Alston v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Plaintiff: Alson Alston
Defendant: The Pennsylvania State University, The Trustees of the Pennsylvania State University, Eric J. Barron, The Dickinson School of Law of the Pennsylvania State University, Gary S. Gildin, Office of Student Aid of the Pennsylvania State University, Anna M. Griswold and Susan A. Bogart
Case Number: 1:2014cv02480
Filed: December 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that 1. MJ Carlsons R&R (Doc. No. 37) is ADOPTED; 2. Defts motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 27) is GRANTED; 3. Pltfs substantive due process, procedural due process, equal protec tion, federal statutory, and other federal claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4. The remainder of Pltfs amd complaint (Doc. No. 25), is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to timely re-filing them in an appropriate state court; and 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 25 37 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/6/16. (sc)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED;2. Plaintiffs emergency motion f or a temporary restraining order (Doc. No.5) is DENIED AS MOOT; 3. Plaintiffs amended motion for a TRO (Doc. No. 14) is DENIED; 4. The United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of Plaintiffscomplaint (Doc. No. 1) on Defendants. 2 5 14 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/12/15. (sc)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alson Alston, Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/9/2015. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alson Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pennsylvania State University
Represented By: Chena L. Glenn-Hart
Represented By: John A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of the Pennsylvania State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dickinson School of Law of the Pennsylvania State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Gildin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Student Aid of the Pennsylvania State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M. Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan A. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?