Eisenhower v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Eisenhower
Defendant: The Lincoln Electric Company, Foster-Wheeler Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., Borgwarner Morse TEC, General Refractories Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, American Refractories, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ford Motor Company, Zurn Industries, LLC, The Okonite Company, Morgan Engineering, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Weil-McLain, A.O. Smith Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Hobart Brothers Company, General Electric Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Corning Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Cooper Industries, Reunion Industries, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Foseco, Inc., The Kerite Company, Pneumo-Abex Corporation, GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Ferro Engineering, Certainteed Corporation, P&H Mining Equipment, Inc., J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., HB Fuller Company, Pfizer, Inc., Fairmont Supply Company, Universal Refractories, Crane Company, Columbus McKinnon Corporation, McCormick Asbestos Company, Terex Corporation, Reading Crane & Engineering, RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Schneider Electric, Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Eaton Corporation, CBS Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Mobil Corporation, The Rockbestos Wire & Cable Company, The Rockbestos Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Rockbestos-Suprenant Corp., Martin Marietta Corporation, Carborundum Company, Viacom, Inc., Alliance Machines, Morgan Crane, MCIC, Crane Packing Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Keeler Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, PH Mining Equipment, Inc., Imo Industries Inc. and Corning, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: John Crane Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00448
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Referring Judge: Eduardo C Robreno
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED with prejudice and shall be marked as CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/16/2020. (ktt)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Order approving Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/16/2020. (ktt)
October 15, 2020 Filing 440 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Imo Industries Inc.. (Fontak, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER - The unopposed motion for summary judgment filed by Goulds Pumps, LLC (ECF No. 378-1) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs claims against this Defendant are DISMISSED. Goulds Pumps, Inc. terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/17/20. (ao)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER denying as moot #417 Motion to Strike; denying as moot #423 Motion to JoinSigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/2/20 (ao)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial memoranda pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 16.6(c); proposed voir dire questions, jury instructions, special interrogatories, and verdict forms; and any motions in limine shall be filed by October 2, 2020. Responses to any motions shall be filed by October 19, 2020. A final pretrial conference will be held by telephone on November 3, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. with the Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2020 02:00 PM before Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/2/20. (ao)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #367 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Warren PumpsSigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/26/2020 (mfa)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #343 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Crane Co.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/26/2020 (mfa)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #376 Motion for Summary Judgment (See order for complete details) Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/26/2020 (mfa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 433 STATUS REPORT - Crane Co. Response to Plaintiff's Status Report. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 432 STATUS REPORT Viable Defendants Remaining by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Duncan, Jason)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting Deft Zurn Industries, LLC #428 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Deft Zurn Industries, LLC and against Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that by 8/31/20, Pltfs counsel shall file a written report to the Court indicating into which category the case falls: (1) All viable defts have been or can be dismissed, and the case can be marked closed. (2) There are viable defts remaining and the case is prepared for trial. Please provide a list of the remaining viable defts in the status report.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/14/20 (ao)
July 30, 2020 Filing 430 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #428 MOTION for Summary Judgment.(Depfer, Joan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 429 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #428 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Zurn Industries, LLC filed by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER - The unopposed motion to extend time to file motion for summary judgment by Zurn Industries, LLC. was granted and Exhibit A to the motion is deemed filed as of this day. Pltf may respond to the motion for summary judgment by 7/17/20.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 7/1/20. (ao)
July 1, 2020 Filing 428 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Zurn Industries, LLC(Subsidiary of U.S. Industries, Inc.).(ao) (Main Document 428 replaced on 7/2/2020) (ao).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting Zurn Industries LLC's #425 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Zurn Industries LLC's Motion shall be filed within 5 days.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 7/1/20 (ao)
June 9, 2020 Filing 425 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief (Summary Judgment) filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER - the following unopposed motions for summary judgment are GRANTED #306 ; #314 ; #322 ; #323 ; #326 ; #328 ; #329 ; #332 ; #334 ; #336 ; #337 ; #338 ; #341 ; #346 ; #349 ; #351 ; #353 ; #359 ; #361 ; #363 ; #365 ; #369 ; #372 ; #403 . It is hereby further ORDERED that the following motions for summary judgment are DENIED as moot as the filing defts have been voluntarily dismissed from the case: #318 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp. (Deft dismissed, #384); #320 filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Deft dismissed, #383); #374 filed by J.H. France Refractories Co (Deft dismissed, #392). It is further ORDERED that the following motions to withdraw motions for summary judgment are GRANTED and the corresponding motions for summary judgment are WITHDRAWN: Granting #393 filed by Foster-Wheeler Corp, withdrawing #371 ; Granting #405 filed by IMO Industries, withdrawing #354 ; Granting #406 filed by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Co, withdrawing #357 ;Granting #415 filed by J.H. France Refractories Co, withdrawing #374 . Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 6/5/2020 (jw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 423 MOTION to Join and Adopt Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Pre-Trial Disclosure" .(Fitzpatrick, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 422 REPLY BRIEF re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 421 REPLY BRIEF re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Depfer, Joan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 420 REPLY BRIEF re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 419 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #376 MOTION for Summary Judgment By Air & Liquid Systems Corporation with Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Fitzpatrick, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 418 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Crane Co..(Burke, Lauren)
May 29, 2020 Filing 417 MOTION to Strike #413 Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a3 - Pretrial Disclosures .(Burke, Lauren)
May 28, 2020 Filing 416 REPLY BRIEF re #314 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Singley, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 415 MOTION to Withdraw #375 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #374 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Jackson, Damian)
May 27, 2020 Filing 414 CERTIFICATE of of Service by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell) re #413 Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a3 - Pretrial Disclosures . (Duncan, Jason)
May 22, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 413. (pjr)
May 21, 2020 Filing 413 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell) by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell).(Duncan, Jason)
May 21, 2020 Filing 412 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Santoro, Christopher)
