Gorton et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC, General Refractories Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Morgan Engineering, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Clark Control, Inc., Montfair Industrial Supplies Company, Foseco, Inc., Crouse Hinds Co., John Crane, Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, AT&T, Inc., CBS Corporation, Terex Corporation, Reading Crane & Engineering, Zurn Industries, LLC, DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Air & Liquid Systems Corp., Ford Motor Company, Amchem Products, Inc., Executone Communications Systems, LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, P&H Mining Equipment, Inc., Rockbestos-Suprenant Corp., GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, United Technologies, Schneider Electric, Viacom, Inc., HB Fuller Company, Mobil Oil Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Marmon Group, LLC, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, ABEX Corporation, The Okonite Company, Lorain Crane, McCormick Asbestos Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hobart Brother Company, Allied-Signal, Inc., U.S. Industries, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, M&F Worldwide Corporation, Nevada Bell Telephone Company, American Crane, The Rockbestos Company, Reunion Industries, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Bendix Corporation, Aztec Communications Inc., Cutler-Hammer, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., The Rockbestos Wire & Cable Company, AT&T Communications of Ohio, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T California, Carborundum Company, Alliance Machines, MCIC, Benjamin Foster, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Martin Marietta Corporation, Square D Company, Crane Packing Company, Fairmont Machinery Company, Morgan Crane, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Hobart Brothers Company, Keeler Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company c/o CT Corporation doing business as AT&T California and Nevada Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T Nevada doing business as AT&T Nevada
Cross Defendant: American Refractories, Pfizer, Inc., Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Weil-McLain, Cooper Industries, The Kerite Company, Thomas D. Gorton, II, Fairmont Supply Company, Columbus McKinnon Corporation, The Lincoln Electric Company, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., AT&T Communications Inc., Crane Company, Ferro Engineering, Mobil Corporation, Pnumo-Abex Corporation, General Electric Company, Corhart Refractories Co., Certainteed Corporation, Universal Refractories, A.O. Smith Corporation, Eaton Corporation, Nevada Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T Nevada and PH Mining Equipment, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Essex Group, J.H. France Refractories Company and CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation
Amicus Curiae: Rhonda J. Gorton
Special Master: Judge Russell M. Nigro
Case Number: 1:2017cv01110
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to #616 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #617 Judgment by Rhonda J. Gorton. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number APAMDC-6330587. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Duncan, Jason)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE: The hearing previously set for 6/15/2023 at 2:00 PM is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/6/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Kim, Laura)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 617 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, and against plaintiff Rhonda J. Gorton, personal representative estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and in her own right. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/6/2023. (Kim, Laura)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting #595 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/6/2023 (Kim, Laura)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 615 OPINION re #595 MOTION for Summary Judgment. An appropriate order and judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/6/2023. (Kim, Laura)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Praecipe to Substitute Exhibit R to Answer to Statement of Facts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) R)(Duncan, Jason)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #613 Motion to Continue Deadlines for the reasons set forth in the motion. The videoconference motion hearing re: Warren Pumps' pending motion for summary judgment is reset from 4/5/2023 to 6/15/2023 at 2:00 p.m. All trial deadlines will be set at the conclusion of that hearing, if necessary. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (km)
March 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Unopposed MOTION to Continue All Pretrial Deadlines and Trial by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Praecipe to Substitute Exhibits M and N to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) M, #2 Exhibit(s) N)(Scheets, Joshua)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 611 STATEMENT OF FACTS .(Scheets, Joshua)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 610 REPLY STATEMENT OF FACTS re #609 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) T, #2 Exhibit(s) U)(Scheets, Joshua)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 609 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #595 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Scheets, Joshua)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The telephonic hearing set for today, 2/21/2023, at 2:00 p.m. is hereby cancelled. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/21/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (km)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The videoconference hearing re: Warren Pumps' motion for summary judgment set for 3/30/2023 at 2:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 4/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m. The court will email counsel for Warren Pumps and Mrs. Gorton the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (km)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the counsel the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (km)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Daubert Hearing proceedings held on July 2, 2020, before Judge Honorable Joy Flowers Conti, United States District Judge. Court Reporter Deborah Ann Betzler of Pittsburgh, PA. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023. (jw)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 607 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #595 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #596 Statement of Facts, filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 605 SECOND AMENDED SUMMARY JUDGMENT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re WARREN PUMPS: Response due 2/13. Reply due 2/27. CCSMF due 3/9/2023. Hearing on motion 3/30/2023 at 2:30 p.m. via videoconferencing. The court will email the counsel the login information for the videoconference. All other pretrial deadlines are terminated and will be rescheduled, if necessary, on 3/30/2023 at the conclusion of the hearing.. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter.(km)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE OF COMPARISON CHART RE: RADM SARGENT'S REPORT AND DECLARATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Scheets, Joshua)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 1/31/2023 at 02:30 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the counsel the dial-in information for the telephone call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (km)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 603 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #601 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend pretrial deadlines and continue trial . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Scheets, Joshua)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 602 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #601 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend pretrial deadlines and continue trial . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Patrick)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference re: #601 set for 1/24/2023 at 11:30 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the counsel the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (km)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 601 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend pretrial deadlines and continue trial by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linsenbach, Lauren)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Image for Main Document for Doc. #600 Pretrial Memorandum REPLACED, Electronic Notification REISSUED to preserve parties' First Free Look; (ep)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 600 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Scheets, Joshua) (Main Document 600 replaced on 1/19/2023) (ep).
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Designation of Discovery Depositions to be used at trial. (Reilly, Patrick)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 598 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Reilly, Patrick)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on July 9, 2020, before Judge Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Court Reporter Jane Proud in the Western District of PA. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2023. (jw)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 596 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #595 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O)(Scheets, Joshua)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 595 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S)(Scheets, Joshua)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re SUMMARY JUDGMENT superseding #591 . Motion 1/6/2023. Response 1/20/2023. Reply 1/29/2023. Combined Concise Statement of Material Fact 2/6/2023. Hearing on motion for summary judgment set for 2/15/2023 at 03:30 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2022. (McGee, Katie)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference (Eaton and Warren Pumps) and Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Warren Pumps) are hereby both set for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will address the motion for summary judgment first and then conduct the pretrial conference. (McGee, Katie)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 AMENDED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER superseding #592 : Jury selection and trial set for 2/27/2023 at 9:30 a.m. through 3/3/2023 and 3/6/2023 through 3/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference, including hearing on motions in limine, set for 2/10/2023 02:00 PM via videoconferencing. The court will email the counsel the information to connect to the videoconference. Dates for filing pretrial statements, motions in limine, objections to exhibits, voir dire, verdict slip, and jury instructions set forth herein. Directions for submitting exhibit book set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2022. (McGee, Katie)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury selection and trial set for 2/27/2023 at 9:30 a.m. through 3/3/2023 and 3/6/2023 through 3/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference, including hearing on motions in limine, set for 2/10/2023 02:00 PM via videoconferencing. The court will email the counsel the information to connect to the videoconference. Dates for filing pretrial statements, motions in limine, objections to exhibits, voir dire, verdict slip, and jury instructions set forth herein. Directions for submitting exhibit book set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2022. (McGee, Katie)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion 1/6/2023. Response 1/20/2023. Reply 1/29/2023. Combined Concise Statement of Material Fact 2/6/2023. Hearing on motion for summary judgment set for 2/15/2023 at 03:30 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2022. (McGee, Katie)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kevin Hexstall Signed electronically by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2022. (jw)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for tomorrow 11/29/2022 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will provide the dial-in number for the call. If the parties settle the case, they should inform the court of the same prior to the call. The parties should otherwise be prepared to address next steps in the case, e.g., summary judgment, experts, trial. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Letter from Defense Counsel . (Depfer, Joan)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation before the Hon. Sandra Mazer Moss. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/20/2022. (McGee, Katie)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case management conferences set for 11/8/2022 are hereby rescheduled for 11/29/2022 at 11:00 a.m. The dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. The parties should be prepared to discuss next steps in case, e.g., summary judgment, trial, experts. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference re: #587 and #588 set for 10/20/2022 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Mediation. (Duncan, Jason)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Letter from Defendants Warren Pumps and Eaton Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gardner Denver #569 for the reasons set forth in the accompanying opinion #585 . Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2022 (McGee, Katie)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion for summary judgment filed by Gardner Denver #569 will be GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2022. (McGee, Katie)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER denying Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eaton #567 for the reasons set forth in the accompanying opinion #583 . Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2022 (McGee, Katie)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 OPINION setting forth the reason the motion for summary judgment filed by Eaton #567 will be DENIED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2022. (McGee, Katie)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the parties (plaintiff, Warren Pumps, Eaton) the dial-in information for the call. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the next steps in the litigation. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie) Modified on 10/17/2022 to make available to public. (McGee, Katie).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: At the status conference on 9/20/2022, the parties were ordered to file a notice of the date time and location of the mediation, which is to be conducted by the end of October, on or before 10/3/2022. Having missed that deadline, the parties shall file the notice at or before 5:00 p.m. on 10/14/2022. