Tenon v. Dreibelbis et al
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Tenon
Defendant: William Dreibelbis, Ronald Long, Josh Mahuut, Sean Tyson and Doctor Agawal
Case Number: 1:2012cv01278
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum; 1. Pltfs mtn in limine 133 is granted in part and denied in part.2. Granted as to Pltfs 2001 convictions and those convictions are excluded from evidence at trial.3. Denied as to Pltfs 2005 convict ions.4. Dft may present evidence of Pltfs 2005 convictions. The evidence shall be limited to the number of the convictions, not the names or descriptions of the offenses, that qualify as convictions under Fed. R. Evid. 609(a)(1). Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/26/17. (ma)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 128 : 1. The mtn 113 for summary jgmnt of dft Dr. Ramesh Agarwal is granted.2. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of dft Dr. Ramesh Agarwal and against Pltf.3. The mtn 115 for summa ry jgmnt of dft Dr. Donald Long is granted in part and denied in part.4. Dr. Longs mtn is granted as to the claim based on untimely surgery and the Clerk of Court shall enter jgmnt in Dr. Longs favor and against Pltf on the untimely jaw surgery claim.5. In all other respects, Dr. Longs mtn is denied.6. This case is scheduled for the July 2017 trial term.7. All pretrial mtns shall be filed by 6/9/17.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 4/12/17. (ma)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING 93 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Doctor Agawal. Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/7/16. (pw)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: 1. The magistrate judges R & R 66 is adopted. 2. The motion 46 for summary judgment filed by Dft Long is GRANTED. 3. The mtn 50 for summary judgment filed by Dft Dreibelbis is GRANTED.4. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Dfts Long and Dreibelbis and against Pltf.5. The Clerk of Court shall close this file. Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 11/7/13. (ma)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS/ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt. AND NOW, this 17th day of December, 2012, upon consideration of the report and recommendation (R&R) of Magistrate Judge Blewitt 20 , to which no ob jections have been filed, and upon independent review of the record, the court finds no error in the R&R and concludes that the R&R should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: 1. The R&R 13 is adopted. 2. Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claims of denial of medicalcare may proceed against Defendants Dreibelbis and Long. 3. The following claims are dismissed with prejudice: a. Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claims of denial of medical care against Defendants Mahuut, Tyson, and Agawal. b. Plaint iffs state law negligence claims against all Defendants. c. Plaintiffs request for declaratory relief, seeking a declaration that Defendants past conduct violated his constitutional rights. d. Plaintiffs request for compensatory and punitive damages, to the extent that Plaintiff seeks such damages against Defendants in their official capacities. 4. This case is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, including service of Plaintiffs amended complaint on Defendants Dreibelbis and Long, and furtherincluding an R&R on any dispositive motions that may be filed thereafter. 1 Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 12/17/12. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenon v. Dreibelbis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Tenon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dreibelbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Mahuut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Agawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?