Fields et al v. Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives et al
Plaintiff: Brian Fields, Paul Tucker, Deana Weaver, Scott Rhoades, Joshua Neiderhiser, Pennsylvania Nonbelievers, Inc., Dillsburg Area Freethinkers and Lancaster Freethought Society
Defendant: Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Parliamentarian of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives and Representatives For Pennsylvania House Districts 92, 95, 97, 193, and 196
Case Number: 1:2016cv01764
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 JUDGMENT - Summary judgment be and is hereby ENTERED in favor of Defendants, SPEAKER OF THE PENNSYLVANIA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, ET AL., and against Plaintiffs, BRIAN FIELDS, ET AL., on all aspects of Plaintiffs Establishment Clause claim (Count 1 of the Complaint), in accordance with the courts order 123 , dated October 1, 2019. (See jdgmt for complete details.)Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/01/19. (ki)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying House's motion 114 for stay of injunction. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/16/18. (ki)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER (Memorandum 109 filed previously as separate docket entry) re: MSJs 77 & 80 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltfs' MSJ 77 is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part, as follows: 1. Summary jdgmt GRANTED in pltfs' favor on thei r Establishment Clause challenges to the guest chaplain policy & pre-2017 opening invocation practices of the PA House of Representatives., b. Summary jdgmt DENIED as to pltfs' Establishment Clause claim re: the current House opening invocation practices.; 2. Defts' MSJ 80 is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part as follows: a. Summary jdgmt GRANTED in defts' favor on pltfs' Establishment Clause claim re: the current House invocation practices., b. Summary jdgmt for defts DENIED in all other respects.; 3. It is ORDERED & DECLARED that House's guest chaplain policy & pre-2017 opening invocation practices are unconstitutional in violation of Establishment Clause of 1st Amendment to US Constitution & continuance & enforce ment thereof permanently ENJOINED.; 4. Clrk of Ct shall enter declaratory jdgmt in pltfs' favor on the Establishment Clause claims, brought pursuant to 42 USC 1983, challenging House's guest chaplain policy & pre-2017 opening invocation pra ctices. Clrk of Ct shall enter jdgmt on defts' favor on pltfs' Establishment Clause claim challenging the current House opening invocation practices.; 5. Clrk of Ct shall thereafter close this case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/29/18. (ki)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying defts' motion 84 to extent it seeks leave from responsive obligation under Rule 56.1 but granting to extent it requests that ct strike pltfs' noncompliant Rule 56.1 stmt, striking pltfs' stmt of mat'l facts 79 for noncompliance w/ Rule 56.1, directing pltfs to w/in 14 days of today's date to file amended stmt of mat'l facts complying w/ Rule 56.1.. (see Para 3 for specifics), & directing that defts' opp br & responsive Rule 56.1 stmt to be filed w/in 21 days of svc of pltfs' Rule 56.1 stmt. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/7/18. (ki) Modified on 2/7/2018 to correct typo error (ki).
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting pltfs' motion 62 to amend complaint, directing pltfs to file amended complaint & effect svc on added defts as req'd by L.R. 15.1(a). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/11/17. (ki)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER (Memorandum 51 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING in part & DENYING in part defts' MTD 31 as follows... (see Paras 1a-d), DISMISSING Cts II, III & IV of complaint w/ prejudice, DISMISSING Ct I of complaint only to ext ent Ct can be read to assert coercion claims o/b/o pltfs other than Fields & Rhoades, directing action shall proceed on Ct I as follows... (see Paras 4a-b), & noting ct will issue case mgmt schedule by separater order. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/28/17. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields et al v. Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fields
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tucker
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Weaver
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rhoades
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Neiderhiser
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Nonbelievers, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillsburg Area Freethinkers
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lancaster Freethought Society
Represented By: Carmen N Green
Represented By: Eric O. Husby
Represented By: Richard B. Katskee
Represented By: Alex J. Luchenitser
Represented By: Allen C. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Represented By: Johnathan F. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parliamentarian of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Represented By: Johnathan F. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Representatives For Pennsylvania House Districts 92, 95, 97, 193, and 196
Represented By: Johnathan F. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?