Landor v. Bledsoe et al
Plaintiff: |
Damon Landor |
Defendant: |
B.A. Bledsoe, B Trate and Hepner |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00759 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Harrisburg Office |
County: |
Union |
Presiding Judge: |
William W. Caldwell |
Presiding Judge: |
Martin C. Carlson |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 16, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - AND NOW, this 16th day of January, 2013, upon consideration of the Report and Recommendation (R&R) of Magistrate Judge Carlson 99 , to which no objections have been filed, and upon independent review of th e record, the court finds no error in the R&R and concludes that the R&R should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that:1. The R&R 99 is ADOPTED. 2. Defendant Hepners motion for summary judgment 76 is GRANTED. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 99 76 Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 1/16/13. (am)
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM OPINION - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs motion for a continuance in order to hire an attorney (Doc. 67 ) and motion to be heard (Doc. 69 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 25, 2012. (kjn)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson - AND NOW, this 17th day of May, 2012, upon con. of the R&R of the mag. judge 65 66 are adopted. 2. Plf.'s mtn. for a prel. injunc. 61 is DENIED. 3. Defts.'s mtn. to dismiss, or in the alternative, for SJ 33 , is GRANTED. 4. The claims against defts. Bledsoe & Trate are dism'd. w/prejudice. 5. The claims against deft. Hepner are dism'd. w/out prejudice. 6. Plf. may amen d his complt. as to deft. Hepner w/in 20 days of the dt. of this order. 7. The above-capt. case is remanded to the mag. judge for further proceedings, including a R&R on dispositive mtns., if necessary. (See order) B Trate, B.A. Bledsoe and Hepner terminated.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 5/17/12. (am, )
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff's second request to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 12/16/11. (rc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?