May 18, 2020 Filing 411 CERTIFICATE of of Service by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell) re #408 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #409 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #410 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, . (Duncan, Jason)
May 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file certificates of service for Docs. 408,409 and 410. (pjr)
May 15, 2020 Filing 410 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Filing 409 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #376 MOTION for Summary Judgment By Air & Liquid Systems Corporation with Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service filed by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Filing 408 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Crane Co. filed by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(Duncan, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Order approving re #404 Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 5/15/20. (aaa)
May 15, 2020 Filing 406 MOTION to Withdraw #357 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #358 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Co..(McGarrity, Jennifer)
May 15, 2020 Filing 405 MOTION to Withdraw Imo Industries Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment.(Fontak, Joseph)
May 15, 2020 Filing 404 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Remaining Motion for Summary Judgment Deadline as to JH France by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Duncan, Jason)
May 14, 2020 Filing 403 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Memo Brief in Support)(Santoro, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 402 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Hobart Brothers Company.(Santoro, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance (Santoro, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 403 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (pjr)
May 14, 2020 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Christopher Santoro can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
May 1, 2020 Filing 400 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Jackson, Damian)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting #398 Pltf's Motion to Extend Time. Pltf shall file responses to summary judgment motions by May 15, 2020. Defts shall file any replies to Pltfs response to summary judgment by May 29, 2020. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/28/20 (ao)
April 29, 2020 Filing 398 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motions by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
April 29, 2020 Filing 397 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Remaining Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines (Imo Industries Inc.). (Fontak, Joseph)
April 28, 2020 Filing 396 STIPULATION to Extend Remaining Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Co.. (McGarrity, Jennifer)
April 27, 2020 Filing 395 STIPULATION Pltf's Opposition to Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than May 15, 2020. Deft, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. replies shall be filed no later than May 29, 2020 re: #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Brief in Opposition due by 5/15/2020 Reply Brief due by 5/29/2020.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/27/20. (ao)
April 27, 2020 Filing 394 STIPULATION TO EXTEND REMAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES. (Valinis, Susan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 393 PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Valinis, Susan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 392 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - Deft, J.H. France Refractories Company, be and hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice, and any all claims and cross-claims by co-defts and additional defts are hereby dismissed.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/15/20. (ao)
April 15, 2020 Filing 391 STIPULATION of Dismissal by J.H. France Refractories Company. (Jackson, Damian)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting Pltf's #389 Motion for Extension of Time. Pltfs responses to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than 1 May 2020, and Defts subsequent replies shall be filed no later than 17 May 2020. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 4/1/20 (ao)
March 31, 2020 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment and Replies to any Responses by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER - the parties motion for a 30 day extension of deadlines (ECF No. 387) is DENIED without prejudice since there are no current deadlines. Once the Court rules upon the pending motions for summary judgment, it will set pre-trial deadlines in accordance with what is reasonable given the pandemic.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/31/20 (ao)
March 31, 2020 Filing 387 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend all deadlines by 30 daysdue to COVID-19 by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting #385 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall file responses to summary judgment motions by April 1, 2020. Defendants shall file any replies by April 17, 2020. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/12/2020 (mfa)
March 11, 2020 Filing 385 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Responses to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
March 5, 2020 Filing 384 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re #381 Any and all claims, causes of actions and cross claims against Deft Lockheed Martin Corporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Lockheed Martin Corporation terminated. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/4/2020. (mfa)
March 5, 2020 Filing 383 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re #382 Any and all claims, causes of actions and cross claims against Deft Martin Marietta Corporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Martin Marietta Corporation terminatedSigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/4/2020. (mfa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 382 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Martin Marietta Corporation, filed by Martin Marietta Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
March 4, 2020 Filing 381 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting #378 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Out of Time. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 3/3/20. (aaa)
February 28, 2020 Filing 379 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster-Wheeler Corporation.(Valinis, Susan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(Andrisani, Nathan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 377 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #376 MOTION for Summary Judgment By Air & Liquid Systems Corporation with Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service.(Fitzpatrick, John)
February 17, 2020 Filing 376 MOTION for Summary Judgment By Air & Liquid Systems Corporation with Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service.(Fitzpatrick, John)
February 17, 2020 Filing 375 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #374 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Jackson, Damian)
February 17, 2020 Filing 374 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.H. France Refractories Company. (Attachments: #1 Statement OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Jackson, Damian)
February 17, 2020 Filing 373 BRIEF in Support re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Corning, Inc.. Related document: #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corning, Inc..(O'Brien, Kevin)
February 17, 2020 Filing 372 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corning, Inc..(O'Brien, Kevin)
February 17, 2020 Filing 371 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement FOSTER WHEELER LLCS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Valinis, Susan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 370 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Valinis, Susan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Statement CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Valinis, Susan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 368 BRIEF in Support re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. Related document: #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 367 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 366 BRIEF in Support re #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Terex Corporation. Related document: #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Terex Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 365 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Terex Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 364 BRIEF in Support re #363 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. Related document: #363 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
February 17, 2020 Filing 362 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #361 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation.(Seelaus, A.)
