Collins v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Collins
Defendant: Jerome Walsh, Jeffery Beard, Co Salsman, Co Romonoski, Co Bath, Lt. R. Patterson, Vincent Mooney, Rebeca Mooney, Ann Chiapmpi and Dorina Varner
Case Number: 1:2009cv01932
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Presiding Judge: LQ
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Dfts' 63 Motion for Summary Judgment is deemed unopposed AND GRANTED. 2)The Clerk of Court is directed to enter jgm in favor of dfts Walsh, Beard, Salsman, Romonoski, Bath, Patterson, and Varner on all clms and against Pltf in this case; 3)The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case; 4)Any appeal from this order will be deemed frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Aug. 15, 2012. (sc)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED w/o prejudice. Dfts 61 MOTION for Sanctions is DENIED. W/i 14 days from the date of this order, Pltf shall serve on Dfts a supplemental response to interrogatory #1 in acc w/ the attached Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Feb. 6, 2012. SEE MEMORANDUM FOR DETAILS. (sc)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 56 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED. Pltf shall serve dfts w/ his responses to the interrogatory questions w/i 14 days from the date of this order. Dfts 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED. All discovery in this matter shall be completed by 11/7/11. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Sept. 12, 2011. SEE ORDER. (sc)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1)Pltf's 35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED AS MOOT. 2)Pltf's 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 3)All discovery in this matter shall be completed by the parties w/i 60 days from the date of this order. Any dispositive mtns shall be filed w/i 30 days from the close of discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on July 6, 2011. (sc)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 33 Motion for Court to Order Medical Records is DENIED without prejudice. Dft's 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Dfts shall file an answer to the remaining claims within 20 days from the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on September 22, 2010. (sc)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The 20 Motion to Amend/Correct is GRANTED only to the extent that the exhibits attached to the motions are construed to be supplements to the complaint in this action.Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 08/09/2010. (pjr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co Romonoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. R. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebeca Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Chiapmpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?