McSparran v. Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: Patricia McSparran
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection, Kelly Heffner and Jeffrey Logan
Case Number: 1:2013cv01932
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 132 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/19/18 (jam)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - AND NOW, this 11th day of January, 2018, upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion 139 to alter or amend the summary judgment order of February 24, 2017 (Doc. 130), under Fed. R. Ci v. P. 59(e), it is ordered that: 1. The motion is GRANTED in part. 2. The order is VACATED as to (a) the discharge claims under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment, Title VII, and PHRA; and (b) the retaliation claim. 3. The motion is DENIED as to the remaining claims.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 1/11/18. (dmn)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum 127 filed this date; Pltfs mtn forreconsideration 105 of our order of 2/18/16, granting Dfts mtn in limineexcluding e-mails involving Tom Bold, is denied. Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 2/24/17. (ma)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM re Mtns for Protective Order 63 , in Limine To Exclude Emails 65 and for Exttm and to Take Pltf's Deposition 75 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 2/18/16. (ma)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM re Dfts' MOTION to Dismiss 19 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 04/08/14. (ma)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: 1. The motion 7 to dismiss is granted, and theComplaint 1 is hereby dismissed. 2. Pltf is granted leave to file an amended complaint setting forth her (1) equal-protection claim, (2) Title VII claim,(3) PHRA claim, and (4) d efamation claim with adequate factual allegations in accord with the accompanying memorandum. 3. Pltf shall comply with paragraph 2 of this order within (21) days of its date. If Pltf fails to do so, thisaction will be dismissed.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 12/17/13. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McSparran v. Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McSparran
Represented By: Nina B. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Heffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?