Abney v. Younker et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Abney
Defendant: Caleb Younker, Robert Brooks, Nathan Lehman, Richard Snyder, Justin Hills, D. Hartman, William Mallery, Marie Everly, Waylon Yarnell, Christopher Bumbarger, James Booher, Matthew Huber, Rex Wertz, S. Harker, M. Maxwell, Stevens, Tabb Bickell and John or Jane Does #1-3
Case Number: 1:2013cv01418
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: Judge Carlsons report and recommendation (Doc. 251) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY and Plaintiffs objections to the report and recommendation (Doc. 252) are OVERRULED. Pla intiffs motion for summary judgment (Doc. 219) is DENIED. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 227) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A status conference is scheduled for February 27, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss future proceedings in t his case. The conference will be by telephone. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call by calling chambers at (717) 221-3970 after all parties are on the line. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/30/2020. (ve)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), IT IS ORDERED THAT, in light of Defendants failure to demonstrate Plaintiffs non-exhaustion of administrative remedies, Counts 1, 2 and 4 of Plaintiffs complaint may proceed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT this case is recommitted to Magistrate Judge Carlson for further pretrial management. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/12/18. (rw)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motions for reconsideration, (Docs. 152 and 155 .) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 4, 2016. (kjn)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to file a supplemental complaint (Doc. 130 ), is DENIED. A telephonic case management conference will be held in the above-captioned case on May 6, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. The Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 18, 2016. (kjn)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties motions for sanctions, (Docs. 105 and 136 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 15, 2016. (kjn)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the R&R is ADOPTED. Dfts Motion for Summary Judgment and 104 Motion for Leave to File a Statement of Facts are DENIED. This action is REFERRED back to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for Pretrial Management. 98 112 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/24/16. SEE ORDER. (sc)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1.MJ Schwabs R&R (Doc. No. 95) is ADOPTED; 2.Plaintiffs objections (Doc. No. 97) are OVERRULED; 3.Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 52) is GRANTE D IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 4.Counts III and V of Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. No. 1) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 5.The above-captioned action is referred back to MJ Schwab for further proceedings. 52 95 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/4/15. (sc)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Magistrate Judge Schwabs Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 47) is ADOPTED; 2. Defendants motion to partially dismiss the complaint (Doc. No. 10) is DENIED; and 3. All further proceedings in this matter including pending motions are referred to Magistrate Judge Schwab. 47 10 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/7/14. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abney v. Younker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Abney
Represented By: Marianne Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Younker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Lehman
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Everly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waylon Yarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bumbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Booher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabb Bickell
Represented By: Gregory R. Neuhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does #1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?