February 17, 2020 Filing 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation.(Seelaus, A.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 360 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #359 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 14, 2020 Filing 359 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 14, 2020 Filing 358 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #357 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order)(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 14, 2020 Filing 357 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 14, 2020 Filing 356 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Reading Crane & Engineering. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Gries, Alan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 355 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #354 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Imo Industries Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
February 14, 2020 Filing 354 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Imo Industries Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
February 14, 2020 Filing 353 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Reading Crane & Engineering. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E)(Gries, Alan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 352 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HB Fuller Company(f/k/a Amchem Products, Inc. f/k/a Benjamin Foster).(Bobnak, George)
February 14, 2020 Filing 351 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HB Fuller Company(f/k/a Amchem Products, Inc. f/k/a Benjamin Foster).(Bobnak, George)
February 14, 2020 Filing 350 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #349 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 349 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
February 14, 2020 Filing 348 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Statement of Undisputed Facts re #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 347 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 345 BRIEF IN SUPPORT Statement of Undisputed Facts re #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Crane Co..(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 344 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Crane Co..(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Crane Co..(Bruch, G. Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 342 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #341 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 341 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 340 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #338 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 339 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #337 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
February 14, 2020 Filing 338 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 337 MOTION for Summary Judgment by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kadish, Eric)
February 14, 2020 Filing 336 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memo of Law and Certificate of Service by Reunion Industries, Inc..(Chapman, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 335 BRIEF in Support re #334 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Related document: #334 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 334 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 333 BRIEF in Support re #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by The Kerite Company. Related document: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 331 BRIEF in Support re #329 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Related document: #329 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Santoro, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 330 BRIEF in Support re #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Related document: #328 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Santoro, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 328 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 327 BRIEF in Support re #326 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Related document: #326 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 326 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 325 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #322 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
February 14, 2020 Filing 324 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #323 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 323 MOTION for Summary Judgment by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Depfer, Joan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
February 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file brief in support for document 322 as a separate docket entry under the event...Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Responses and Replies (Briefs), Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (mfa)
February 13, 2020 Filing 321 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #320 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Martin Marietta Materials Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
February 13, 2020 Filing 320 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Martin Marietta Materials Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
February 13, 2020 Filing 319 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #318 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
February 13, 2020 Filing 318 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
February 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile brief in support for document 318 as a separate docket entry under the event...Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Responses and Replies (Briefs), Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (mfa)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Any and all claims, causes of actions and cross claims against Deft John Crane Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. John Crane Inc. terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 2/11/20. (ao)
February 11, 2020 Filing 316 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jennifer A. McGarrity representing Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company and Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler CompanySigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 2/11/2020. (ep)
February 11, 2020 Filing 315 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #314 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification filed by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Singley, David)
February 11, 2020 Filing 314 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Lack of Product Identification by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation).(Singley, David)
February 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 314 deleted due to duplicate filing. (mfa)
February 7, 2020 Filing 313 STIPULATION by John Crane Inc., filed by John Crane Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
February 7, 2020 Filing 312 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jennifer A McGarrity on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company and Industrial Holdings Corporation Attorney Jennifer McGarrity is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5003228., filed by on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company.(McGarrity, Jennifer)
February 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Jennifer McGarrity and Associate Counsel bar status verified (mfa)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #305 Motion to Compel the Depositions of Pltfs Expert Witnesses, Orn Eliasson, MD, MPH, and Michael Zager, MD, and anyresponses thereto. Pltf shall provide 3 days for the depositions of OrnEliasson, MD, MPH, and Michael Zager, MD, within 10 days of this Order. The deadlines in this action be extended as follows: Expert discovery and depositions, related only to Pltfs experts, Om Eliasson, MD, MPH, and Michael Zager, MD, must be filed by 1/31/2020, Summary judgment motions must be filed by 2/17/2020, Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed by 3/18/2020, and Replies to responses to summary judgment motions (if any) must be filed by 4/3/2020. After summary judgment motions are ripe, the case will be stayed until disposition of the motions and further order of the court.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 12/2/19 (ao)
November 27, 2019 Filing 310 CERTIFICATE of Service re #307 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Extend Deadlines (Turner, Tiffany)
November 27, 2019 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE of Concurrence re #307 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Extend Deadlines (Turner, Tiffany)
November 27, 2019 Filing 308 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #307 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Extend Deadlines.(Turner, Tiffany)
November 27, 2019 Filing 307 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Extend Deadlines.(Turner, Tiffany)
November 27, 2019 Filing 306 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
