Kelly et al v. Gas Field Specialists, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Kelly and Todd C. Ray
Defendant: Gas Field Specialists, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re: deft's motion 78 , STAYING execution on order entering jdgmt of 7/5/17 55 & order entering jdgmt of 7/25/17 pending deft's appeal from the 8/8/15 & 7/5/17 jdgmts & APPROVING supersedeas bond in amt of $2,500,000.00 issued by Fidelity & Deposit Co of MD as surety on behalf of deft. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/9/17. (ki)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER & JUDGMENT granting pltfs' motion 66 & directing Clrk to enter jgmt - JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of pltfs & against deft as follows: a. Deft Gas Field Specialists, Inc., shall pay to the Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 520 Health & Welf are Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 520 Pension Fund & Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 520 Anhjuity Fund $37,033.75 as reasonable attys' fees; and b. Deft Gas Field Specialists, Inc., shall pay to the Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No . 520 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 520 Pension Fund & Plumbers & Pipefitters Local No. 520 Annuity Fund $10,770.09 as costs incurred. (See order & jdgmt for complete details) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/25/17. (ki)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER & JUDGMENT (Memorandum 54 filed previously as separate docket entry) - JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of the Funds & against Gas Field as follows: a. Gas Field shall pay to Pension Fund following amts: $646,021.14 in delinquent contributions, $96,903.17 in liquidated damages & $184,608.17 in interest; b. Gas Field shall pay to Annuity Fund following amts: $248,055.66 in delinquent contributions, $37,208.35 in liquidated damages & $70,993.25 in interest; c. Gas Fi eld shall pay to Health & Welfare Fund following amts: $648,467.35 in delinquent contributions, $97,270.10 in liquidated damages & $185,893.68 in interest. - The Funds may file any petition for attys' fees & costs w/in 20 days of date of this order in acc w/ FRCP 54(d) & Local Rules of court. (See order & jdgmt for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/5/17. (ki)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (Memorandum 35 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING the Funds' MSJ 21 , DENYING Gas Field's MSJ 27 , DEFERRING entry of jdgmt pending determination on issue of damages, & directing parties to meet & confer to deve lop appropriate schedule for further proceedings & to submit joint proposed schedule to court by 8/28/15 - if unable to agree, individual proposed schedules to be submitted. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/18/15. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Gas Field Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Kelly
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd C. Ray
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gas Field Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?