Johnson v. Wetzel et al
Plaintiff: |
Arthur Johnson |
Defendant: |
John Wetzel, Shirley Moore-Smeal, Michael Wenerowicz, Brenda Tritt, James Meintel and Anthony Kovalchik |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00863 |
Filed: |
May 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Harrisburg Office |
County: |
Schuylkill |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher C. Conner |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
71
ORDER - JOINT STEP DOWN PROGRAM FOR ARTHUR JOHNSON 70 approved by the court. (See order for complete details)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/30/16. (ki)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
68
ORDER (Memorandum 67 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Johnson's motion for PI 3 is GRANTED.; 2. Subject to development & implementation of program set forth in Para 3... defts PRELIMINARILY ENJOINE D from maintaining Johnson in solitary confinement in RHU. ; 3. Parties DIRECTED forthwith to meet & confer to devlop app step-down program for Johnson's reintegration into general population... (see Para 3 for specific instructions).; 4. By 9/2 8/16 parties to submit jt prop step-down program for ct's review & app or if unable to agree to submit separate props.; 5. Step-down program.. shall@ minimum... (see Paras 5a-c for specific instructions).; 6. In event defts determine that J ohnson's reintegration must be delayed for reasons of his own safety or safety of others.... defts to document in detail reasons for delay & submit documentation to ct forthwith.; 7. Ct finds relief granted hereinabove narrowly drawn, exts no fu rther than necessary to correct harm req'ng relief & is least intrusive means necessary to correct that harm...; 8. Johnson's motion 60 to unseal testimony of Siena Smith GRANTED. Clrk of Ct shall UNSEAL transcript 63 of her testimony & parties' prop findings of fact & conc of law 65 & 66 forthwith. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/20/16. (ki)
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER re: Johnson's motion to compel discovery 39 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion DENIED w/ re: Boyd & Perez email.; 2. Subject to req'mt that all cnsl execute prop conf order prepped by defts & reviewed by undersigned, motion oth erwise conditionally GRANTED.; 3. Upon execution by parties of defts' prop conf agmt & filing of same w/ ct defts shall forthwith produce to Johnson's cnsl in unredacted form the following:... (see Paras 3a-3i for specifics).; 4. Violation of anticipated conf agmt by any party thereto may result in impositio of appropriate sanctions. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/10/16. (ki)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER (Memorandum 45 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING & DEFERRING portions of motion to compel discovery 39 as set forth in Paragraphs 1, 2, 3 & 4 of order (... see for specifics) & directing cnsl for defts to produce docs id& #039;d in Paras 1, 2 & 3 above as well as Integrated CAse Summary -Classification & Inmate Query - Separations for in camera review by ct by no later than nooonon 8/9/16... together w/ statement by Sec Wetzesl id'ng... nature & source of threat posed by disclosure... as well as prop order or conf agmt to govern any production or disclosure of said docs. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/5/16. (ki)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?