Davenport v. Mabus et al
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Davenport
Defendant: Ray Mabus and Department of the Navy
Case Number: 1:2016cv00494
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)The plaintiffs motion for leave of court to file a second amended complaint, (Doc. 57), is GRANTED IN PART and, DENIED IN PART.(See order for details) Second Amended Complaint due by 11/15/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/4/19. (bs)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) the plaintiffs motion for reconsideration, (Doc. 49), is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/11/19. (bs)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)(1)the MSPBs Final Decision sustaining the plaintiffs removal from her position with the Navy due to her inability to perform her job and denying the plaintiffs affirmative defense of failure to accommodate is AFFIRMED; and(2)JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff with respect to Count I of the plaintiffs amended complaint.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/8/19. (bs)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 30 ; 1. Pltfs mtn to sever 23 is granted.2. The parties shall litigate Count I before litigating Count II.3. Within (30) days of the date of this order, Pltf shall file theadmin record, accompanied by a brsup on Count I.4. Within (21) days of receipt of Pltfs brief, Dft may file an bropp.5. Within (14) days of receipt of Dfts brief, Pltf may file a reply brief. Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 11/14/17. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Mabus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Davenport
Represented By: Ralph B. Pinskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mabus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?