WARTLUFT et al v. THE MILTON HERSHEY SCHOOL AND SCHOOL TRUST et al
Plaintiff: Julie Ellen Wartluft and Frederick L. Bartels, Jr.
Defendant: The Milton Hershey School And School Trust, The Milton Hershey School Trust, The Board Of Managers Of The Milton Hershey School and The Hershey Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv02145
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the names of the individuals published in the district courts summary judgment opinion Dr. Benjamin Herr, Mic Stewart, Heather Teter, Dr. Jeannette Morales-Brandt, Dr. Lidija Petrovic-Dovat, and Dr. John Gavazz i be unredacted from the documents we have unsealed pursuant to our March 6, 2020 Orders (Docs. 349 , 350 ). As stated in our prior orders regarding these documents, counsel shall confer and tender copies of stipulated, redacted records to the clerk for release on the public docket within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 3, 2020. (kjn)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Doc. 293), isDENIED.2. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 297), isGRANTED.3. The Clerk of the Court SHALL CLOSE the file on this case.4. F. Frederic Fouads First Motion to Intervene, (Doc. 334), isDENIED as moot.(eo)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER gramtomg 303 MOTION to Unseal Judicial Records filed by The Philadelphia Inquirer, PBC. Implementation of this order will be STAYED for 10 days in order to allow the litigants the opportunity to review th e courts order and seeks further judicial review of this order, if they deem it appropriate. Furthermore, with respect to redacted records, if the parties do not seek further review of this decision, they shall tender copies of stipulated, redacted records to the clerk for release on the public docket within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 6, 2020. (kjn)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 266 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Judicial Records filed by The Philadelphia Inquirer, PBC. 1. The Inquirers motion to intervene is GRANTED. 2. Documents 127, 135, 160, 161, 173, 174, 176, and 196 ar e provisionally ordered unsealed, subject to redactions by the defendants within 45 days to protect the private interests of nonparties, or alternatively, the defendants may make a particularized showing of good cause for the continued sealing of the se documents. The Inquirer is then permitted within 14 days to challenge any redactions it deems insufficient or any showing of good cause made by the defendants. We will then conduct a document-by-document analysis of the remaining disputed documents.3. Document 203-1 shall remain sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 22, 2019. (kjn)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER (Memorandum 216 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltfs prev dismissed tort claims REINSTATED as follows... (see Paras 1a-b for specifics); 2. If pltfs choose to amend they shall file 2nd amended compl aint w/in 14 days of date of this order... in absence of timely filed 2nd amended complaint action shall proceed on amended complaint in acc w/ accompanying memo; 3. Cts 8/10/17 memo & order 62 63 VACATED; 4. Defts motion for jdgmt on pleadings 119 & MSJ 158 DISMISSED w/out prejudice to rt to reinstitute & supp said motions @ request of parties; 5. Joint motion 215 in supp of stip to ext case mgmt ddls DISMISSED as moot... parties to meet & confer & file joint prop scheduling order amending current case mgmt ddls 171 by 12/28/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/7/18. (ki)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the further discovery sought in this case (Docs. 172 and 180 ) is STAYED pending the resolution of the pending dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 31, 2018. (kjn)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The further discovery sought in this case is STAYED pending the resolution of the pending dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 24, 2018. (kjn)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by The Milton Hershey School And School Trust, The Milton Hershey School Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 21, 2018. (kjn)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM ORDER - 1. On or before August 1, 2018, the plaintiffs shall provide the court and opposing counsel with a comprehensive privilege log. 2. In addition, on or before August 8, 2018, the plaintiffs shall provideto the court, for its in camera inspection unredacted and redacted copies of all responsive documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 12, 2018. (kjn)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting defts' motion 134 for leave to file docs & mat'ls designated "confidential" under seal 135 pursuant to ct's protective order. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/18/18. (ki)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 60 MOTION to Compel filed by The Milton Hershey School And School Trust, The Hershey Trust Company, The Board Of Managers Of The Milton Hershey School, The Milton Hershey School Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 19, 2017. (kjn)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying pltfs' motion 81 to certify matter for interlocutory review. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/10/17. (ki)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER (Memorandum 62 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING MTD 31 Counts III, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI & XII, DISMISSING Counts III, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI & XII of amended complaint 29 w/ prejudice, & directing defts to respond to amended complaint in acc w/ Rules of Civil Procedure. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/10/17. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARTLUFT et al v. THE MILTON HERSHEY SCHOOL AND SCHOOL TRUST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ellen Wartluft
Represented By: Gregory F. Cirillo
Represented By: John J. Higson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick L. Bartels, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory F. Cirillo
Represented By: John J. Higson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milton Hershey School And School Trust
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milton Hershey School Trust
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board Of Managers Of The Milton Hershey School
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?