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/13/2022. (McGee, Katie)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings in Gorton v. Warren Pumps case: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/20/2022 11:45 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti to discuss: (1) whether fact discovery is closed; and (2) mediation. The court will email the counsel the dial-in information for the call. Telephone Status Conference at the close of expert discovery set for 12/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti to discuss, among other things, the filing of dispositive motions. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 582 STATEMENT OF FACTS .(Depfer, Joan)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 STATEMENT OF FACTS of Defendant Eaton Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 581 deleted per counsel's request. Document to be refiled. (aaa)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS of Plaintiff.(Depfer, Joan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #567 MOTION for Summary Judgment FIled on Behalf of Eaton Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS .(Depfer, Joan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #569 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Gardner Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #569 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Gardner Denver filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #570 Document Filed filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #567 MOTION for Summary Judgment FIled on Behalf of Eaton Corporation filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #568 Document Filed filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 3:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for today, 5/3/2022, at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court emailed the counsel the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Duncan, Jason)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #571 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file the Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment by 5/6/2022. Defendants shall file any reply brief by 5/20/2022. The concise statement of material facts shall be filed by 5/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/25/2022 (McGee, Katie)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Replies to any Responses by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Statement of Material Facts not in dispute in support of GDI MSJ . (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Depfer, Joan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Gardner Denver. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J)(Depfer, Joan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Concise Statement of Material Facts Of Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Depfer, Joan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MOTION for Summary Judgment FIled on Behalf of Eaton Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING DATES FOR THE FILING OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motions due 4/11/2022. Responses due 4/25/2022. Replies due 5/9/2022. JOINT combined concise statements of material fact due on 5/19/2022. The parties must comply with all requirements set forth in this order. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/5/2022. (McGee, Katie)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kevin Hexstall is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5904307., filed by on behalf of All Defendants.(Depfer, Joan)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re: WARREN PUMPS LLC: Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 03:30 PM via telephone before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the parties a dial-in for the call. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/4/2022. (McGee, Katie)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti for plaintiff and defendants Eaton and Gardner Denver. The court will email the parties the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER--pursuant to order to show cause dated 2/18/2022--denying as withdrawn #477 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as withdrawn #480 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/4/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 3/4/2022 why the motions for summary judgment #477 and #480 should not be denied as withdrawn based upon the representations by plaintiff's counsel that those defendants, i.e., Crane Company and Schneider Electric, intended to withdraw those motions. If those defendants fail to respond on or before 3/4/2022, the motions will be automatically denied as withdrawn by those defendants. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/10/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ECF 422 , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Scheets, Joshua) Modified on 2/9/2022 (jw).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for 2/10/2022 at 02:45 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The dial-in information remains the same as it was for the last conference. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel . (Duncan, Jason)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER: On or before 2/7/2022, plaintiff shall file on the docket notice update re: #477 and #480 and whether those motions will be withdrawn by those defendants. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/2/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Carolyn Schweizer is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5828903.. (Depfer, Joan)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 JUDGMENT in favor of HB Fuller Company against Rhonda J. Gorton, as a personal representative for the Estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and for herself. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 JUDGMENT in favor of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation against Rhonda J. Gorton, as a personal representative for the Estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and for herself. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 JUDGMENT in favor of Cooper Industries against Rhonda J. Gorton, as a personal representative for the Estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and for herself. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 JUDGMENT in favor of RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc. against Rhonda J. Gorton, as a personal representative for the Estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and for herself. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 JUDGMENT in favor of The Kerite Company against Rhonda J. Gorton, as a personal representative for the Estate of Thomas D. Gorton, II, and for herself. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022. (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting #479 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #482 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #486 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #489 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #491 Motion for Summary Judgment. Appropriate and separate judgments will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/25/2022 (McGee, Katie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference re: Motions for Summary Judgment #480 , #483 , and #488 set for 2/10/2022 at 11:30 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The dial-in for the call is the same as it was for 1/12/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren S Linsenbach on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Linsenbach, Lauren)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The hearing scheduled for 1/12/2022, will be conducted via TELEPHONE. The court will email the counsel for plaintiff and Warren Pumps the dial-in information for the call. Any other interested party should obtain the information from those counsel. The parties should be prepared to discuss settlement and the status of all pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/10/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER denying as moot motion for entry of default #526 in light of #527 and #550 . Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/7/2022 (McGee, Katie)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER granting #529 Motion to Vacate and vacating default judgment entered against Warren Pumps #527 for the reasons set forth in the accompanying opinion. On or before 1/24/2022, plaintiff Rhonda J. Gorton shall cause the service of the second amended complaint upon Warren Pumps, and, within 21 days of the date of service, Warren Pumps shall respond to the second amended complaint in accordance with the Federal Civil Rules of Procedure. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/7/2022 (McGee, Katie)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 OPINION setting forth the reasons the motion to vacate default judgment #529 will be GRANTED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/7/2022. (McGee, Katie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A hearing on the MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default #529 is hereby scheduled for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The hearing will take place via Zoom video conference. The court will email the counsel the Zoom link for the hearing. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Turlik, John)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #529 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default.(Scheets, Joshua)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Entry 546 was deleted and refiled by counsel as 547. (ibr)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: granting motion for leave to file a reply brief #543 and denying as moot the first motion for leave to file a reply brief #541 in light of the court granting #543 . The reply brief shall be filed on or before 11/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 545 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joshua D. Scheets, ECF Doc #538. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/9/2021. (jw)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Defendant Eaton's and Plaintiff's Combined Concise Statement of Material Facts . (Depfer, Joan)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 543 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Vacate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Depfer, Joan)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.'s and Plaintiff's Combined Concise Statement of Material Facts . (Depfer, Joan)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment #539 . The motion for summary judgment #503 will be terminated as withdrawn pursuant to this order and as requested in the motion to withdraw. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/5/2021 (McGee, Katie)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 541 First MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion to Vacate.(Depfer, Joan)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 540 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #529 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default by Warren filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MOTION to Withdraw #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #506 Statement of Facts, #521 Reply Brief, #522 Statement of Facts, #504 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric.(Rideout, Christina)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 538 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Joshua D. Scheets is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5738148.. (Depfer, Joan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Eaton Corporation's Reply to Platinff's Statement of Other Material Facts in Support of its Opposition to Def Eaton'sMotion for Summary Judgment . (Depfer, Joan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 536 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT Of Defendant Eaton's re #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Reply of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc to Plaintiff's responsive statement of material facts . (Depfer, Joan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 REPLY in Support, re: #483 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: On or before 11/1/2021, plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to vacate entry of default #529 . Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 533 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #483 MOTION for Summary Judgment Gardner Denver, Inc. filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #484 Document Filed filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 531 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment Eaton Corporation filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re #509 Statement of Facts filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Depfer, Joan)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Appearance (Depfer, Joan)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Warren Pumps, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/21. (rw)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MOTION for Entry of Default Warren Pumps, LLC by Rhonda J. Gorton.(Duncan, Jason)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference re: the parties' summary judgment submissions set for 9/30/2021 AT 12:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email lead counsel the dial-in information for the call to be shared amongst the parties. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #476 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #510 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting #511 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment. The motions for summary judgment #349 #492 and #495 will be terminated as withdrawn pursuant to this order and as requested in the motions to withdraw. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 9/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS of Gardner Denver, Inc. filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 . (Depfer, Joan)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Combined Concise Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, In Support of MSJ of Deft Gardner Denver, Inc. #483 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Depfer, Joan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 522 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #521 Reply Brief filed by Schneider Electric.(Rideout, Christina)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 521 REPLY BRIEF re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schneider Electric.(Rideout, Christina)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 520 REPLY BRIEF re #483 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Defendant Eaton's Reply to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Opposition to its Concise Statement of Material Facts. (Depfer, Joan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 518 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendant Eaton's re #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting #512 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file the responses to motions for summary judgment on or before 6/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/2021 (McGee, Katie) Modified on 6/4/2021 to change date to 6/1/2021. (McGee, Katie).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 516 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment Eaton Corporation filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s), #31 Exhibit(s), #32 Exhibit(s), #33 Errata, #34 Exhibit(s), #35 Exhibit(s), #36 Exhibit(s), #37 Exhibit(s), #38 Exhibit(s), #39 Exhibit(s), #40 Exhibit(s), #41 Exhibit(s), #42 Exhibit(s), #43 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 515 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #480 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment Schneider Electric filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 514 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Replies to any Responses filed by Rhonda J. Gorton.(Duncan, Jason)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 513 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #483 MOTION for Summary Judgment Gardner Denver, Inc. filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F, #9 Exhibit(s) G, #10 Exhibit(s) H, #11 Exhibit(s) I, #12 Exhibit(s) J, #13 Exhibit(s) K, #14 Exhibit(s) L, #15 Exhibit(s) M)(Duncan, Jason)
