Keiser v. The Borough of Carlisle
Plaintiff: Michael T. Keiser
Defendant: The Borough of Carlisle
Case Number: 1:2015cv00450
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in party 79 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Inadmissible Opinion Testimony filed by The Borough of Carlisle. SEE MEMO & ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 18, 2017. (kjn)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Boroughs motion to exclude certain speculative testimony of current and former employees and Linda Ciccolello as more fully described in the motion (Doc. 77 .) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 14, 2017. (kjn)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Mark Malarich, (Doc. 69.), is DENIED. 69 Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 9/13/2017. (sc)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 61 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OR ANY EVIDENCE RELATING TO CRIMINAL COMPLAINTS OR CHARGES FILED AGAINST PLAINTIFF filed by Michael T. Keiser. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 11, 2017. (kjn)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 59 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS BOROUGH MANAGERS CLERGY STATUS filed by Michael T. Keiser. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 1, 2017. (kjn)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall meet and confer to develop a mutually convenient proposed pre-trial and trial schedule. The parties shall submit the proposed schedule to the court on or before Friday, March 10, 2017. The court shall convene a telephone conference with the parties on Wednesday, March 15, 2017, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 2/24/2017. (ktt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keiser v. The Borough of Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Keiser
Represented By: Solomon Z. Krevsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Borough of Carlisle
Represented By: Brian P. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?