January 8, 2015 |
Filing
222
MEMORANDUM re MOTION to Reopen Case 216 filed by Keith Dougherty (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 01/08/15. (ma)
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing
181
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 16th day of May, 2011, in con. w/the defts.' various mtns. to dismiss the amd. complt. (Doc. 124), it is ordered that: 1. The mtn. 125 to dismiss of deft. Pamela Lee is granted. 2. The mtn. 138 to dismiss of defts., Judge Stephen Linebaugh, J. Robert Chuk, & the John Does members of the Com. Crt. is granted. 3. The mtn. 139 to dismiss of deft. Jonathan Snyder is granted & plf.'s cross-mtn. 46 is denied. 4. The mtn. 132 to dismiss of defts. North Hopewell Township; Dustin Grove, William Tollinger, & Robert Barclay, the members of the Township Board of Supervisors; and Kerrie Ebaugh, the Township Secretary/Treasurer is granted. 5. The mtn. 133 to dismiss of Darrell VanOrmer is granted . 6. The mtn. 134 to dismiss of Melanie Brady is granted. 7. The mtn. 130 to dismiss of Ron Englar is granted. 8. The following mtns. are dism'd as moot: (a) plf.'s petn. (Doc. 51) to amend; (b) plf.'s mtns. 159 and 166 for rec onsideration; c) Plf.'s mtns. 127 and 168 for partial SJ; (d) deft. Snyder's mtn. 141 to dismiss plf.'s mtn. 127 for partial SJ; (e)Plf.'s mtn. 178 for partial SJ. 9. The crt. declines under 28 USC 1367(c)(3) to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state-law claims that might have been presented in the amd. complt. 10. The stay in this action imposed by order of 4/29/11 180 is vacated. 11. This action is hereby dism'd, & the Clerk of Crt. shall close this file. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 5/16/11. (am, )
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing
157
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 18th day of March, 2011, it is ordered that plf.'s mtn. 122 under 28 USC 1922(b) to take an interlocutory appeal of our orders 1/25/11, docketed as doc. nos. 113 114 117 118 is denied. (See memoe for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 3/18/11. (am)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 25th day of an., 2011, it is ordered that: 1. The mtn. 7 to dismiss of deft. Pamela Lee is granted. 2. The mtn. 14 to dismiss of defts., Judge Stephen Linebaugh, J. Robert Chuk, & John Doe members of the Com. Crt. is granted. 3. The mtn. 44 to dismiss of deft. Jonathan Snyder is granted & plf.'s cross-mtn. 46 is denied. 4. The mtn. 47 to dismiss of defts. North Hopewell Township; Dustin Grove, William Bollinger, and Robert Barclay, the members of the Township Board of Secretary/Treasurer is granted. 5. Any suppl. state-law claims are dism'd pur. to 28 USC 1367(c)(3) w/out prejudice to bringing them in state court. 6. This action is hereby dism'd, but plf. is granted 21 days from the dt. of this order to file an amd. complt. in conformity w/the accompanying memorandum. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 1/25/11. (am)
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 21st day of Dec., 2010, it is ordered that: 1. Plf.'s mtn. 77 for an expedited hrg. & for injunctive relief against the state court in Brady v. Brady, No. 2008-SU-002692-07 (York Co.) is denied. 2. Any othe r request for injunctive relief requiring deft. North Hopewell Township to honor the expired building permit or allow construction of the improvements to resume is denied. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 12/21/10. (am)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 29th day of July, 2010, it is ordered that: 1. Plf.'s petn. 30 to suppl. his docs. is granted, but any request for reconsideration in that petn. is denied. 2. Plf.'s mtn. 25 for reconsideration of ou r order of 6/30/10; mtn. 27 "to stay 'attorney' for the Township, et al. until a default judgment has been entered"; and mtn. 28 for a hrg. on the default, are denied. 3. Plf.'s petn. 29 to add defts., Mary E. D'An drea, the Clerk of Court, and Peter Welsh, the Deputy-in-Charge of the Crt.'s Hbg. Division, is dism'd based on plf.'s w/drawal of that petn. 4. Plf.'s petn. 31 for a writ of coram vobis or, in the alternative, allowance of an i nterlocutory appeal, is denied. 5. Plf.'s mtn. 32 for leave to file an interlocutory appeal, styled as a motion to strike or withdraw joinder of Mary D'Andrea and Peter Welsh, is denied. (See memo for complete details.) Motions terminated: 29 28 24 25 24 31 27 26 32 . Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 7/29/10. (am)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 30th day of June, 2010, it is ordered that plf.'s mtns. 20 21 23 for default are denied. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/30/10. (am)
|