November 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service and a certificate of concurrence/non concurrence for document 307. (mfa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 305 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Plaintiff Expert Witnesses.(Turner, Tiffany)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 STIPULATION AND ORDER - All claims by Plaintiffs and any and all cross-claims brought against defendant Pneumo Abex LLC are hereby DISMISSED from the captioned action with prejudice Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/25/2019. (mfa)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION AND ORDER - All claims by Plaintiffs and any and all cross-claims brought against defendants union Carbide Corporation and Bayer CropScience, INC are hereby DISMISSED from the captioned action with prejudice Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/25/2019. (mfa)
November 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 300 deleted, refiled as document 302. (mfa)
November 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file brief in support for Document 305 as a separate docket entry under the event - Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs) Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) (mfa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 302 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pneumo-Abex Corporation(successor-in-interest to ABEX Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation). (Jasons, Catherine)
November 25, 2019 Filing 301 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bayer Cropscience, LP(as successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.), Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Any and all claims and cross-claims brought against Columbus McKinnon Corporation are hereby DISMISSED from the captioned matter with prejudice.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/21/2019. (mfa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 298 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Dower, Christine)
November 19, 2019 Filing 297 DISCLOSURE REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Turner, Tiffany)
November 15, 2019 Filing 296 NOTICE by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. Fact and Expert Witness Disclosures (Wolford, Dennis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE by Schneider Electric Statement regarding Expert Witnesses (Rideout, Christina)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATION AND ORDER - All claims by Plaintiffs and any and all cross-claims brought are hereby DISMISSED from the captioned action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/14/19. (aaa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 293 NOTICE of Service of John Crane Inc. Reports (Turner, Tiffany)
November 15, 2019 Filing 292 NOTICE of JCI Service Of Dr. Pope Report (Turner, Tiffany)
November 15, 2019 Filing 291 STIPULATION of Dismissal of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation obo Clark Controller Co. (Miller, Michele)
November 15, 2019 Filing 290 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 289 NOTICE of Expert Witness Statement .(Jenkins, Walter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 288 NOTICE of Expert Witness Statement , filed by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Jenkins, Walter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 287 NOTICE of Service of Expert Witness Statement (Seelaus, A.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 286 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International Inc.'s Expert Disclosure and Certificate of Service (Neeson, Peter)
November 13, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Morgan Engineering f/k/a Morgan Crane (Cagnoli, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation) Notice of Service of Expert Witness Report and Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses (Singley, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 283 STIPULATION Approved AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/4/19. (aaa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 282 STIPULATION of Dismissal 10 day ltr and ltr to Judge Robreno. (McMeekin, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 281 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, Deft Weil-McLain is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by Pltf and any and all cross-claims brought against Weil-McLain are dismissed with predudice. Weil-McLain terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/25/19. (ao)
October 23, 2019 Filing 280 Letter from Mark R. Kehoe, Esquire . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation of Dismissal)(Kehoe, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 279 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Deft McCormick Asbestos Company (MCIC) is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by Pltf and any and all cross-claims brought against McCormick Asbestos Company (MCIC) are dismissed with predudice. McCormick Asbestos Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/22/19. (ao)
October 22, 2019 Filing 278 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - Deft Pfizer Inc. is hereby dismissed from this action with prejudice. After notice to all interested parties, all claims by Pltf and any and all cross-claims brought against Pfizer Inc. are dismissed with predudice. Pfizer, Inc. terminated., Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/22/19. (ao)
October 16, 2019 Filing 277 STIPULATION of Dismissal by McCormick Asbestos Company. (Hanna, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 276 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pfizer, Inc.. (Hanna, Thomas)
October 8, 2019 Filing 275 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - It ls hereby stipulated by and between attorneys for Plaintiff, and attorneys for Ford Motor Company, that Ford MotorCompany is hereby dismissed with prejudice from the action and all claims and cross claims by Plaintiff, co-defendants, and third-party defendants are dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Ford Motor Company terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/8/19. (ao)
October 8, 2019 Filing 274 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ford Motor Company. (Greenberg, Julie)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #271 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defts' expert reports must be completed and served by November 15, 2019. Expert discovery and depositions must be completed by December 16, 2019. Summary judgment motions must be filed by January 16, 2020. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed by February 18, 2020, and replies to responses to summary judgment motions (if any) must be filed by March 3, 2020. After summary judgment motions are ripe, the case will be stayed until disposition of themotions and further order of the court.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/24/19 (ao)
September 24, 2019 Filing 272 Certification of Concurrence to Extend Deadlines.(Turner, Tiffany)
September 24, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of concurrence/non-concurrence for Doc. 271. (pjr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 271 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery .(Turner, Tiffany)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Order approving Stipulation #269 of Dismissal. Defendant, Universal Refractories, Division of Thiem Corp. is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/16/19. (rw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 269 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Universal Refractories(a Division of Thiem Corporation), filed by Universal Refractories(a Division of Thiem Corporation).(Dugan, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 268 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - It Is hereby AGREED and STIPULATED between the undersigned counsel and ORDERED by the Court, that Defendant, Ferro EngineeRing, Division of ON Marine Services, LLC is dismissed fromthe above-captioned matter with PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that allcrossclaims against Ferro Engineering, Division of ON Marine Services, LLC in the above~captloned matter are dismissed with PREJUDICE. Ferro Engineering (Division of ON Marine Services Company) terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/19/19. (ao)
August 19, 2019 Filing 267 STIPULATION Of Dismissal of Defendant, Ferro Engineering Division of On Marine Services Co. by Ferro Engineering(Division of ON Marine Services Company), filed by Ferro Engineering(Division of ON Marine Services Company).(Mullaney, Theresa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 266 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borgwarner Morse TEC.(Seelaus, A.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 265 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Corporate Disclosure 7.1. (McMeekin, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 264 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michele N. MillerSigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/12/19. (ao)
August 8, 2019 Filing 263 Supplement to #262 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Miller, Michele)
August 8, 2019 Filing 262 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Michele Miller is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4837981.. (Miller, Michele)