May 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Replies to any Responses by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MOTION to Withdraw SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MOTION to Withdraw #492 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law, Proposed order, certificate of service certificate of service.(Fitzpatrick, John)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 509 STATEMENT OF FACTS By Defendant Eaton. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit A, #2 Appendix Exhibit B, #3 Appendix Exhibit C, #4 Appendix Exhibit D, #5 Appendix Exhibit E)(Depfer, Joan)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 STATEMENT OF FACTS by Cooper Industries. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit A, #2 Appendix Exhibit B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 STATEMENT OF FACTS by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit A, #2 Appendix Exhibit B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #504 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s))(Rideout, Christina)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 STATEMENT OF FACTS by The Kerite Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit A, #2 Appendix Exhibit B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 504 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schneider Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s))(Rideout, Christina)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric.(Rideout, Christina)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 502 BRIEF IN SUPPORT By Defendant Kerite re #479 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 501 BRIEF IN SUPPORT By Defendant Cooper Industries re #486 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cooper Industries.(Depfer, Joan)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 500 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Of Defendant RSCC Wire & Cable LLC re #482 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 499 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendant Eaton re #488 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 498 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #491 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation.(Kellner, Leland)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #495 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #495 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. re #492 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law, Proposed order, certificate of service.(Fitzpatrick, John)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 493 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #492 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law, Proposed order, certificate of service . (Fitzpatrick, John)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to REFILE their Brief in Support as to documents #477 , #479 , #480 , #482 , #483 , #486 , #488 , #491 and #492 as a separate document using the civil event: Motions and Related Filings > Responses and Replies (Briefs) > Brief in Support. Counsel is also advised to REFILE document [480-1], Statement of Facts using the event: Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Other Answers/Response to Habeas Petition > Statement of Facts. (rw)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law, Proposed order, certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Statement Statement of facts with appendices)(Fitzpatrick, John) (Main Document 492 replaced on 11/15/2021) (jw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2021) (jw).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Certificate of Service)(Kellner, Leland)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #489 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Concise Statement of Facts . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cooper Industries.(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Concise Statement of Facts by Cooper Industries. . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Statement of Material Facts not in dispute, in support of MSJ . (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.. Concise Statement of Facts. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Rideout, Christina)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Concise Statement of Facts by The Kerite Company. . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B)(Depfer, Joan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Statement)(Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION to Withdraw MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Schneider Electric Attorney Dana Maugeri is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5480762.. (Rideout, Christina)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zurn Industries, LLC (Depfer, Joan)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Terex Corporation (Depfer, Joan)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Mail #470 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Atty Kathryn Johnston (sm)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE Notice of Deposition of Karl Thompson, filed by Rhonda J. Gorton.(Duncan, Jason)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re: SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motions due 4/1/2021. Responses due 5/31/21. Reply due 6/14/21. Combined concise statement of fact due 6/25/21. The court on the record on 1/28/2021 instructed the parties to meet and confer re: the joint filing of common facts. Mr. Fitzpatrick will coordinate. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/28/2021. (McGee, Katie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: As set forth on the record at the hearing on 12/17/2020, a telephonic case management conference to set dates for the filing of summary judgment motions is scheduled for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall meet and confer prior to the conference to discuss an appropriate timeline. The parties will be emailed the dial-in information for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 Mail Returned #468 as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Atty Peter Lejeune (sm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot the #460 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings because the court was informed by plaintiff and AT&T that the case is settled with respect to plaintiff's claims against AT&T. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Order approving stipulation of dismissal as to Borgwarner Morse TEC LLC. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/2/2020. (McGee, Katie)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC by Borgwarner Morse TEC, filed by Borgwarner Morse TEC.(Seelaus, A.)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #460 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings By AT&T Communications, Inc..(Turlik, John)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Clifford Zatz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5279020.. (Turlik, John)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for 12/17/2020 at 11:30 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (McGee, Katie)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REPLY by Rhonda J. Gorton. to Order to Show Cause,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Duncan, Jason)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #460 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings By AT&T Communications, Inc. filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before 10/2/2020, plaintiff via a filing on the docket must show cause why the motion for judgment on the pleadings #460 should not be granted for plaintiff's failure to respond to the motion in accordance with the court's instructions set forth on the record on 7/9/2020. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 9/30/2020.(McGee, Katie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Mail sent #457 to Kathryn L. Johnston. Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward. (kpf)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings By AT&T Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Turlik, John)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Mail Returned (Doc. #456) as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kathryn L. Johnston. (ao)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Mail #454 sent to Peter J. Lejeune. Returned as Undeliverable - Forwarding Time Expired. (kpf)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference with respect to Plaintiff and Defendant AT&T Corp. set for 10/7/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Any outstanding motions with respect to Plaintiff and Defendant AT&T Corp. will be addressed at that time. The case management conference will be conducted via video conferencing. The parties will be provided the dial in information via email. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Turman, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying Motion to Exclude #407 .Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/21/2020. (Turman, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER denying #407 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/21/2020 (Turman, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #438 AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Order Plaintiff to file a Reply to AT&T Corp.'s Answer. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/21/2020 (Turman, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Bakry, Mohamed)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. terminated as a party. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/9/2020. (Turman, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REPLY to Response to Motion re #438 MOTION for Order AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Order Plaintiff to file a Reply to AT&T Corp.'s Answer , filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. Related document: #438 MOTION for Order AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Order Plaintiff to file a Reply to AT&T Corp.'s Answer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Duncan, Jason)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of Thomas D. Gorton, II taken on 5/17/2011(Depfer, Joan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Angela Coll CaliendoSigned by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/2/2020. (mfa)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Wolford, Dennis)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 NOTICE Daubert Hearing Joint Proposed Agenda (Depfer, Joan)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Mail sent #446 to Peter Lejeune. Returned as Undeliverable - Forwarding Time Expired. (kpf)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 REPLY BRIEF re #407 MOTION to Exclude .(Depfer, Joan)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 REPLY BRIEF re #409 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Order Approving Stipulation of Dismissal of Reading Crane & Engineering. Reading Crane & Engineering terminated as a party. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/15/2020. (Conti, Joy)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Mail #441 sent to Peter L. Lejeune. Returned as Forward Time Expired. (kpf)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 STIPULATION of Dismissal . (Gries, Alan)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #440 Motion to Continue: For the reasons set forth in defendant's Motion to Continue Daubert Hearing, the motion is granted. The Daubert Hearing set for 7/1/2020 is hereby rescheduled for 7/2/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Conti. Counsel will be provided dial-in information for the video conference via email. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/9/2020 (jt)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Daubert Hearing by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #409 MOTION to Exclude , #435 MOTION for Joinder , #412 MOTION for Joinder in Eaton Corporation, as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, n/k/a Eaton Electrical, Inc. and Ingersoll Rand Company, in their Motions to Exclude the testimony of Plaintiffs experts Richard Kradin, M.D. and Howard M. Kipen, M, #411 MOTION for Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Richard Kradin, M.D. and Howard M. Kipen, M.D., #407 MOTION to Exclude filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Duncan, Jason)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MOTION for Order AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Order Plaintiff to file a Reply to AT&T Corp.'s Answer.(Turlik, John)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM #432 APPROVED as to Patrick T. ReillySigned by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/20. (Orendi, Carolyn)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 RESPONSE - ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims and Answer to all Crossclaims of Defendant AT&T Corp. (improperly named as AT&T Communications Inc. f/k/a AT&T Communications of Ohio, Inc.. (Turlik, John) Modified on 6/1/2020 (ao).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: The Daubert Hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 7/1/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MOTION for Joinder by Crane Company.(Burke, Lauren)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER: for the reasons set forth on the record during the status conference on 5/28/2020, the Motion in Limine by Mobil Corporation #405 is hereby denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/28/2020. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jt)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Patrick Reilly, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/28/2020. The Daubert Hearing set for 6/3/2020 is hereby rescheduled for 7/1/2020 at 1:30 p.m. via video conferencing before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Dial-in information will be provided to counsel via email. The parties shall meet and confer and notify the court regarding any scheduling issues by 6/10/2020. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Exclude filed by defendant Eaton Corporation #407 and the Motion to Exclude filed by defendant Ingersoll-Rand #409 by 6/2/2020. The parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed agenda for the Daubert Hearing by 6/24/2020. Text-entry only; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jt)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Patrick Reilly is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5104086.. (Depfer, Joan)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 01:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Counsel will be given the dial information via email. (jt)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, CROSSCLAIM Affirmative Defenses and Reply to Cross Claims against All Parties by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STIPULATION AND ORDER approving dismissal of all claims, causes of actions and cross claims against Mobil Corporation. Mobil Corporation terminated. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/5/2020. (Conti, Joy)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation). (Singley, David)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, CROSSCLAIM against AT&T, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Aztec Communications Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Corhart Refractories Co., Crane Company, Essex Group, Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Refractories Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.H. France Refractories Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., McCormick Asbestos Company, Pnumo-Abex Corporation, Reunion Industries, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Kerite Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Weil-McLain, Zurn Industries, LLC by IMO Industries, Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #426 Motion to Extend Time. AT&T may file a Response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint at any time on or prior to June 1st, 2020.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/24/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion to Enlarge Time.(Turlik, John)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Singley, David)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice W. Matthew Reber. (pjr)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Daubert Hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 6/3/2020 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. (Conti, Joy)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #421 Motion to Extend Time. Upon consideration of PlaintiffsMotion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines, and Defendants concurrence thereto, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED.All deadlines are extended by 30 days. The Daubert hearing scheduled for 4/22/2020 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby rescheduled for 6/3/2020 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall inform the court whether they intend to present expert testimony at the hearing. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/14/2020 (Conti, Joy)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Rhonda J. Gorton.(Duncan, Jason)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to for all remaining pretrial deadlines by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #396 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Within two weeks of the filing of the accompanying opinion and this order, Mrs. Gorton, in accordance with the accompanying opinion, shall file her second amended complaint.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/1/2020 (Conti, Joy)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry) setting forth the reasons the #396 Second MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Thomas D. Gorton, II will be GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/1/2020. (Conti, Joy)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order approving Stipulation of Dismissal re: Essex Group (subsidiary of United Technologies) #415 . Essex Group (subsidiary of United Technologies) terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/18/2020. (Conti, Joy)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Order approving Stipulation of Dismissal re: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. #414 . Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. terminated as a party.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/18/2020. (Conti, Joy)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Order approving Stipulation of Dismissal re: Lockheed Martin Corporation. Lockheed Martin Corporation terminated as a party. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/18/2020. (Conti, Joy)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION to Dismiss by Essex Group, filed by Essex Group.(Turner, Tiffany)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MOTION for Joinder in Eaton Corporation, as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, n/k/a Eaton Electrical, Inc. and Ingersoll Rand Company, in their Motions to Exclude the testimony of Plaintiffs experts Richard Kradin, M.D. and Howard M. Kipen, M.D., MPH by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION for Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Richard Kradin, M.D. and Howard M. Kipen, M.D. by Aurora Pump Company.(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #409 MOTION to Exclude filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Exclude by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #407 MOTION to Exclude .(Depfer, Joan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION to Exclude . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #405 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony filed by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Singley, David)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Singley, David)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Order approving re #401 Stipulation of Dismissal re: the dismissal with prejudice of all claims, causes of actions and cross claims against defendant John Crane Inc. from this case. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/18/2020. (Conti, Joy)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER re Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal re: Ford Motor Company. Ford Motor Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/10/2020. (Conti, Joy)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Letter from Counsel re: Liaison Counsel Change . (Turner, Tiffany)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION of Dismissal of John Crane Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ford Motor Company (Greenberg, Julie)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #396 Second MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint .(Turlik, John)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #396 Second MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Greenberg, Julie)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #393 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert discovery related only to Plaintiffs' expert, Howard M. Kipen, MD, MPH, shall be completed by January 31, 2020. Any Daubert Motions shall be filed by February 28, 2020. Daubert Hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/5/2019 (Con)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Second MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance (Depfer, Joan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Ronald)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery .(Turner, Tiffany)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER denying #351 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint for the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/25/2019. (Conti, Joy)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) setting forth the reasons the motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #351 will be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/25/2019. (Conti, Joy)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Rule 26 (a)(1 Disclosure (Turner, Tiffany)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 by John Crane, Inc.. #388 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: bar status verified for petitioner and associate counsel. (rw)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by JONATHAN F TABASKY on behalf of John Crane, Inc. Attorney Tabasky is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4925094.. (TABASKY, JONATHAN)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER re #379 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. The Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company is dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice. All claims by Plaintiff and any and all cross-claims against Defendant, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company is terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/5/2019. (Con)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER re #381 Stipulation of Dismissal. Pfizer, Inc. is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by plaintiff and any and all cross-claims bought against Pfizer, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Pfizer, Inc. terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/05/2019. (Con)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER re #380 Stipulation of Dismissal. MCIC, Inc. is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by plaintiff and any and all cross-claims brought against MCIC, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/5/2019. (Con)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER re #366 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Okonite Company is hereby dismissed from this cases with prejudice. All cross-claims against The Okonite Company are dismissed with prejudice. The Okonite Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/5/2019. (Con)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile document 382 , Petition for Special Admission. Original petition is missing page 3 and the Code of Professional Conduct. (rw)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile document 383 , Petition for Special Admission. Petition 383 is missing page 3 and the Code of Professional Conduct. (rw)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pfizer, Inc.. (Hanna, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STIPULATION of Dismissal by McCormick Asbestos Company. (Hanna, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION of Dismissal 10 day ltr and ltr to Judge Conti by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (McMeekin, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) Supplemental Notice of Service of Expert Witness Report and Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (Singley, David)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE by Essex Group Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (Turner, Tiffany)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE Expert Reports of John Crane Inc. (Turner, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE of service of expert reports (Giangiulio, Tiffany)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. of Fact and Expert Witnesses (Wolford, Dennis)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE by Aurora Pump Company of Expert Witnesses (Hadden, James)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE by McCormick Asbestos Company of Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (Hanna, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 NOTICE by Pfizer, Inc. of Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (Hanna, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) of Service of Expert Report (Singley, David)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE of Service of Expert Witness Statement (Seelaus, A.)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE EXPERT REPORTS (Bruch, G. Daniel)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE by Schneider Electric of Service of Expert Reports (Rideout, Christina)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 STIPULATION of Dismissal by The Okonite Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of Service of Expert Report by Defendant MetLife (Daugherty, Ronald)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement 7.1. (McMeekin, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #361 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Turner, Tiffany)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Plaintiff, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 361. (pjr)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/20/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/22/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 12/3/2019. Daubert Motions due by 1/31/2020. Response to Daubert Motions due 3/5/2020. Daubert Hearing set for 3/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/25/2019. (Con)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER re #357 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report for Naval Records Expert filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. Plaintiff's Expert Report is due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/25/2019. (Con)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 REPLY BRIEF re #357 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and file Naval Expert Report .(Turner, Tiffany)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and file Naval Expert Report by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER re #355 Stipulation. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Morgan Engineering f/k/a Morgan Crane is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, After notice to all interested parties, all claims by plaintiff and any and all cross-claims brought against defendant Morgan Engineering f/k/a Morgan Crane are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/5/2019. (Con)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Morgan Engineering, filed by Morgan Engineering.(Cagnoli, Joseph)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (McShea, John)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #351 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Julie)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: EXPERTS: Daubert hearing set for 1/22/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Pittsburgh. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/10/2019. (Conti, Joy)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN . (Turner, Tiffany)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephonic Status conference set for 4/10/2019 at 11:30 a.m. The parties shall be prepared to discuss whether the stay should be lifted in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Air & Liquid Sys. Corp. v. Devries (decided on 3/19/2019). At or before 12 noon on 4/9/2019, the parties shall file a joint agenda for the telephone call that addresses all matters to be handled by the court and provides a dial-in number for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying without prejudice Motion for Summary Judgment #348 , and denying without prejudice Motion for Summary Judgment #349 . The motions for summary judgment are denied without prejudice because: (1) this matter is stayed; and (2) the parties must receive leave of court to lift the stay and to file motions for summary judgment. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/7/2019. (Conti, Joy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motions to dismiss #302 and #303 ; dismissing without prejudice as parties from the case Ford and AT&T Corp.; permitting Mrs. Gorton within fourteen days of the stay being lifted to file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint; and denying as premature the requests for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/20/2019 (Conti, Joy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) setting forth the reasons: the motions to dismiss #302 and #303 will be granted in part and denied in part; Ford and AT&T Corp. will be dismissed as parties from this case; within fourteen days of the stay being lifted Mrs. Gorton may file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint; and the requests for interlocutory appeal are denied as premature. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/20/2019. (Conti, Joy)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER re #344 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Certainteed Corporation. Base of the foregoing stipulation Defendant, CertainTeed Corporation is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by plaintiff and any and all cross claims and third-party claims brought against defendant CertainTeed Corporation, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/18/2018. (Con) (Main Document 345 replaced on 12/18/2018) (ep).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Certainteed Corporation, filed by Certainteed Corporation.(Fitzpatrick, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER re #341 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant, The Lincoln Electric Company and any cross-claims by Defendants thereto, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Lincoln Electric Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/9/2018. (Con)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER re #340 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant, Hobart Brother Company and any cross-claims by Defendants thereto, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Hobart Brother Company, Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/9/2018. (Con)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding The Lincoln Electric Company. (Santoro, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 STIPULATION of Dismissal regarding Hobart Brothers Company. (Santoro, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER re #334 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ferro Engineering. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Ferro Engineering is DISMISSED from the above- captions matter with prejudice, and all cross-claims against Ferro Engineering are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/8/2018. (Con)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER re #333 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Weil-McLain. Weil-McLain is dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs against any party. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/7/2018. (Con)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 REPLY BRIEF re #302 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO CERTIFY filed by Ford Motor Company.(Greenberg, Julie)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting #331 Motion for Leave to File Rely Brief in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Defendant Ford Motor Company shall file the Reply Brief attached to the Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Ford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended complaint within 5 business days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/6/2018 (Con)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Stay. The Motion is GRANTED, with the exception of Ford Motor Company's and AT&T Corp.'s pending motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Document Nos. #315 & #318 ). It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall place this matter on the Civil Suspense Docket pending the United States Supreme Courts decision in Air & Liquid Systems Corp. v. DeVries, No. 17-1104 (U.S.); It is further ORDERED that all parties are to comply with the ongoing obligation to supplement or correct any disclosure under Rule 26(a) during the stay of proceedings; It is further ORDERED that all existing unexpired case management deadlines and this Courts #287 Case Management Order Summary Judgment, dated July 18, 2018 are hereby vacated. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/6/2018 (Con)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ferro Engineering. (Mullaney, Theresa)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 STIPULATION by Weil-McLain, filed by Weil-McLain.(Turlik, John)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT re #331 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ford's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint.(Greenberg, Julie)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ford's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Julie)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER re #328 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation)is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, all claims by plaintiff and any and all cross-claims and third party claims brought against defendant Pnumo-Abex Corporation, Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/31/2018. (Con)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER re #327 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Joy Global Surface Mining Inc., f/k/a P&H MiningEquipment Inc. is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by co-defendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Joy Global Surface Mining Inc., f/k/a P&H MiningEquipment Inc. terminated. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/31/2018. (Con)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation). (Jasons, Catherine)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Joy Global Surface Mining Inc., f/k/a P&H Mining Equipment Inc.. (Depfer, Joan)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER for the reasons set forth in the Courts Memorandum of March 19, 2018 (ECF No. #259 ) and in order to enforce the Court's Order of March 19, 2018 (ECF No. #260 ) it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Nevada Bell Telephone Company and AT&T, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. Nevada Bell Telephone Company Pacific Bell Telephone Company & AT&T Communications Inc. terminated. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/23/2018. (Con)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #302 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO CERTIFY Amended Complaint filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #303 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #302 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO CERTIFY filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PROPOSED ORDER #313 MOTION to Stay Proceedings . (Fitzpatrick, John)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Letter from Plaintiff regarding voluntary dismissals. (Duncan, Jason)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Proposed Order #260 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,, . (Turlik, John)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #302 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO CERTIFY, #303 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response to Rule to Show Cause filed by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE by Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation) Joint Agenda for Conference on October 16, 2018 (Jasons, Catherine)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court has yet to receive a dial-in number for the conference set for 10/16/2018 at 4:00 p.m. The parties forthwith, i.e., before 4:00 p.m. today, shall provide a dial-in number to the court. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/15/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION for Joinder of Defendant Ford Motor Company to Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Response to Air Liquid's Motion to Stay Proceedings by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Julie)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer, Inc..(Hanna, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McCormick Asbestos Company.(Hanna, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court at the hearing on 10/16/2018 will address the motion to stay #313 and response #315 filed thereto. The court will not address the merits of the motions to dismiss at that time because plaintiffs' response to the order to show cause is not due until 10/15/2018. All parties should be prepared to update the court with respect to the status of the case. On or before 10/15/2018 at 12 noon, the parties shall file a joint agenda for the 10/16/2018 hearing, which shall include a list of the parties remaining in the case and their respective counsel and any issue to be addressed by the court. All parties may attend the 10/16/2018 hearing by telephone. A conference call number shall be provided to the court. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/9/2018. (Conti, Joy)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REPLY BRIEF re #313 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by AT&T Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Turlik, John)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #313 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Fitzpatrick, John)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER resetting Status Conference. The Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 3:00 is reset for 10/16/2018 at 04:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 10/42018. (Con)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile their Memorandum of Law in Support of document #313 as a separate entry. Please file as a Brief in Support located under the event Responses and Replies. (rw)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Fitzpatrick, John)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 10/15/2018 why the motions to dismiss #302 and #303 should not be granted and the case dismissed against defendants AT&T Communications Inc. and Ford Motor Company. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 9/26/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 CERTIFICATE of Service of Expert Reports of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Ronald)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Weil-McLain.(Turlik, John)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 DEFENDANT, CERTAINTEED CORPORATIONS ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Fitzpatrick, John)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephone conference call held on 9 July 2018 before Judge Joy Flowers Contie (Western District of PA). Court Reporter: Barbara Metz Leo, Official Court Reporter, Western District of PA (filed by ctrep8)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Defendant, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER - Discovery due by 9/27/2018. Dismissal of Defendants due 10/15/2018. Discovery Hearing set for 10/16/2018 at 10:00 AM is reset for 10/16/2018 at 3:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Daubert Hearing set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 8/16/2018. (Conti, Joy)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Essex Group.(Turner, Tiffany)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AT&T Communications Inc..(Turlik, John)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MOTION TO CERTIFY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Caffrey, Sharon)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand by Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation).(Jasons, Catherine)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AT&T Communications Inc., AT&T, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Aztec Communications Inc., Eaton Corporation, Essex Group, Ford Motor Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc., HB Fuller Company, Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.H. France Refractories Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., McCormick Asbestos Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Morgan Engineering, Nevada Bell Telephone Company, P&H Mining Equipment, Inc., Pnumo-Abex Corporation, RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc., Reading Crane & Engineering, Reunion Industries, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Kerite Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, Weil-McLain, Zurn Industries, LLC by IMO Industries, Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER re #293 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by J.H. France Refractories Company. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, J.H. France Refractories Company is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by co-defendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/31/2018. (Conti, Joy)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER re #291 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Cleaver Brooks is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by co-defendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/31/2018. (Conti, Joy)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER re #292 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, FOSTER WHEELER Corporation and Foster Wheeler LLC is DISMISSED from the above-captions matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by co-defendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Foster-Wheeler Corporation and Foster-Wheeler Corporation terminated. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/31/2018. (Conti, Joy)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 AMENDED COMPLAINT Greene Tweed & Company, Inc's Answer, Defenses Cross-Claim and Answer to Cross-Claims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against Rhonda J. Gorton, filed by Thomas D. Gorton, II.(Wolford, Dennis)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 STIPULATION of Dismissal by J.H. France Refractories Company. (Jackson, Damian)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Valinis, Susan)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Valinis, Susan)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(McShea, John)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 DISCLOSURE REPORT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER- SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion for summary judgment due by 3/4/2019. Opposition due 4/4/2019. Reply due 4/18/2019. Combined Concise Statement of Facts due 4/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/18/2018. (Conti, Joy) Modified on 8/16/2018. Corrected year (Con).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ANSWER to #284 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaim and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation.(McShea, John)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rhonda J. Gorton.(Duncan, Jason)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The fax-request for defendants (other than liaison counsel) to appear via telephone at the hearing scheduled for 7/9/2018 at 3:00 p.m. is granted. Liaison counsel shall provide a dial-in number for the court to use during the hearing. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 7/6/2018. (Conti, Joy)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #282 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2018.