Sanders v. Rose et al
Plaintiff: Cyrus R Sanders
Defendant: Emanuel Rose, Hewitt, Counselor "Jill, DeRose, Dauphin County Prison and Unknown Officers
Case Number: 1:2010cv01241
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry 203 ) IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 189 ) is DENIED; 2. The above-captioned case is REFERRED to the Court's Prisoner Litigation Settlement Program. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/12/2021. (ktt)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants motion 158 for summary judgment is GRANTED; and2. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER judgment in favor of Defendants Emanuel Rose, Joann Cryder, Throne, Lt. Hewitt, Jill Cuffaro, and the Unknown Officer, and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/26/17. (rw)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defts motion to clarify (Doc. No. 135) is GRANTED as set forth below. 2. The only claims that remain in this action are (1) the excessive force and failure to intervene claims leveled against Defts Rose, Cryder, Throne and the Unknown Officers, and (2) the procedural and substantive due process claims leveled against Defts Hewitt and Cufarro. All other claims are DISMISSED and all other Defendants terminated from this action. 135 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/17/16. (sc)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the 113 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as noted in the order. Dfts shall file an answer to the remaining claims in the complaint withine 20 days. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/8/16. (sc)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1. Defendants Motion to Strike and Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 76) is granted. 2. Count One of the second amended complaint Denial of Law Library and Access to the Courts is dismissed and all claims set forth therein are dismissed in their entirety. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 4. Any appeal from this order will be deemed frivolous, without probable cause and lacking in good faith.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on Sept. 24, 2013. (sc)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1)Pltf's mtns for injunctive relief ARE DENIED AS MOOT. 39 33 2)Pltf's 64 MOTION to Alter Judgment is construed to be a motion for reconsideration and is DENIED. SEE MEMORANDUM FOR DETAILS. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on March 27. 2013. (sc)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss the amended complaint 23 is granted to the following extent. All counts, with the exception of Count One of the amended complaint (Denial of Access to the Courts), are s tricken in accordance with this Courts Memorandum and Order of March 1, 2011. The motion will also be granted with respect to the access to the courts claim for failure to state a claim pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Plaintiff shall file his ame nded complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order in accordance with the attached Memorandum. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a § 1983 civil rights form complaint for his use in filing the amended complaint. Failure to file a proper amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 10/11/12. (rc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus R Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor "Jill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphin County Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?