August 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file Supplement to Document 262. Signed Code of Professional Conduct is needed. (aaa)
August 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and assosciate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting Deft Ford's unopposed #254 Motion to Compel Discovery. No later than 8/5/19, Pltf shall serve complete and verified responses to Deft, Ford Motor Companys Interrogatories and Requests for Production; no later than 8/5/19, Pltf shall identify all fact witnesses and provide to defense counsel their names and addresses; no later 9/6/19, the parties shall take the depositions of Pltf and any other fact witnesses; and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(d), Deft is awarded its costs and expenses for the attorney fees, reasonable travel expenses, and cancellation fees related to the late cancellation of the Michael Eisenhower deposition and for attorney fees and expenses incurred in the filing of this Motion, not to exceed $1,000.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 7/23/19 (ao)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court shall hold a telephonic hearing regarding Ford Motor Companys motion to compel (Doc. 254) on July 23, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for Ford shall initiate the teleconference between the relevant parties and call into chambers once they are all on the line. Telephone Hearing set for 7/23/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 7/18/19. (ao)
July 18, 2019 Filing 258 Letter from Julie S. Greenberg (Counsel for Ford Motor Company). (Greenberg, Julie)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 9/16/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 10/15/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline and depositions is due by 11/15/2019. Any motions for summary judgment due by 12/16/19; Responses to any summary judgment motions due by 1/16/20. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 6/19/19. (ao)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting Pltf's #255 Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines, and Defts' concurrence. A revised schedule Order shall issue.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 6/19/19 (ao) Modified on 6/19/2019 (ao).
June 13, 2019 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Deadlines by Michael Eisenhower. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 13, 2019 Filing 254 First MOTION to Compel Discovery , Deposition and Motion for Cost. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s))(Greenberg, Julie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 253 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re #252 filed by Pltf and Foseco, Inc. Foseco, Inc. terminated.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 6/5/19. (ao)
June 3, 2019 Filing 252 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foseco, Inc.. (McGarrity, Jennifer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 251 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION - Withdrawal and Entry of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Sean R. Riley terminated. Attorney Thomas Justin Chapman for Reunion Industries, Inc., added. (Chapman, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 250 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CBS Corporation. (McShea, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 249 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION - Withdrawal and Entry of Attorney Appearance. Attorney John A. Turlik terminated. Attorney Mark R. Kehoe for Weil-McLain, added. (Kehoe, Mark)
March 21, 2019 Filing 248 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Cagnoli, Joseph)
March 21, 2019 Filing 247 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with affirmative defenses and answer to all cross-claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Morgan Engineering.(Cagnoli, Joseph)
February 22, 2019 Filing 246 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 7/15/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 8/15/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 9/16/2019. Trial set for 11/18/2019. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 2/22/19. (ao)
February 8, 2019 Filing 245 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES,, CROSSCLAIM And Reply to Crossclaims against All Parties by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Jackson, Damian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 244 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Foster-Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent FOSTER WHEELER for Foster-Wheeler Corporation. (Valinis, Susan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 243 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by Foster-Wheeler Corporation.(Valinis, Susan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 242 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McCormick Asbestos Company.(Hanna, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 241 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer, Inc..(Hanna, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 240 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(McShea, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 239 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by HB Fuller Company(f/k/a Amchem Products, Inc. f/k/a Benjamin Foster).(Bobnak, George)
December 27, 2018 Filing 238 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Reading Crane & Engineering.(Gries, Alan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 237 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Corning, Inc..(Burke, Lauren)
December 21, 2018 Filing 236 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaim against All Defendants by Reunion Industries, Inc..(Riley, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 235 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by John Crane Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
December 21, 2018 Filing 234 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Greenberg, Julie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 233 ANSWER to #225 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company.(Flanigan, Lina)
December 21, 2018 Filing 232 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Flanigan, Lina)
December 21, 2018 Filing 231 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM , Answers to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by Foseco, Inc..(McGarrity, Jennifer)
December 21, 2018 Filing 230 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
December 21, 2018 Filing 229 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
December 21, 2018 Filing 228 AMENDED ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaim against All Defendants by Mobil Corporation(Parent of Mobil Oil Corporation). (Singley, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 227 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by CBS Corporation(a Deleware Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation).(McShea, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 226 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse TEC, CBS Corporation, Cooper Industries, Corning, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster-Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Imo Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.H. France Refractories Company, P&H Mining Equipment, Inc., Pneumo-Abex Corporation, Reunion Industries, Inc., Schneider Electric, Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Imo Industries Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
December 20, 2018 Filing 225 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Document Number #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross Claims and Certificate of Service against All Parties by Certainteed Corporation. (Fitzpatrick, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 224 ANSWER to Complaint Amended, CROSSCLAIM Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 223 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaims against All Defendants and Reply to Crossclaims), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Kiniry, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 222 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
December 19, 2018 Filing 221 ANSWER to Complaint Amended complaint (doc 207) with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Certificate of Service by Union Carbide Corporation.(Jasons, Catherine)
December 19, 2018 Filing 220 ANSWER to Complaint Amended complaint (doc 207) with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Certificate of Service by Bayer Cropscience, LP(as successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.).(Jasons, Catherine)
December 19, 2018 Filing 219 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Certificate of Service by Pneumo-Abex Corporation(successor-in-interest to ABEX Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation).(Jasons, Catherine)
December 19, 2018 Filing 218 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 217 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Co-Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc.(aaa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 216 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ferro Engineering(Division of ON Marine Services Company).(Mullaney, Theresa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance (Mullaney, Theresa)
