FARKAS v. RICH COAST CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: |
ABBEY FARKAS |
Defendant: |
RICH COAST CORPORATION, JULIE O. UFEMA and LANCE J. UFEMA |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00272 |
Filed: |
February 14, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Harrisburg Office |
County: |
Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
John E. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 28, 2017 |
Filing
256
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The aspect of plaintiffs omnibus motion (Doc. 243 ), which seeks our recusal is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 28, 2017. (kjn)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
251
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 247 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Plaintiff's Omnibus Motion filed by JULIE O. UFEMA. We recognize, however, that the plaintiff should be afforded an opportunity to file a reply brief addressing the merits of her omnibus motion. Accordingly, Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, in support of Farkas omnibus motion shall be filed on or before December 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 12, 2017. (kjn)
|
December 15, 2016 |
Filing
150
MEMORANDUM ORDER - 1. The plaintiffs motion for leave to file a sur-reply instanter, (Doc. 145 .), while deemed unnecessary, is GRANTED. 2. The plaintiffs motion to strike (Doc. 141 .) is DENIED. 3. The plaintiff shall file any cross motion for summary judgment, along with any substantive response to the defendants motion for partial summary judgment on or before January 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 15, 2016. (kjn)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
140
MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Ufema defendants motion to compel the plaintiff to produce the single document withheld in response to document requests 9 and 10 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 9, 2016. (kjn)
|
September 6, 2016 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 116 First MOTION to Compel Discovery on Plaintiff for Production of Documents filed by JULIE O. UFEMA. IT IS ORDERED that the dfts motion to compel (Doc. 116 ), is GRANTED, in part, as follows: 1. On or before October 10, 2016, the pltf will prepare and produce to the court and opposing counsel a comprehensive privilege log describing in detail all documents which have been withheld and the basis forassertion of any privilege. 2. Upon receipt of th is privilege log, the parties will then confer regarding any privilege claims, and on or before October 24, 2016, the dfts shall move to compel the production of any remaining disputed records. If no such motion is filed, the court will conclude that all aspects of documentary discovery are now closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 6, 2016. (kjn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?