Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Angino Law Firm, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Angino Law Firm, P.C., King Drive Corp., A La Carte Enterprises, Inc., Blue Mt. Golf Club, Inc., Richard C. Angino and Alice K. Angino
Case Number: 1:2016cv00713
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER (Memorandum 94 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING defts' motions for "reconsideration en banc and/or a new trial 70 , for recusal 74 , to "reopen the dockets and remove judgments" 75 & to "strike and/or vacate judgments 85 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/9/19. (ki)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER & JUDGMENT (Memorandum 68 previously filed a separate docket entry) - JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of pltf Branch Banking & Trust Companty & against defts as follows: a. Principal & interest due on line of credit note in amt of $600,000 (pr incipal) & $57,741 (interest) plus any interest accrued since 6/15/18.; b. Principal & interest due on term loan note in amt of $9,174.41 (principal) & $4,274.46 (interest) plus any interest that has accrued since 6/15/18.; c. Late cha rges in amt of $9,161.56.; d. Appraisal fees in amt of $14,000.; e. Attys' fees & costs in amt of $163,865.30 & $5,431.94, respectively.; 2. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case. (See order & jdgmt for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/18. (ki)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying defts' motion 40 for sanctions. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/2/18. (ki)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER dismissing defts' motion for jdgmt on partial findings 42 as premature w/out prejudice to defts' right to assert same after the close of pltf's case in chief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/15/18. (ki)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (Memorandum 27 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING BB&T's MTD 20 counterclaims & strike jury demand & directing that jury trial demand is STRICKEN from defts' answer 16 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/07/16. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Angino Law Firm, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Clayton W. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angino Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Drive Corp.
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A La Carte Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mt. Golf Club, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Angino
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice K. Angino
Represented By: Richard C. Angino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?