December 18, 2018 Filing 214 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
December 18, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Theresa Mullaney can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 213 Defendant's ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM And Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Jackson, Damian)
December 17, 2018 Filing 212 Answer to Amended Complaint #207 Amended Complaint by Universal Refractories,. (Dugan, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 211 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Weil-McLain.(Turlik, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 210 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by Cleaver Brooks, Inc..(Valinis, Susan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 209 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) With AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
December 10, 2018 Filing 208 ANSWER to Complaint ((Amended) with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Clark Control, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
December 5, 2018 Filing 207 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Eisenhower(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Powell).(Duncan, Jason)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting Ford Company's #38 Motion to Dismiss and Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED. It is further ORDERED that Pltf may file an amended complaint, containing all of the necessary facts to support the specific legal theories advanced against each of the named Defts, no later than 12/5/18. Defts may file answers or motions to dismiss no later than 12/21/18.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/21/18 (ao)
November 20, 2018 Filing 204 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to A. Kai Seelaus.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/20/18. (aaa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 203 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by A. Kai Seelaus on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC Attorney Anne Kai Seelaus is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4604212., filed by on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC.(Seelaus, A.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 202 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew Ronald Sperl.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/19/18. (aaa)
November 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 201 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Duncan, Jason)
November 19, 2018 Filing 200 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew R. Sperl on behalf of Ford Motor Company Attorney Andrew Sperl is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4603464.. (Sperl, Andrew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 199 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Alyson Walker LotmanSigned by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 11/8/18. (ao)
November 8, 2018 Filing 198 Application for Admission to Practice in this Court . (Lotman, Alyson) ***Payment received 11/26/18 #111022978. Modified on 11/26/2018 (aaa).
October 24, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Andrisani on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Andrisani, Nathan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 196 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
October 3, 2018 Filing 195 ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation(as successor-in-interest to Clark Control, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SCHEDULING ORDER: AND NOW, this 2nd day of October, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court shall hear oral argument on Ford Motor Companys motion to dismiss (ECF No. 38) and shall hold a status and scheduling conference on Tuesday, November 20, 2018 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 15A, United States Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19106.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 10/2/18. (aaa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finch, Edward)
October 1, 2018 Filing 192 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Dennis F. Wolford.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/28/18. (aaa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 191 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Theresa M. Mullaney.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/28/18. (aaa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 190 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Edward T. Finch.Signed by Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/28/18. (aaa)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER OF DESIGNATION by the Third Circuit Court of Apppeals. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno of the ED of PA is hereby designated and assigned this matter. Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Honorable D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge U.S. Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 09/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Designation Letter)(jw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 188 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Theresa M Mullaney on behalf of Ferro Engineering(Division of ON Marine Services Company) Attorney Theresa Mullaney is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4549520., filed by on behalf of Ferro Engineering(Division of ON Marine Services Company).(Mullaney, Theresa)
September 18, 2018 Filing 187 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (O'Brien, Kevin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE of of Service by Reunion Industries, Inc. re #185 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim . (Riley, Sean)
September 13, 2018 Filing 185 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Reunion Industries, Inc..(Riley, Sean)
September 13, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 185. (rw)
September 11, 2018 Filing 184 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Reunion Industries, Inc.. (Riley, Sean)
September 5, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE by Reunion Industries, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Riley, Sean)
September 5, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Riley on behalf of Reunion Industries, Inc. (Riley, Sean)
August 24, 2018 Filing 181 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant, Columbus McKinnon Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) (Dower, Christine)
August 20, 2018 Filing 180 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Valinis, Susan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 179 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Foseco, Inc. by Foseco, Inc..(McGarrity, Jennifer)
August 15, 2018 Filing 178 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company.(Flanigan, Lina)
August 13, 2018 Filing 177 DISCLOSURE REPORT by John Crane, Inc. by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
August 10, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE by A.O. Smith Corporation of Initial Disclosures (Kadish, Eric)
August 8, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance (Dower, Christine)
August 8, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance (SIDELSKY, CORY)
August 3, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE of Service - The Okonite Company's 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE by Crane Company re Service Relating to 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Bruch, G. Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE of Service , filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
August 2, 2018 Filing 170 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Wolford, Dennis)
August 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Dennis Wolford and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Edward Finch, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Yvette Kane recused. The Clerk of Court shall reassign the above captioned case to another judge of this court. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/1/2018. (sc)
August 1, 2018 Filing 168 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Bobnak, George)
August 1, 2018 Filing 167 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. Attorney Dennis F. Wolford is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4502662.. (Wolford, Dennis)
August 1, 2018 Filing 166 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Wolford, Dennis)
August 1, 2018 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc. by Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc..(Wolford, Dennis)
August 1, 2018 Filing 164 Defendant CertainTeed Corporation ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM And Answers to Crossclaims against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Certainteed Corporation.(Fitzpatrick, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 163 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Edward T Finch on behalf of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation Attorney EDWARD FINCH is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4502309., filed by on behalf of GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation.(Finch, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Borelli on behalf of Weil-McLain (Borelli, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 161 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Fitzpatrick, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 160 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Fitzpatrick, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answers to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Fitzpatrick, John)