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/28/2018 (Conti, Joy)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Rhonda J. Gorton, Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 02:30 PM is reset for 7/9/2018 at 03:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (smc)(Conti, Joy)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: The incorrect image for the 6/1 Stipulation, document #279 , has been replaced with the correct image. New notices for that order have been sent to all parties. (rm)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER re #276 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal any and all claims and cross-claims by co-defendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Reading Crane & Engineering, is dismissed from the from the above-captioned matter with prejudice. Reading Crane & Engineering terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/24/2018. (Conti, Joy)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re #275 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal any and all claims by plaintiffs and any and all cross-claims against defendant, Universal Refractories, Division of Thiem Corporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Universal Refractories (A Division of Thiem Corporation) terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/2018. (Conti, Joy)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER re #278 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, the above-captioned action by Plaintiff against Defendant, Corning Incorporated, on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division, and incorrectly sued herein as Corhart Refractories Co. is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Corning Incorporated, on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories business division and incorrectly sued herein as Corhart Refractories Company. B Corhart Refractories Co. (c/o Corporation Service Company) terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/2018. (Conti, Joy) (Main Document 279 replaced on 6/5/2018) (rm).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 STIPULATION of Dismissal . (O'Brien, Kevin)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re #274 Stipulation filed by A.O. Smith. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal any and all claims against A.O. Smith Corporation, including all cross-claims and additional party claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Corporation A.O. Smith Corporation terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/16/2018. (Conti, Joy)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 STIPULATION of Dismissal Proposed by Reading Crane & Engineering, filed by Reading Crane & Engineering.(Gries, Alan)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Universal Refractories. (Dugan, John)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 STIPULATION with prejudice filed by A.O. Smith Corporation, filed by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER re #272 Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal Union Carbide Corporation and Bayer CropScience, Inc., f/k/a Amchem Products, Inc. (incorrectly named and service as Bayer CropScience LP, Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.), are hereby dismissed from the above-captioned action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/10/2018. (Conti, Joy)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.), Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Damian S. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/30/2018. (Conti, Joy)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #263 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint no later than 6/20/2018. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/1/2018 (Conti, Joy)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER re #266 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company is dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by codefendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Industrial Holdings Corporation and Industrial Holdings Corporation terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/1/2018. (Conti, Joy)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER re #265 Stipulation of Dismissal, Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company is dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by codefendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/1/2018. (Conti, Joy)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re #264 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Foseco, Inc. Based on the foregoing Stipulation of Dismissal, Foseco, Inc. is dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice, and any and all claims and cross-claims by codefendants and additional defendants are hereby dismissed. Foseco, Inc. terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 5/1/2018. (Conti, Joy)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Jenkins, Walter)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company. (Jenkins, Walter)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foseco, Inc.. (Jenkins, Walter)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Rhonda J. Gorton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Damian Jackson, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of J.H. France Refractories Company Attorney Damian Jackson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4400368.. (Valinis, Susan)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL (Valinis, Susan)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Pacific Bell, Nevada Bell, and AT&T, Inc. are dismissed from this case because this court lacks personal jurisdiction over them and all claims asserted against them are dismissed. All claims asserted against Ford and AT&T Corp. are dismissed without prejudice from the complaint for failure to state a plausible claim for relief. On or before 4/20/2018, plaintiffs may file an amended complaint. The requests for an interlocutory appeal are denied as premature. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/19/2018 (Conti, Joy)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) setting forth the reasons the motions to dismiss #4 and #10 will be granted in part, denied in part. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/19/2018. (Conti, Joy)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER re #257 Stipulation of Dismissal. Columbus McKinnon Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice, all claims and cross-claims brought against Columbus McKinnon Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/13/2018. (Conti, Joy)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (McGarrity, Jennifer)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 29 January 2018, before Judge Joy Flowers Conti (Western District of PA). Court Reporter: Barbara Metz Leo, RPR CRR (Western District of PA) (Transcript filed by Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR, Chief Court Reporter, Middle District of PA)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Supplemental BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supplemental filed by Thomas D. Gorton, II.(Duncan, Jason) Modified on 2/22/2018 (ve).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Supplemental BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Ford filed by Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Duncan, Jason) Modified on 2/22/2018 (ve).
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aurora Pump Company (Hadden, James)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Notice of Service re: Rule 26 Disclosure Report filed by HB Fuller Company by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George) Modified on 2/20/2018 (ve).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE by Cooper Industries (Depfer, Joan)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc. (Depfer, Joan)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE by The Kerite Company (Depfer, Joan)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE (Depfer, Joan)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sean M. Marotta. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/09/2018. (Conti, Joy)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Lee J. Janiczek. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/09/2018. (Conti, Joy)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Dennis F. Wolford. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/9/2018. (Conti, Joy)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jennifer A. McGarrity. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/9/2018. (Conti, Joy)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joshua Douglas Lee.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 2/9/2018. (Conti, Joy)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Fitzpatrick, John)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fitzpatrick, John)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) of service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures (Singley, David)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (McMeekin, John)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by The Okonite Company Notice of Service - 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE by Crane Company Notice of Service - 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Service (Neeson, Peter)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by J.H. France Refractories Company. . (Lewis, Leah)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures of Defendant, Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Lewis, Leah)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures . (Valinis, Susan)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 231 has been deleted by the Court due to filing error - refiled as Document 232. (dmn)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Pacific Bell and AT&T Corp.'s Supplemental Briefing regarding consent by registration re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s))(Turlik, John)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Greenberg, Julie)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures (Riley, Sean)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE for Service of Rule 26(a)(1) (Kadish, Eric)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. (Wolford, Dennis)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Change of Address by David J. Singley (Singley, David)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per Local Rule 5.4 of the Middle District of Pennsylvania, discovery material shall not be filed on the docket or with the Court. Therefore, documents 211,212,213,214,217,218,219 & 221 all filed as Rule 26(a) Pretrial Disclosures have been deleted. Please note: Notice of Service of Rule 26 disclosures are permitted and should be the only discovery material filed on the docket, unless ordered by the Court. (ve)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per Local Rule 5.4 of the Middle District of Pennsylvania, discovery material shall not be filed on the docket or with the Court. Therefore, documents 223,224 & 225 all filed as Rule 26(a) Pretrial Disclosures have been deleted. Please note: Notice of Service of Rule 26 disclosures are permitted and should be the only discovery material filed on the docket, unless ordered by the Court. (ve)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Fitzpatrick, John)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE by Schneider Electric of Service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Rideout, Christina)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation service of Rule 26 Disclosure (Jasons, Catherine)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE by Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.) service of Rule 26 Disclosure (Jasons, Catherine)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Certainteed Corporation. (Fitzpatrick, John)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(As Successor-by-Merger to Buffalo Pumps). Amendment to #207 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) . (Fitzpatrick, John)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(As Successor-by-Merger to Buffalo Pumps).(Fitzpatrick, John)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner McGarrity & Associate Counsel Kiniry- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 206 has been deleted by the Court due to filing error- Will be re-filed by Counsel. (ve)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(As Successor-by-Merger to Buffalo Pumps). (Fitzpatrick, John)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jennifer A. McGarrity #202 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (McGarrity, Jennifer)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner McGarrity is advised to file the completed Petition for Special Admission and file it as "Document Filed". Please be sure to use "Document Filed" so you do not get charged a second time. (ve)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Lee & Associate Counsel Turlik - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Conference at the close of fact discovery set for 7/9/2018 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Daubert Hearing set for 1/14/2019 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. (Conti, Joy)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: At the motion hearing/case management conference held on 1/29/2018, the court adopted the case management plan #203 filed by the parties as the case management plan for this case. Additionally, the court scheduled a conference at the close of fact discovery (7/9/2018 at 2:00 p.m.) and a Daubert hearing (1/14/2019 at 2:00 p.m.). Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2017. (Conti, Joy)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Defendant, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Duncan, Jason)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jennifer A McGarrity on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation Attorney Jennifer A. McGarrity is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4319048.. (McGarrity, Jennifer)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The plaintiffs and defendants that filed the motions to dismiss shall be prepared to address (and if necessary present evidence of) the dates on which the moving defendants were registered as foreign corporations with the state of Pennsylvania and whether the conduct complained of in this case took place during a time in which the moving defendants were registered as foreign corporations in the state of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/26/2018. (Conti, Joy)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joshua D Lee on behalf of AT&T, Inc., Nevada Bell Telephone Company Attorney Joshua Lee is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4317935.. (Lee, Joshua)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. Russell M. Nigro appointed as Special Master to oversee discovery.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/24/2018. (Conti, Joy)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AFFIDAVIT of Russell M. Nigro re: Special Master appointment. (Conti, Joy)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per Local Rule 5.4 of the Middle District of Pennsylvania, discovery material shall not be filed on the docket or with the Court. Therefore, documents 43, 166, 170, 173, 175 and 199 all filed as Rule 26(a) Pretrial Disclosures have been deleted. (ve)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Substitution of Attorney filed by Eaton Corporation. (Depfer, Joan) Modified on 1/22/2018 (ve).
