The Hershey Company v. Hottrix LLC Featured Case

A copyright lawsuit involving disputes over virtual hot chocolate iPhone apps sold by The Hershey Company and Hottrix, LLC

Plaintiff: The Hershey Company
Defendant: Hottrix LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01178
Filed: June 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: John E. Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hottrix LLC, The Hershey Company, Versatile Systems, Inc. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
March 4, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 3/2/2012 09:30AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. (eo, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Extend Trial Term to March 2012. Jury Selection reset for 3/2/2011 09:30AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Pretrial Conference reset for 2/1/2012. See order for all deadlines. (eo, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for All Remaining Deadlines Pending Mediation by The Hershey Company, Versatile Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Leppo, Shawn)
February 3, 2011 Filing 56 ANSWER to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Versatile Systems, Inc..(Freedenberg, Harvey)
February 3, 2011 Filing 55 ANSWER to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Hershey Company.(Freedenberg, Harvey)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Extend Time (eo, )
January 19, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Counterclaims by The Hershey Company, Versatile Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. Denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. (eo, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss (eo, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference reset for 11/1/2011. Jury Selection reset for 12/5/2011 09:30AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See order for all other deadlines. (eo, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn K. Leppo on behalf of The Hershey Company, Versatile Systems, Inc. (Leppo, Shawn)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion for Consideration (eo, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by The Hershey Company, Versatile Systems, Inc.. Related document: 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Hershey Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Word Count)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
November 18, 2010 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Consideration of Relief from Local Rule 7.8 by Versatile Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
November 10, 2010 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Versatile Systems, Inc.. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
November 9, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims of Hottrix LLC by Versatile Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
November 4, 2010 Filing 43 DECLARATION by Hottrix LLC re 42 Brief in Opposition of Amanda Lavis. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Tribeck, Robert)
November 4, 2010 Filing 42 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hottrix LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Fisher, # 2 Color Copy of Page 20 to Hottrix Opposition Brief)(Tribeck, Robert)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Exceed pages. (eo, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 40 Proposed Order by Hottrix LLC. 39 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Word Limit in Brief in Opposition to The Hershey Company's Motion to Dismiss. (Tribeck, Robert)
October 29, 2010 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Word Limit in Brief in Opposition to The Hershey Company's Motion to Dismiss by Hottrix LLC.(Tribeck, Robert)
October 29, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION: FOR FUTURE REFERENCE, counsel should attached a proposed order to any motions filed. (dc)
October 22, 2010 Filing 38 VIDEO EXHIBITS filed by The Hershey Company re 35 Declaration. (CD forwarded to chambers.) (dc)
October 21, 2010 Filing 37 BRIEF in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by The Hershey Company. Related document: 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Hershey Company.(Freedenberg, Harvey)
October 21, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings by The Hershey Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
October 21, 2010 Filing 35 DECLARATION by The Hershey Company of Victoria Haje in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
October 20, 2010 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hottrix LLC. Versatile Systems, Inc. served on 10/19/2010, answer due 11/9/2010. (Tribeck, Robert)
October 14, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Counterclaim Defendant Versatile Systems, Inc. and provided to Attorney for service on Defendant(s). (jc)
October 14, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. No. 34 deleted per request of counsel. Initial disclosures will be refiled later. (dc)
October 7, 2010 Filing 33 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Versatile Systems, Inc. by Hottrix LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C)(Tribeck, Robert)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER #2- Practice Order. (eo, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER #1 STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK Discovery due by 6/15/2011. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2011 09:30AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Motions due by 7/1/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2011 (eo, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER approving (Stipulated Protective Order) (eo, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 28 CD EXHIBIT filed by The Hershey Company re 26 Declaration. There is no document attached to this filing. The exhibit was received in the Clerk's Office on CD. The CD contains 2 video clips of iphone apps. The CD has been forwarded to chambers for review. (dc)
September 27, 2010 Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Hershey Company.(Freedenberg, Harvey)
September 27, 2010 Filing 26 DECLARATION by The Hershey Company of Victoria Haje in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
September 27, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and for Judgment on the Pleadings by The Hershey Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
September 22, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Boynton, Jr on behalf of The Hershey Company (Boynton, Alan)
September 22, 2010 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Hershey Company, Hottrix LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Freedenberg, Harvey)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 9/29/2010 10:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III (time change only) (eo, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hershey Company. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
September 15, 2010 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Hottrix LLC. (Tribeck, Robert)
September 13, 2010 Filing 19 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against The Hershey Company by Hottrix LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C)(Tribeck, Robert)
September 7, 2010 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by The Hershey Company. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
August 27, 2010 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jason Fisher (eo, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. and Motion to reschedule CMC. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2010 11:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. (eo, )
August 26, 2010 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert J. Tribeck on behalf of Hottrix LLC Attorney Jason Fisher is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 03140000000001966223.. (Tribeck, Robert)
August 26, 2010 GENERAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM SENT to Jason H. Fisher on 8/26/10. (lh, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Case Management Conference by Hottrix LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tribeck, Robert)
August 24, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Shill on behalf of Hottrix LLC (Shill, Todd)
August 24, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Tribeck on behalf of Hottrix LLC (Tribeck, Robert)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2010 09:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. (eo, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hershey Company. Hottrix LLC served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Freedenberg, Harvey)
June 10, 2010 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas Smart (eo, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Patricia Larson (eo, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul Llewellyn (eo, )
June 10, 2010 Summons Reissued as to Hottrix LLC. (aaa )
June 9, 2010 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Harvey Freedenberg, Thomas A. Smart on behalf of The Hershey Company Attorney Thomas A. Smart is seeking special admission. Filing Fee: 50.00 Receipt Number: 111 007984. (aaa )
June 9, 2010 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Patricia Larson, Harvey Freedenberg on behalf of The Hershey Company Attorney Patricia Larson is seeking special admission. Filing Fee: 50.00 Receipt Number: 111 007985. (aaa )
June 9, 2010 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Harvey Freedenberg, Paul C. Llewellyn on behalf of The Hershey Company Attorney Paul C. Llewellyn is seeking special admission. Filing Fee: 50.00 Receipt Number: 111 007983. (aaa )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2010 (eo, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 2 LETTER - from deputy clerk to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks re: new case. (jc)
June 3, 2010 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM SENT to Thomas A. Smart. (jc)
June 3, 2010 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Paul C. Llewellyn. (jc)
June 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - N/C to cnsl.; no jury trial demanded. ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 111007932) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(jc)
June 2, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hottrix LLC and provided to Attorney for service on Defendant(s). (jc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hershey Company v. Hottrix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Harvey Freedenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hottrix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?