July 31, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance (Daugherty, Ronald)
July 31, 2018 Filing 157 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Foseco, Inc..(McGarrity, Jennifer)
July 31, 2018 Filing 156 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Cory C. Sidelsky.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/30/18. (dmn)
July 31, 2018 Filing 155 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christine P. Dower.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/30/18. (dmn)
July 30, 2018 Filing 154 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Jointly Submitted by John Crane, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
July 30, 2018 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Reading Crane & Engineering.(Gries, Alan)
July 30, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM emailed to Attorney Lina Flannigan (lg)
July 27, 2018 Filing 152 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Corning, Inc.. (O'Brien, Kevin)
July 27, 2018 Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company.(Flanigan, Lina)
July 27, 2018 Filing 150 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 149 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Flanigan, Lina)
July 27, 2018 Filing 148 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Certainteed Corporation. (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Certainteed Corporation (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Universal Refractories.(Dugan, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 145 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Universal Refractories. (Dugan, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Dugan on behalf of Universal Refractories (Dugan, John)
July 25, 2018 Filing 143 RESPONSE by Michael Eisenhower, Michael Eisenhower to #138 Order to Show Cause, . (Duncan, Jason)
July 25, 2018 Filing 142 DISCLOSURE REPORT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
July 25, 2018 Filing 141 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Cory Sidelsky is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4495455.. (SIDELSKY, CORY)
July 25, 2018 Filing 140 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) Attorney Christine Dower is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4495439.. (Dower, Christine)
July 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
July 20, 2018 Filing 139 CORNING INCORPORATED ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM AND NEW MATTER against All Defendants by Corning, Inc..(O'Brien, Kevin)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE:IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE, within seven (7) days of the date of the date of this Order, why Defendant Ford Motor Companys motion #38 to dismiss, should not be granted. See M.D. Pa. L.R. 7.6 (stating that any party who fails to timely file a brief in opposition shall be deemed not to oppose such motion). Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/18/18. (rw)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a Case Management Conference is set for 8/2/2018 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Yvette Kane. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. Counsel should be prepared to address any pending motions at the conference. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before July 30, 2018. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/15/18. (rw)
June 4, 2018 Filing 136 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jennifer McGarrity, Esq. on behalf of Foseco, Inc.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/4/18. (ma)
May 29, 2018 Filing 135 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Foster-Wheeler Corporation by Foster-Wheeler Corporation.(Valinis, Susan)
May 29, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES,, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by Foster-Wheeler Corporation.(Valinis, Susan)
May 29, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Lina C Flanigan on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company (Flanigan, Lina)
May 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 24, 2018 Filing 132 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Foseco, Inc. Attorney McGarrity is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4436872., filed by on behalf of Foseco, Inc..(Jenkins, Walter)
May 22, 2018 Filing 131 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Lina C. Flanigan, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/22/18. (rw)
May 15, 2018 Filing 130 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation Attorney Lina Flanigan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4427566., filed by on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Jenkins, Walter)
May 15, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 1, 2018 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Kiniry, William)
April 25, 2018 Filing 128 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Refractories, Aurora Pump Company, Bayer Cropscience, LP, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Cooper Industries, Crane Company, Eaton Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Foster-Wheeler Corporation, GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc., HB Fuller Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, P&H Mining Equipment, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc., Schneider Electric, Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Okonite Company, Universal Refractories, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain, Zurn Industries, LLC by Imo Industries Inc..(Fontak, Joseph)
April 23, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM mailed to Attroney Damien Jackson (lg)
April 20, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian S. Jackson on behalf of J.H. France Refractories Company. (ao)
April 19, 2018 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Crane, Inc. re #124 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Turner, Tiffany)
April 19, 2018 Filing 125 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smith's Group plc for John Crane, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
April 19, 2018 Filing 124 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
April 19, 2018 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against All Defendants by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
April 19, 2018 Filing 122 LETTER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/19/18. (dmn)
April 19, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 124. (pjr)
April 17, 2018 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES against All Defendants by Aurora Pump Company.(Hadden, James)
April 16, 2018 Filing 120 Certificate of Compliance filed by Cooper Industries. (Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 119 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 118 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.. (Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 117 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defeneses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by The Kerite Company.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by The Lincoln Electric Company.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM And Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Terex Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crosslcaims against All Defendants by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM And Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 109 ANSWER to #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cooper Industries.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 108 ANSWER to #60 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim WIth Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Eaton Corporation.(Depfer, Joan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 107 Defendant, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
April 16, 2018 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Jasons, Catherine)
April 16, 2018 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo-Abex Corporation(successor-in-interest to ABEX Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation).(Jasons, Catherine)
April 16, 2018 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bayer Cropscience, LP(as successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.).(Jasons, Catherine)
April 13, 2018 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer, Inc..(Hanna, Thomas)
April 13, 2018 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McCormick Asbestos Company.(Hanna, Thomas)
April 10, 2018 Filing 101 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by HB Fuller Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bobnak, George)
April 10, 2018 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Schneider Electric.(Reber, W.)