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Page 3 of Petition for Admission #196 filed by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.. . (Wolford, Dennis) Modified on 1/22/2018 (ve).
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Wolford & Associate Counsel Eisler- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile page 3 of Doc. 196 listing associate counsel that has been admitted to the Middle District. When re-filing, please use the event: Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events - Document Filed, to avoid any costs. (pjr)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. Attorney Wolford is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4310637.. (Wolford, Dennis)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance (Depfer, Joan)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Remark: Parties that are not involved in the pending motions to dismiss are not required to attend the telephone status conference scheduled for tomorrow, 1/19/18 at 11:00 a.m. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: A telephonic status conference before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti is set for tomorrow, 1/19/2018, at 11:00 a.m., to address the procedures to be followed to resolve the pending motions to dismiss. The parties shall provide chambers a dial-in number for the call. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Conti, Joy)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Marotta & Associate Counsel Caffrey- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Sean Marotta is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4302286.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Greenberg, Julie)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Lee C. Janiczek on behalf of Foster-Wheeler Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company Attorney Lee Janiczek is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4301094.. (Janiczek, Lee)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Janiczek & Associate Counsel Hagan- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2018 at 04:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Joint case management plan (Appendix A of the United States District Court for The Middle District of Pennsylvania Rules of Court) due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/5/2018. (Conti, Joy)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,: Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2018 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2018 at 03:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 1/5/2018. (Conti, Joy)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross Claims against All Defendants by Foster-Wheeler Corporation.(Lewis, Leah)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah A Lewis on behalf of Foster-Wheeler Corporation (Lewis, Leah)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross Claims against All Defendants by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Lewis, Leah)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah A Lewis on behalf of J.H. France Refractories Company (Lewis, Leah)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER the court having been advised that defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC filed for bankruptcy on November 2, 2017 in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of North Carolina at case no. 17-31795 and that no further action can be taken at this time against that defendant, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark the above-captioned case closed as to defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Nothing contained in this order shall affect any other defendant or be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter. Should further proceedings in this matter against Georgia-Pacific, LLC become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. Georgia-Pacific, LLC terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/19/2017. (Conti, Joy)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance (Fitzpatrick, John)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fitzpatrick, John)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to John Fitzpatrick. (dmn) John Fitzpatrick admitted to court on 2/13/2006. Please ignore special admission form sent. Modified on 12/13/2017 (jkc).
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance (Kattner, Conrad)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad O. Kattner on behalf of CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation (Kattner, Conrad)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Plaintiffs' counsel shall coordinate the call by providing chambers and all parties a call-in number for the conference. Plaintiff should also provide a list of all counsel participating in the conference and the party/parties they represent to the court on or before 12/12/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/6/2017. (Conti, Joy)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Notice of Bankruptcy and Stay of Proceedings . (Johanson, Thomas)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER that if any brief together with appendices or exhibits equals or exceeds 25 pages, a courtesy paper copy of the brief and appendices or exhibits shall be furnished to the court within two business days of filing the brief and appendices or exhibits. The courtesy copy should be printed from ECF and the documents should include the ECF header. Attachments to any courtesy copy shall be appropriately marked and tabbed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties are to provide courtesy copies of any briefs that equals or exceed 25 pages that were filed in this case prior to the date of this order including but not limited to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/16/2017. (Conti, Joy)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 11/16/2017. (Conti, Joy)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Defendant, Lockheed Martin Corporation f/k/a Martin Marietta Corp.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Turner, Tiffany)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. for Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Defendant, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Essex Group identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies for Essex Group. (Turner, Tiffany)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Defendant, Superior Essex, Inc., Incorrectly Sued as Essex Group's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Essex Group.(Turner, Tiffany)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER OF DESIGNATION by the Third Circuit Court of Appeals. Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Joy Flowers Conti of the WD of PA is hereby designated and assigned this matter. Signed by D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 11/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Designation Letter)(jw)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (McMeekin, John)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 filed by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group plc., Corporate Parent John Crane Group Ltd. (UK), Corporate Parent Smiths Group International Holdings Ltd. for John Crane, Inc.. (ve)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 164 was deleted and re-filed using the correct event. (ve)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Union Carbide Corporation. Amendment to #60 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) . (Jasons, Catherine)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Weil-McLain identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation, Corporate Parent Marley-Wylain Company, LLC for Weil-McLain. (Turlik, John)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ANSWER to #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #135 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #157 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #110 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #154 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #92 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #56 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #137 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #67 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #89 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #104 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #58 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #49 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #144 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #114 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #52 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #66 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #57 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #21 Crossclaim, Answer to Complaint, #65 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #81 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #84 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #44 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to all Crossclaims with Jury Demand by Weil-McLain.(Turlik, John) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ve).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Depfer, Joan)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance (Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Kerite, LLC ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kerite Company identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Group, LLC for The Kerite Company.. (Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of The Kerite Company (Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Cooper Industries ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cooper Industries.(Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooper Industries. (Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Cooper Industries (Depfer, Joan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance (Santoro, Christopher)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Christopher N. Santoro. (dmn)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to A. Kai Seelaus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/8/2017. (ktt)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by A. Kai Seelaus on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC Attorney A. Kai Seelaus is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4192616., filed by on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC.(Seelaus, A.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Seelaus & Associate Counsel Caffrey- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document(s) 149 & 150 have been deleted. (ve)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Turlik on behalf of Weil-McLain (Turlik, John)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Edward T. Finch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/5/2017. (ktt)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David J. Singley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/5/2017. (ktt)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Eaton Corporation. (Rubin, Jason)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Singley & Associate Counsel Zeszutek - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Finch & Associate Counsel Kellner- Bar Status Verified (ve)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Eaton Corporation.(Rubin, Jason)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W Rubin on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Rubin, Jason)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Edward T Finch on behalf of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation Attorney Edward Finch is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4186065., filed by on behalf of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation.(Finch, Edward)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Georgia-Pacific, LLC. (Johanson, Thomas)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Georgia-Pacific LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Georgia-Pacific, LLC.(Johanson, Thomas)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Supplement by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation). to #136 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Code of Professional Conduct. (Singley, David)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Johanson, Thomas)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Corhart Refractories Co..(Johanson, Thomas)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David J. Singley on behalf of Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) Attorney David Singley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4184426.. (Singley, David)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file Supplement to Document 136. Signed Code of Proffesional Conduct. This event can be located under Other Documents. (aaa)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Terex Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Crossclaims with, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation) (Jasons, Catherine)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.) (Jasons, Catherine)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Jasons, Catherine)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terex Corporation. (Depfer, Joan)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Terex Corporation (Depfer, Joan)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Riley, Sean)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance. (Riley, Sean)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company (Hanna, Thomas)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Hanna, Thomas)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas J. Johanson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter L. Lejeune. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Julie Stanier Greenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas P. Hanna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter J. Neeson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Catherine N. Jasons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/22/2017. (ktt)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jason W Rubin on behalf of Eaton Corporation Attorney Jason Rubin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4177800.. (Rubin, Jason)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 by Georgia-Pacific, LLC. #103 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Page 3. (Johanson, Thomas)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Turlik, John)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Rubin & Associate Counsel Merrigan - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pacific Bell Telephone Company identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Turlik, John)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by AT&T, Inc.. (Turlik, John)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by AT&T Communications Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Communications Inc.. (Turlik, John)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Johanson is reminded re: phone conversation to please file page 3 of petition listing new local counsel who is generally admitted into MDPA. Please file this page as: Document Filed. (ve)
