Clark Distribution Systems, Inc. v. ALG Direct, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clark Distribution Systems, Inc.
Defendant: ALG Direct, Inc. and Patrick J. Del Monico, III
Case Number: 1:2010cv02575
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying ALG Direct's motion in limine 83 w/out prejudice to ALG's right to object to evidence or argument it believes is improperly offered @ trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/11/14. (ki)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting deft's motion in limine 82 seeking permission to use depo testimony of Patrick Del Monico & Shaun McGuire @ trial by agreement of parties. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/27/14. (ki)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER (Memorandum 129 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. ALG's motion 129 for reconsideration is DENIED.; 2. Judgment is GRANTED in favor of CDS on ALG's 3rd-party complaint in its entirety.; 3. Clrk of Ct directed to DEFER entry of judgment in Sublease case until close of TSA case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/14/14. (ki)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT of the magistrate judge 117 , GRANTING pltf's partial motion to dismiss 94 , & DISMISSING ALG's amended counterclaim 93 with prejudice to the limited extent that it seeks to state a claim for loss of business damages in connection with its counterclaim for breach of contract. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/29/14. (ki)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER (Memorandum 109 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Magistrate Judge's report & recommendation 99 ADOPTED in part & REJECTED in part. ; 1. Pltfs' omnibus motion 65 for summary jdgmt is DENIED (see Paras 2a-b for specifics).; 3. A revised scheduling order setting matter for trial shall issue by future order of court. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/31/14. (ki)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Methvin 70 , DENYING motion to dismiss 58 as to ALG's counterclaim for tortious interference w/ quiet enjoyment (Ct V) & ALG's counterclaim for negligent misrepresentation (Ct VII) which was voluntarily w/drawn is DISMISSED w/out prejudice, & case REMANDED to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for further proceedings. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/11/13. (ki)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying deft ALG Direct's motion to dismiss 41 . (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/27/12. (ki)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting motion to consolidate (Doc 19 in 1:11-CV-1299) Case Nos. 1:11-CV-1299 & 1:10-CV-2575, directing Clrk of Ct to consolidate No. 1:11-CV-1299 into No. 1:10-CV-2575, directing that all future docs to be filed under No. 1:10-CV-2575, & dire cting that CMO in No. 1:11-CV-1299 of 1/19/12 (Doc 18 in 1:11-CV-1299) shall govern conduct of discovery & ddls & trial date for both (consolidated) matters. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/26/12. (ki)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING motion to dismiss 16 w/out prejudice & GRANTING pltf leave to file w/in 20 days of date of this order an amended complaint properly pleading diversity jurisdiction. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/29/11. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark Distribution Systems, Inc. v. ALG Direct, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Distribution Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Stickman
Represented By: Michael A. Farnan
Represented By: Stephen J. Del Sole
Represented By: William S. Stickman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALG Direct, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Engle
Represented By: Alexander D. Kerr, Jr.
Represented By: Elisabeth K. H. Pasqualini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Del Monico, III
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Engle
Represented By: Alexander D. Kerr, Jr.
Represented By: Elisabeth K. H. Pasqualini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?