Merrion v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Merrion
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc., Prison Health Services, Inc., PHS Correctional Healthcare, Robert Maxa, Beverly O'Rourke, Rhonda Sherbine, Dennis Parlavecchio, Renato Diaz, Gaye Gustitus, David Ahner, John Lisiak, Nelson Iannuzzi and Richard Andreuzzi
Case Number: 1:2013cv01757
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Forest
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Blewitt
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM re dfts' MOTION for Summary Judgment 82 (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 02/19/15. (ma)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: 1. The magistrate judges report 45 is REJECTED in part andADOPTED in part. 2. The portion of the mjs report that recommends Pltfsclaims against Dfts Maxa, ORourke, Sherbine, Parlavecchio, Prison HealthServices, Inc., and PHS Correctional Hea lthcare be dismissed, is REJECTED.3. Pltfs mtn to strike 40 Dfts Exhibit A [37-1] is GRANTED.4. Dfts mtn to dismiss Counts I and II of the amended complaint with respect to Dfts Diaz, Gustitus, Lisiak, Iannuzzi, Andreuzzi, Maxa, ORourke,Sherbine, P arlavecchio, Prison Health Services, Inc., and PHS Correctional Healthcare is DENIED.5. Pltfs damages claims against the individual dfts in their official capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.6. Dfts mtn to dismiss Pltfs claims for punitive damages against the individual dfts in their personal capacities is DENIED. 7. This case is placed on the March 2014 trial list, which begins 3/10/14, scheduling order to follow.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 12/23/13 (ma)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS/ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt. AND NOW, this 29th day of August, 2013, upon consideration of the report and recommendation of the magistrate judge 19 ,filed August 1st, 2013, and the objections that were filed, it is ordered that:1. The magistrate judges report 19 is REJECTED in part and ADOPTED in part.2. The portion of the magistrate judges report that recommended Plaintiffsclaims against Defendants Diaz, Gustitus, Ahner , Lisiak, Iannuzzi, Andreuzzi, Corizon Health, Prison Health Services, and PHS Correctional Healthcare be dismissed without prejudice, and that Plaintiff be given leave to file an amended complaint, is ADOPTED. 3. The magistrate judges report is REJE CTED in all other aspects. 4. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Maxa, ORourke, Sherbine, and Parlavecchio are dismissed without prejudice. 5. Plaintiff has twenty (20) days to file an amended complaint. 6. This above-captioned case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings, including a Report and Recommendation on dispositive motions, if necessary. 1 Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 8/29/13. (See order for more details.) (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrion v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Merrion
Represented By: Shelley L. Centini
Represented By: Barry H. Dyller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHS Correctional Healthcare
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Maxa
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly O'Rourke
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Sherbine
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Parlavecchio
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renato Diaz
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaye Gustitus
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ahner
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Meredith A Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lisiak
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Iannuzzi
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andreuzzi
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?