Holloway v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Holloway and Raymond Holloway, Jr.
Defendant: Lynch, Thomas E. Brandon, Loretta Lynch and James B. Comey
Case Number: 1:2017cv00081
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 90 JUDGMENT of USCA Reversing and Remanding Order/Judgment of the District Court as to #88 Notice of Appeal, filed by Loretta Lynch, James B. Comey, Thomas E. Brandon. ( Caitlyn)
November 27, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to #84 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),,, Terminate Motions,, by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Feldon, Gary)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting joint motion #86 to stay request for attorney fees & costs. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/3/18. (ki)
October 2, 2018 Filing 86 Joint MOTION to Stay REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
October 1, 2018 Filing 85 JUDGMENT- SUMMARY JUDGMENT be & is hereby ENTERED in favor of pltf RAYMOND HOLLOWAY, JR., & against defts JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, Attorney General of the United States, THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT be & is hereby ENTERED in favor of pltf RAYMOND HOLLOWAY, JR., & against defts JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, Attorney General of the United States, THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, & the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as follows: It is ORDERED and DECLARED that the felon-in-possession ban of 18 U.S.C. 922(g)(1) is unconstitutional as applied to plf Holloway, in violation of the 2nd Amendment to the U.S. Constitution. Defts, together with all those acting in concert w/ them are ENJOINED from enforcing, directing enforcement, or permitting enforcement of the felon-in-possession ban of 18 U.S.C. 922(g)(1) against Holloway, in acc w/ this courts memo & order Docs. #83 [84), dated 9/28/18. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/01/18. (ki)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER (Memorandum #83 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING pltf's MSJ #58 , DENYING defts' MTD, etc. #60 , ORDERING & DECLARING that felon-in-possession ban of 18 USC 922(g)(1) is unconstitutional as applied to pltf in violation of 2nd Amend to US Constitution - Defts... ENJOINED from enforcing, directing enforcement, or permitting enforcement of said ban against pltf, directing Clrk of Ct to enter declaratory jdgmt in pltf's favor on 2nd Amendment Claim.... in acc w/ Para 3, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case thereafter. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/18. (ki)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: #58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr., #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Loretta Lynch, James B. Comey, Thomas E. Brandon (See memo for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/18. (ki)
July 20, 2018 Filing 82 DOCUMENT SEALED - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (ve)
July 20, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch to #59 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute. (Feldon, Gary)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting join motion #79 to stay scheduling order pending disposition of MSJs. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/16/18. (ki)
April 11, 2018 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Stay SCHEDULING ORDER PENDING DISPOSITION OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
March 1, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting defts' motion #74 for ext of time & leave to exceed page limit for defts' reply in supp of MTD w/ reply due by 3/1/18 & reply br not to exceed 20 pp or 6,667 words. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/21/18. (ki)
February 21, 2018 Filing 74 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extension of Reply Brief Deadline, Consent MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation in Reply Brief by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order C, #2 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
February 20, 2018 Filing 73 REPLY BRIEF re #58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) N-Q)(Kraut, Adam)
February 9, 2018 Filing 72 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) I-M, #2 Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Objections to Expert Report)(Kraut, Adam)
February 5, 2018 Filing 71 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting motion for ext of time #68 for pltf to file response to MSJ by 2/9/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/1/18. (ki)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting joint motion #67 for leave to file brief in excess of word & page limits. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/1/18. (ki)
January 31, 2018 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' MSJ by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
January 31, 2018 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF IN EXCESS OF WORD AND PAGE LIMITS by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting joint motion #65 for leave to file briefs with incorporated references. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/30/18. (ki)
January 29, 2018 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Leave to File BRIEFS WITH INCORPORATED REFERENCES by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
January 19, 2018 Filing 64 DOCUMENT SEALED. (pjr)
January 19, 2018 Filing 63 DOCUMENT SEALED. (pjr)
January 16, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch re #61 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Errata Redacted Exhibit Index)(Feldon, Gary)
January 16, 2018 Filing 61 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Declaration, #5 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
January 16, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
January 15, 2018 Filing 59 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr.(Kraut, Adam)
January 15, 2018 Filing 58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Redacted, #3 Redacted Statement of Material Facts, #4 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Kraut, Adam)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting defts' consent motion to exceed page limits #54 for their brief in supp of their MSJ. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/10/18. (ki)
January 9, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch re #54 Consent MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion for Summary Judgment (Errata Statement) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
January 9, 2018 Filing 55 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #54 Consent MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch.(Feldon, Gary)
January 9, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 54 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs) - Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
January 9, 2018 Filing 54 Consent MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting pltf's motion #52 for leave to file br in excess of word & page limits in supp of his MSJ. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/9/18. (ki)
January 9, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Word and Page Limits by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kraut, Adam)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - Upon consideration of plaintiff's December 7, 2017 letter to the Court (doc. 50), IT IS ORDERED that the discovery conference call scheduled for December 11, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/8/2017. (ktt)
December 7, 2017 Filing 50 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel re: discovery dispute resolved. (Prince, Joshua)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/5/2017. (ktt)
December 4, 2017 Filing 47 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel re: Discovery Dispute . (Prince, Joshua)
December 1, 2017 Filing 46 Letter from Defendants Re Discovery Disputes. (Feldon, Gary)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/01/2017. (ktt)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING discovery matter per letter #43 of 11/29/17 to Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for resolution. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/30/17. (ki)
November 30, 2017 Filing 43 Letter dated 11/29/17 from Atty Kraut to Court re: discovery dispute. (ki)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re: defts' motion #39 to modify case mgmt order, directing that dispositive motions w/ supp'ng brs due by 1/15/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/29/17. (ki)
November 27, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #39 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch.(Feldon, Gary)
November 27, 2017 Filing 40 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #39 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr.(Kraut, Adam)
November 27, 2017 Filing 39 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER (stipulated #37 ) approved by the court. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/3/17. (ki)
November 3, 2017 Filing 37 APPROVED (per 11/3/17 order #38 of court) - STIPULATION Protective Order by Raymond Holloway, Jr, filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr.(Kraut, Adam) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ki).
