United States of America v. Sollenberger et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Avery Sollenberger, Dena Sollenberger, Teltec Enterprises and Sunny Isles Fiduciary Fund
Case Number: 1:2012cv01488
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: US's motion for confirmation of sale & distribution of proceeds 127 - 1. Sale of real property @ 15 Villa Vista, Hanover, PA, to Thomas Danner for $224,000 confirmed.; 2. US shall convey by deed property @ 15 Villa Vista, Hanover, PA, to T. Danner.; 3. Clerk of Ct shall distribute funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows... (see Paras 3a-c for specific instructions).; 4. Sale of property @ Ram Drive Lot 16, Hanover, PA (Parcel #08K-0154G -00) to Joseph Myers for amt of $185,000 confirmed.; 5. US shall convey by deed property @ Ram Dr Lot 16, Hanover, PA to J. Myers.; 6. Clrk of Ct shall distribute the funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows... (see Paras 6a-b for specific instructions); 7. Sale of real property @ 786 Richland Rd, Dysart, PA, to Shawn Ratchford, Jr. for amt of $70,000 confirmed.; 8. US shall convey by deed property located @ 786 Richaland Rd, Dysart PA to S. Ratchford, Jr.; 9. Clrk of Ct shall distribute funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows... (see Paras 9a-b for specific instructions). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/15/18. (ki)
April 4, 2018 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion 122 & confirming sale of real property @ 35 Villa Vista, Hanover, PA, directing US to convey property @ issue by deed to Kin Fan Lam & Xiao Lin Lam, & directing Clrk of Ct to distribute funds deposited into its registry as follows... (see Paragraphs 3a, 3b & 3c for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/3/18. (ki)
February 21, 2018 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: gov't's motion for confirmation of sall & distribution of proceeds 119 , ORDERING that sale of real property @ 85 N. Allwood Dr., Hanover, PA to Gary Massicot for amt of $30K confirmed, US to convey by deed property � 64; isse to Christopher Wayne Massicot & Amanda Lindsay Massicot, & directing Clrk of Ct to distribute funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows... (see Paras 3a-b for specific instructions). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/21/18. (ki)
January 31, 2018 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: gov't's motion for confirmation of sale & distribution of proceeds 117 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Sale of real property @ 95 N. Allwood Dr., Hanover, PA for amt of $85000 confirmed.; 2. US convey by deed real pro perty @ issue to Adam Michael Massicot.; 3. Clrk of Ct distribute the funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows: a. $1,793.21 payable to US Treasurey c/o John M. Kennedy, IRS P.A.L.S., 191 Main St., Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 to cover costs of sale, b. Remaining $83,206.79 made payable to US Treasury, c/o Beatriz T. Saiz, PO Box 227, Washington DC 20044 in partial satisfaction of jdgmt entered in case against defts Avery & Dena Sollenberger, Gary Sollenberger, Wendell Sollenberger & Design Concepts Company. ( See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/31/18. (ki)
August 9, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing Sollenberger's letter 113 as motion for reconsideration & DENYING same as so construed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/9/17. (ki)
July 14, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Fishers' motion 107 for ext of time, directing that the Fishers shall vacate the property located @ 35 Villa Vista Ave, Hanover, PA, no later than Thursday, 8/17/17, & directing that, except as noted herein, the balance of the ct's order 93 of foreclosure & sale remains in full force & effect & is unaltered by the ct's disposition of the Fishers' motion. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/14/17. (ki)
July 13, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendants' motion 99 for TRO & preliminary injunction. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/13/17. (ki)
February 4, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing Sollenbergers' response 88 as Rule 59(e) motion for reconsideration of the ct's 12/15/15 order & jdgmt 87 & DENYING as so construed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/4/16. (ki)
December 15, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & JUDGMENT (Memorandum 86 filed previously as separate docket entry) granting MSJ 59 , JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of United States & against defts w/ monetary jdgmt entered in following amts plus penalties, interest & stat additions accruing after 7/1/15 - a. Avery Sollenberger & Dena Sollenberger $1,247,169.50; b. Gary Sollenberger $1,724,296.76; c. Wendell Sollenberger $1,749,010.95; d. Design Concepts Co. $1,220,456.15, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order & jdgmt for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/15/15. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sollenberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brittney Campbell
Represented By: Beatriz T. Saiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Sollenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Sollenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teltec Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Isles Fiduciary Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?