Federal Trade Commission et al v. Penn State Hershey Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Penn State Hershey Medical Center and Pinnaclehealth System
Case Number: 1:2015cv02362
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: John E. Jones
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:0053
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)1. The Commonwealths Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (doc. 143) is DENIED.2. Defendants Motion to Strike (doc. 152) a letter filed to the docket bythe Commonwealth (doc. 151) is obviated by the Commonwealths Notice (doc. 154) informing the Court that it has withdrawn that same letter. Accordingly, Defendants Motion to Strike (doc. 152) is TERMINATED. 3. The Clerk of the Court SHALL CLOSE the file on this case. (eo)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AND NOW, this 30th day of March 2016, IT IS ORDERED that on or before April 8, 2016, the plaintiffs shall file a fully unredacted complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 30, 2016. (kjn)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this witness identity also be disclosed, subject to the series of reasonable and prudent caveats previously imposed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 29, 2016. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Penn State Hershey Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: William H Efron
Represented By: Ryan F. Harsch
Represented By: Jared P Nagley
Represented By: Jonathan W Platt
Represented By: Gerald A Stein
Represented By: Geralyn J. Trujillo
Represented By: Nancy Turnblacer
Represented By: Theodore Zang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Aaron L Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Thomson
Represented By: Tracy W. Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn State Hershey Medical Center
Represented By: William D Coglianese
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Kenneth W. Field
Represented By: Julia E. McEvoy
Represented By: Kimberly A. Selemba
Represented By: Toby G. Singer
Represented By: Christopher N Thatch
Represented By: Adrian Wager-Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnaclehealth System
Represented By: William D Coglianese
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Kenneth W. Field
Represented By: Julia E. McEvoy
Represented By: Kimberly A. Selemba
Represented By: Toby G. Singer
Represented By: Christopher N Thatch
Represented By: Adrian Wager-Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?