McDowell v. DeParlos et al
Plaintiff: Reuben McDowell
Defendant: Kevin DeParlos, Brad Shoemaker, Harry Entz, Josh Rogers, Mike White, Ryan Barns, Travis Scrobel, Johnson and Lycoming County Prison
Case Number: 1:2015cv00487
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Lycoming
Presiding Judge: PT
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: (1) The Report and Recommendation 72 is ADOPTED in full;(2) Dfts mtns to dismiss 51 and 67 the amended complaint are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; (3) Pltfs requests for declaratory or injunctive relief are sua sponte DISMISSED as MOOT;(4) Pltfs claims against Warden Deparlos, Corrections Officers Stroble and Johnson, Sergeant White, and Lieutenant Rogers are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim;(5) Pltfs Fourteenth Amendment due process claims against Deputy Warden Shoemaker, Lieutenant Entz, and Counselor Barnes, concerning the denial of an impartial disciplinary hearing, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim;(6) Pltfs Fourteenth Amendment due process claims concerning Special Manage ment Unit (SMU) cell conditions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim;(7) Pltfs Fourteenth Amendment due process claims concerning the denial of the assistance of a staff representative in preparing a defense to disciplinary charg es, and the failure to produce investigatory reports for review by that staff representative, are the only claims permitted to proceed;(8) This matter is remanded to M.J. Saporito for further proceedings.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 3/27/17. (ma)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)DENYING Doc. 45 motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/15/16. (ms)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: 1. MJ Saporitos R&R 40 is ADOPTED.2. Dfts mtn to dismiss 32 is GRANTED.3. Pltfs complaint 1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.4. Pltf has (30) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint.5. This matter is remanded to MJ Saporito for further proceedings, including the resolution of Pltfs pending mtn for exttm 42 .Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 2/3/16. (ma)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM re. mtn to appt cnsl 4 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 03/26/15. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell v. DeParlos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin DeParlos
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Shoemaker
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Entz
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Rogers
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike White
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Barns
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Scrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming County Prison
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Represented By: Austin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?