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER extending fact discovery ddl to 12/15/2017, directing parties to meet & confer & file stipulated confidentiality agreement by 11/3/17, directing parties to supp discovery responses in timely manner following entry of protective order, directing all parties to produce privilege index in acc w/ Paras 4 & 5 of this order, & directing all parties to exchange privelege indices by 11/15/17. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/2/17. (ki)
October 31, 2017 Filing 34 Letter from Counsel re: Documents 32 and 33. (Prince, Joshua)
October 31, 2017 Filing 33 Emergency MOTION for Hearing , MOTION to Compel Discovery by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch.(Feldon, Gary)
October 31, 2017 Filing 32 Letter from Counsel, dated 10/26/17, re: discovery dispute. (ki)
July 21, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc #30 Memo REPLACED w/ doc correcting typo error in date parenthetical for Binderup cite Page 6; replacement doc re-NEF'd. (ki)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (Memorandum #30 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING defts' MTD #4 , DENYING pltf's MSJ #11 as premature, & DENYING defts' motion #15 to strike pltf's sum jdgmt motion as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/19/17. (ki)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr., #15 MOTION to Strike,, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Loretta Lynch, James B. Comey, Thomas E. Brandon. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/19/17. (ki) (Main Document 30 replaced on 7/21/2017) (ki).
May 25, 2017 Filing 29 Plaintiff's SUR-REPLY to Defendant's REPLY Brief #26 re: Motion to Strike #15 , filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. 5/25/17.(ki)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting pltf's motion #27 for leave to file sur-reply to deft's reply brief & directing Clrk of Ct to file Ex A of pltf's motion as pltf's sur-reply to deft's reply br #26 .(See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/25/17. (ki)
May 24, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Reply Brief (Doc. 26) by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Kraut, Adam)
May 19, 2017 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Premature filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (COMPLEX TRACK) - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial/trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2018 @ 10:00 AM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017; Motions in Limine due by 4/2/18; Non-Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 5/9/2018. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/15/17. (ki)
May 8, 2017 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Feldon, Gary)
May 5, 2017 Filing 22 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #15 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Premature filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Kraut, Adam)
April 24, 2017 Filing 21 Plaintiff's SUR REPLY to Defendants' REPLY Brief #13 re: Defendants' MTD #4 , filed by plaintiff. (ki)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting pltf's motion #14 for leave to file sur-reply to defts' reply br & directing Clrk to file ex A of pltf's motion as pltf's sur-reply to deft's reply br. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/24/17. (ki)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER suspending briefing schedule for pltf's pending MSJ #11 pending disposition of defts' instant motion #15 to deny MSJ as premature or to stay same pending discovery, directing pltf to file br in resp to defts' motion #15 to 5/5/2017 & permitting defts to file reply brief by 5/19/2017. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/24/17. (ki)
April 24, 2017 Filing 18 EXHIBIT Certificate of Service by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch re #16 Brief in Support. (Feldon, Gary)
April 24, 2017 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Certificate of Service by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch re #15 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Premature. (Feldon, Gary)
April 24, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file certificates of service for Docs. 15 & 16. (pjr)
April 21, 2017 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Premature, #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch.(Feldon, Gary)
April 21, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment as Premature by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
April 21, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Reply Brief by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A Sur-Reply)(Kraut, Adam)
April 17, 2017 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch.(Feldon, Gary)
April 13, 2017 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr.(Kraut, Adam)
April 13, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the Brief in Support of Document #11 as a separate entry using the event: Brief in Support. (ve)
April 12, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Brief in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Kraut, Adam)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2017 @ 11:00 AM - placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/10/17. (ki)
April 6, 2017 Filing 9 Plaintiff's AMENDED Exhibit Packet to Plaintiff's Brief #6 in opposition to defts' MTD #4 , filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (per 4/6/17 order #8 of court) (ki)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting pltf's motion #7 for leave to file amended exhibit packet for br in opp to deft's MTD & directing Clrk to file Ex A of pltf's motion as pltf's amended exhibit packet to his br in opp to MTD #6 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/6/17. (ki)
April 6, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File AN AMENDED EXHIBITS PACKET FOR HIS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Motion w/ Exhibits Packet (Exhibits A-C))(Kraut, Adam)
April 3, 2017 Filing 6 AMENDED EXHIBIT PACKET, SEE DOC. #9 (per 4/6/17 order #8 of court) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: SEE AMENDED EXHIBIT PACKET AT DOC. #9 #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-B)(Kraut, Adam) Modified on 4/6/2017 (ki).
March 21, 2017 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
March 21, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 4 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). PLEASE DO NOT REFILE THE MOTION (pjr)
March 20, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/13/17. (ki)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ve)
January 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta Lynch ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-3976170) filed by Raymond Holloway, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A-C)(ve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Brandon
Represented By: Gary D Feldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Gary D Feldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Comey
Represented By: Gary D Feldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Holloway, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J Kraut
Represented By: Joshua G. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?