August 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord, LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Depfer, Joan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM , ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Kiniry, William)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas J. Johanson on behalf of Corhart Refractories Co.(c/o Corporation Service Company), Georgia-Pacific, LLC Attorney Thomas Johanson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4173963.. (Johanson, Thomas)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Peter Lejeune is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4170867.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Greenberg & Associate Counsel Caffrey- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Lejeune & Associate Counsel Burke- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. of IMO Industries states that its parent companies are Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. (jw)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Code of Professional Conduct. (Greenberg, Julie)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance o/b/o IMO Industries, Inc. (Fontak, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Greenberg is advised to file a signed Code of Professional Conduct for #87 Petition for Special Admission. Please file this as "Document Filed". Please DO NOT re-file the Petition. (ve)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Okonite Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 The Okonite Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of The Okonite Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Crane Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Greene Tweed of Delaware, LLC for Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Wolford, Dennis)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation. (McShea, John)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Julie S Greenberg on behalf of Ford Motor Company Attorney Julie Greenberg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4165388.. (Greenberg, Julie) (SEE DOC #98 FOR CODE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT) Modified on 8/17/2017 (jw).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF RECUSAL - It is hereby ORDERED that the undersigned is RECUSED from the above-captioned action & the Clrk of Ct shall reassign the case to another judge. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/8/17. (ki)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Yvette Kane recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/8/17. (rw)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Aurora Pump Company. (Hadden, James)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Hadden on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Hadden, James)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McCormick Asbestos Company.(Rideout, Christina)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by McCormick Asbestos Company. (Rideout, Christina)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company (Rideout, Christina)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer, Inc..(Rideout, Christina)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pfizer, Inc.. (Rideout, Christina)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Rideout, Christina)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Kiniry, William)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Kiniry, Jr on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Kiniry, William)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Counterclaim and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(McShea, John)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Thomas Hanna, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Reading Crane & Engineering.(Gries, Alan)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott F. Griffith on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Griffith, Scott)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company(c/o Remanining Director Trustees Louis E. Grenzer, Jr.), Pfizer, Inc. Attorney Thomas P. Hanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4159182.. (Hanna, Thomas)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation). (Zeszutek, C.)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Zeszutek, C.)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation(c/o CT Corporation Systems).(Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation, c/o Corporation Service Company).(Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.).(Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation, c/o Corporation Service Company). (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Pnumo-Abex Corporation(Successor-in-Interest to Abex Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation, c/o Corporation Service Company) (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.). (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.) (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Carbide Corporation(c/o CT Corporation Systems). (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation(c/o CT Corporation Systems) of Appearance (Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Parties by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Schneider Electric.(Rideout, Christina)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Cleaver Brooks, Inc..(Valinis, Susan)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.(c/o Corporation Service Company) identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Valinis, Susan)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Attorney Peter Neeson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4157731.. (Neeson, Peter)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint withAffirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Jasons & Associate Counsel Rideout- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Neeson & Associate Counsel Griffith- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to counsel, Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/31/17. (rw)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER addressed to counsel, Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/31/17. (rw)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AT&T Communications Inc., AT&T, Inc., Nevada Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company.(Turlik, John)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Universal Refractories.(Dugan, John)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Universal Refractories. (Dugan, John)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Dugan on behalf of Universal Refractories (Dugan, John)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, LP(As Successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.), Pnumo-Abex Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation Attorney Catherine N. Jasons is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4155503.. (Jasons, Catherine)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HB Fuller Company. (Bobnak, George)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 H.B. Fuller Company's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HB Fuller Company.(Bobnak, George)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Caffrey, Sharon)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Neeson, Peter)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Susan M. Valinis, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/20/17. (rw)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to G. Daniel Bruch, Jr., Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/20/17. (rw)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Peter Neeson. (pjr)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Leah A. Lewis, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/20/17. (rw)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cagnoli, Jr on behalf of Morgan Engineering (Cagnoli, Joseph)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by deft Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Ronald) Modified on 8/16/2017 (jw).
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Daugherty, Ronald)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #21 Crossclaim, Answer to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc..(Daugherty, Ronald)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Daugherty, Ronald)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. Bobnak on behalf of HB Fuller Company. (Bobnak, George)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Leah A Lewis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Attorney Leah Lewis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4144026.. (Lewis, Leah)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 27. (pjr)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 28. (pjr)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rhonda J. Gorton, Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Duncan, Jason)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rhonda J. Gorton, Thomas D. Gorton, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Duncan, Jason)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. McMeekin, II on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (McMeekin, John)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Neeson, Peter)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company Attorney G. Daniel Bruch, Jr. is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4139967.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Bruch & Associate Counsel Burke - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Valinis & Associate Counsel McDevitt Hagan - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (McMeekin, John)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 County Court Record Cont., #2 County Court Record Cont., #3 County Court Record Cont.)(ve)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaim and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation.(McShea, John)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Attorney Susan Valinis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4137410.. (Valinis, Susan)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Caffrey, Sharon)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Andrisani, Nathan)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Andrisani on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Andrisani, Nathan)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Schneider Electric (Rideout, Christina)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company (Jenkins, Walter)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Borgwarner Morse TEC. (Seelaus, Anne)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne K Seelaus on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC (Seelaus, Anne)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM emailed to Attorney Susan Valinis (lg)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Valinis, Susan)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Gries on behalf of Reading Crane & Engineering (Gries, Alan)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AT&T Communications Inc., AT&T, Inc., Nevada Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Originally filed as Doc #10)(jw)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ford Motor Company. (originally filed with Doc #4) (jw)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AT&T Communications Inc., AT&T, Inc., Nevada Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Turlik, John)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Kadish, Eric)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Kadish on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Kadish, Eric)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc.. (Depfer, Joan)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of P&H Mining Equipment, Inc. (Depfer, Joan)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Reading Crane & Engineering. (Gries, Alan)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Caffrey, Sharon)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Electric Company. (McShea, John)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation. (McShea, John)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORMS mailed to Attorney Santoro and Attorney Giangiulio (lg)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Honorable Judge Kane assigned to this case. (pjr)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Crane Company from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CV-3790-AS. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4125023). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Caption, #3 Defendant and Counsel List, #4 Exhibit(s) A, #5 Exhibit(s) A-1, #6 Exhibit(s) A-2, #7 Exhibit(s) A-3, #8 Exhibit(s) A-4, #9 Exhibit(s) B, #10 Exhibit(s) C, #11 Exhibit(s) D, #12 Exhibit(s) E, #13 Exhibit(s) E continued, #14 Exhibit(s) F, #15 Exhibit(s) F continued, #16 Exhibit(s) G, #17 Exhibit(s) K, #18 Exhibit(s) 16, #19 Exhibit(s) 24)(ve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorton et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC
Represented By: A. Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Engineering
Represented By: Joseph Cagnoli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Carolyn A. Williams
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montfair Industrial Supplies Company
Represented By: Edward R. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn A. Williams
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crouse Hinds Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Represented By: Joshua D Lee
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Daniel J Ryan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading Crane & Engineering
Represented By: Alan R. Gries
Represented By: Jennifer L. Seme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Julie S Greenberg
Represented By: Sharon L Caffrey
Represented By: Sean M Marotta
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: George S. Bobnak
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executone Communications Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan J Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Represented By: Jennifer A McGarrity
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&H Mining Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Suprenant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: Edward T Finch
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Leland I Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric
Represented By: W. Matthew Reber
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Represented By: Conrad O. Kattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HB Fuller Company
Represented By: George S. Bobnak
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua D. Scheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford
Represented By: Kathryn L. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABEX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Okonite Company
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Peter L. Lejeune
Represented By: Lauren E Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Asbestos Company
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Represented By: John C McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brother Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Leah A Lewis
Represented By: Leroy J Janiczek
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&F Worldwide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rockbestos Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reunion Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart R. Singer
Represented By: Ronald L. Daugherty
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph I. Fontak
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rockbestos Wire & Cable Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company
Represented By: Carolyn A. Williams
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Machines
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster
Represented By: George S. Bobnak
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Represented By: Conrad O. Kattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [