Wisniewski v. Frommer et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Wisniewski
Defendant: James F. Frommer, Jr., Andrew J. Dancha and Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01626
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 75 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Thomas Wisniewski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 19, 2018. (kjn)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: 1. The Court ADOPTS the R and R 56 , of M.J. Carlson;2. The CCS Dfts Mtn to Dismiss 40 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;3. The DOC Dfts Mtn to Dismiss 44 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;4. The federal claims asserted in Pltfs Second Amended Complaint (Count II),are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE;5. The remaining state law claims in the Second Amended Complaint (Counts I, III, and IV), are REMANDED back to the Huntington County Court of CommonPleas; and6. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/31/17. (ma)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation 35 , of Magistrate Judge Carlson; 2. The CCS Defendants Motion to Dissolve Injunction (Doc. No. 3-1), is GRANTED without prejudice to P laintiffs ability to renew a request for preliminary injunctive relief should the facts of this case materially change; 3. Plaintiffs motion for sanctions (Doc. No. 2-6), is DENIED; 4. Defendants Motion 22 for Leave to File a Post-Hearing Brief as Response is DENIED as MOOT; and 5. This matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Carlson for further pretrial management. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/24/17. (rw)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 11 Motion for extension of time in which to file an amended complaint. This amended complaint will be filed on orbefore September 19, 2016. Having discussed with the parties their competing motions in state court relating to preliminary injunctive relief, the Court will schedule a hearing on these motions for August 23, 2016 at 11:00 a.m., in Courthouse 5, U.S. Courthouse, Harrisburg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 16, 2016. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisniewski v. Frommer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wisniewski
Represented By: Marianne Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Frommer, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Dancha
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?