B. v. The Paradise Protectory and Agricultural School, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick B.
Defendant: Roman Catholic Diocese of Harrisburg, The Paradise Protectory and Agricultural School, Inc., Paradise School for Boys, Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, Inc. and Lincoln Intermediate Unit No. 12
Case Number: 1:2011cv00927
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dfts' Mtns to Dismiss 46 and 47 as follows: 1. Defendant LIUs motion (Doc. 47) is GRANTED as to Dfts statute of limitations argument. To the extent that Pltfs claims in Counts I and I I implicate the IDEA and Section 504, Pltf is barred from seeking relief from any alleged loss, deprivation, or damage allegedly caused by these FAPE violations that occurred prior to May 13, 2009.2. The mtns are DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 08/06/12 (ma, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1. Pltfs mtn to alter or amend judgment 31 isGRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to reopen this case.2. Pltfs mtn for leave to file an amended complaint 33 is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to file the amended complaint attached to Pltfs memorandum of law in support of Pltfs mtn for leave to file an amended complaint. 34 3. Dfts shall respond to the Amended Complaint in accordance with the FRCP.4. Pltfs mtn to supplement the record 37 is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 03/30/12 (ma, )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1. Dft LIUs motion for leave to file a supplemental brief (Doc. 28 ) is DENIED;2. Dft LIUs proposed supplemental brief (Doc. 29 ) is STRICKEN from the docket;3. Dfts mtns to dismiss (Docs. 18 & 20 ) are GRANTED;4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/10/11. (ma, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. v. The Paradise Protectory and Agricultural School, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Diocese of Harrisburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paradise Protectory and Agricultural School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise School for Boys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Intermediate Unit No. 12
Represented By: Jennifer N. Donaldson
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick B.
Represented By: Dennis C. McAndrews
Represented By: Michael E. Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?