Poff v. Prime Care Medical, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joyelle D Poff
Defendant: Prime Care Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03066
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) In accordance with the accompanying memorandum, IT IS ORDERED that PrimeCare's motion 58 to amend/correct is denied and Poff's motion 46 for attorney's fees and costs is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Poff and against PrimeCare in the amount of $88,419.60 for attorneys fees and $6,179.71 for costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/14/2016. (ktt)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/1/2015. (ktt)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- In accordance with the previous memorandum, IT IS ORDERED that Poffs motion 15 for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 3/25/15. (rc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poff v. Prime Care Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyelle D Poff
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?