 57 of ct - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Healy family shall have immediate access to Riviera Manor Property & shall be permitted to occupy it until 12:00 pm on 12/4/09.; 2. Cnsl shall meet & confer & attempt to reach agreem ent re:... (see Paras 2a-c for specifics) w/ rt of Healy family to occupy property to be subject to agreement of cnsl.; 3. At 12:00 p.m. on 12/4/09 receiver authorized to take exclusive possession of property & its contents.; 4. All provisions of ct's prelim injs & applicable provisions of ct's TROs remain in effect except as modified herein. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/25/09. (ki)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER deeming motion to stay 58 & supp'ng brief 61 WITHDRAWN. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/24/09. (ki)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion for ordere providing receiver w/ sole possession of Riveria Manor Property 34 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Receiver authorized to take exclusive possession of property by 11/30/09.; 2. Healy fami ly ordered to vacate property by 11/30/09... w/out damaging or otherwise diminishing value thereof.; 3. Receiver ordered to submit to ct by 11/4/09 a memo id'ng such furniture in property or contents of property that receiver contends are recove rable assets... w/ deft & relief deft permitted to file responsive memo by 11/16/09 & receiver permitted to file reply by 11/23/09.; 4. All provisions of ct'd prelim injs & applicable provisions of ct's TROs remain in effect except as modified herein. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/21/09. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Healy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Braden M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Nathan Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalese Rania Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Dollar Investing Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?