Smithson v. Rizzo et al
Plaintiff: |
Christian M. Smithson |
Defendant: |
Mariah Brittany Rizzo, Kendra Marie Saxe, Cody Allen Nickol, Virgil Ray Polston, Tpr. Jeffrey M. Gotwals, Justin Dembowski, Pennsylvania State Police Department, York County District Attorney's Office and York County Public Defender's Office |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01866 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Harrisburg Office |
County: |
York |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M. Blewitt |
Presiding Judge: |
Yvette Kane |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
48
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defs Jonathan Burnham, Matthew Hamilton, Jeffrey Gotwals, andthe Pa State Polices motion to dismiss the re-filed complaint (Doc. No. 34) is GRANTED; 2. Pltf Christian M. Smithsons claims against Defs JonathanBurnham, Matthew Hamilton, Jeffrey Gotwals, and the Pa State Police (Doc. No. 33), are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 3. Pltf Christian M. Smithsons motion for issuance of subpoena (Doc. No. 38), is DENIED AS MOOT. 34 38 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/29/16. (sc)
|
April 8, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. MJ Blewitts R&R is ADOPTED; 2. Plfs objections are OVERRULED; 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate the case docketed as 1:14-cv-1867 into the ca se docketed as 1:14-cv-1866, and to close the case docketed as 1:14-cv-1867; 4. Defts motions to dismiss are GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: a. Pltfs claims against the Pa State Police and for money damages under the Pennsylvania Constitution are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; b. The remainder of Pltfs claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 5. Pltfs motions for summary judgment are DENIED; 6. Pltfs motions requesting that the Court hold a hearing are DENIED; 7. Pltfs motions to remove mistitled earlier motions requesting habeas relief are DENIED AS MOOT; 8. Defts motions to stay sumjgm are DENIED AS MOOT; 9. Pltfs motions to remove Deft York County Public Defenders Office are DENIED AS MOOT; 10. Pltfs motion to exceed page limitation is DENIED AS MOOT; and, 11. The Clerk of Court is also directed to close the consolidated case docketed at Civil Action No. 1:14-cv-1866. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/7/15. (sc) 30 23 28 29 21 18 13 2 25 (sc)
|
April 7, 2015 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/7/2015. (sc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?