Korth v. Estate of Mark Botts et al
Plaintiff: Gary L. Korth
Defendant: Estate of Mark Botts, Oliver Township Police Dept., Joseph R. Baker, Jill Hoover, Ralph Lesh, III and Oliver Township
Case Number: 1:2015cv02422
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 64 . 1. The dft's mtn forsummary judgment 48 is granted.2. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of dft Hoover and against Pltf on Count 1, the excessive force claim, and Count 5, the state-law claim for assault and battery.3. The Clerk of Court shall close this file.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 10/16/17. (ma) (Main Document 65 replaced on 10/16/2017) (ma).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 40 ; 1. Dfts mtn 33 for a protective order and/or order clarifying remaining claims, treated as a motion for judgment on the pleadings, is granted.2. Judgment is entered against Pltf and in favor of the dfts on Count 4 of the second amended complaint.3. Dfts Oliver Township and Joseph Baker are dismissed from this action.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/20/17. (ma)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM re dfts' MOTION to Dismiss 19 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 10/3/16. (ma)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM re dfts' MOTION to Dismiss 8 Pltf's Amended Complaint (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/2/16. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korth v. Estate of Mark Botts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L. Korth
Represented By: Roger R. Laguna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Mark Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Township Police Dept.
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Baker
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Hoover
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Lesh, III
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Township
Represented By: W. Darren Powell
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?