April 6, 2018 Filing 99 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kiniry, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Kiniry, Jr on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kiniry, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine)
April 6, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Jasons, Catherine)
April 6, 2018 Filing 95 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bayer Cropscience, LP(as successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP, Bayer Cropscience, LP. (Jasons, Catherine)
April 6, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, LP(as successor-in-interest to Amchem Products, Inc.) (Jasons, Catherine)
April 6, 2018 Filing 93 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pneumo-Abex Corporation(successor-in-interest to ABEX Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation). (Jasons, Catherine)
April 6, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Pneumo-Abex Corporation(successor-in-interest to ABEX Corporation, Subsidiary of M&F Worldwide Corporation) (Jasons, Catherine)
April 3, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. re #86 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) (Turner, Tiffany)
April 3, 2018 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #85 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) (Turner, Tiffany)
April 3, 2018 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. re #84 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Turner, Tiffany)
April 3, 2018 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #83 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Turner, Tiffany)
April 3, 2018 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses,, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc..(Depfer, Joan)
April 2, 2018 Filing 86 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
April 2, 2018 Filing 85 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Turner, Tiffany)
April 2, 2018 Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
April 2, 2018 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
April 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file certificates of service for Docs. 85 & 86. (pjr)
April 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file certificates of service for Docs. 83 & 84. (pjr)
March 30, 2018 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company. (Jenkins, Walter)
March 29, 2018 Filing 81 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cleaver Brooks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Valinis, Susan)
March 29, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cleaver Brooks, Inc..(Valinis, Susan)
March 29, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Valinis, Susan)
March 29, 2018 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by Honeywell International, Inc..(Neeson, Peter)
March 28, 2018 Filing 77 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Susan Valinis, Esq. on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/28/18. (ma)
March 28, 2018 Filing 76 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Catherine Jasons, Esq.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/28/18. (ma)
March 28, 2018 Filing 75 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Damian Jackson, Esq. on behalf of J.H. FranceSigned by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/28/18. (ma)
March 26, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company (Hanna, Thomas)
March 26, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Hanna, Thomas)
March 26, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Matthew Reber on behalf of Schneider Electric (Reber, W.)
March 26, 2018 Filing 71 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of J.H. France Refractories Company Attorney Damian Jackson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4377598.. (Valinis, Susan)
March 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 23, 2018 Filing 70 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Foster-Wheeler Corporation Attorney Susan Valinis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4376536.. (Valinis, Susan)
March 23, 2018 Filing 69 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Leah A Lewis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Attorney Leah Lewis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4376504.. (Lewis, Leah)
March 23, 2018 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaim and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS Corporation.(McShea, John)
March 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 22, 2018 Filing 67 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Susan M Valinis on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Attorney Susan Valinis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4375644.. (Valinis, Susan)
March 22, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. McMeekin, II on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (McMeekin, John)
March 22, 2018 Filing 65 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Matthew Reber, Esq. on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/21/18. (ma)
March 22, 2018 Filing 64 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Penelope O'Connell, Esq. on behalf of Foseco, Inc.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/21/18. (ma)
March 22, 2018 Filing 63 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Julie Greenberg, Esq. on behalf of Ford Motor Co.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/21/18. (ma)
March 22, 2018 Filing 62 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Daniel Bruch, Jr. Esq. on behalf of Crane Co. and Okonite Mfg. Co.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/21/18. (ma)
March 22, 2018 Filing 61 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas Hanna, Esq. on behalf of Pfizer and MCICSigned by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/21/18. (ma)
March 22, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to all Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Weil-McLain.(Turlik, John)
March 22, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Susan M. Valinis & Associate Counsel Tracey McDevitt Hagan- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
March 19, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. Bobnak on behalf of HB Fuller Company (Bobnak, George)
March 19, 2018 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (McMeekin, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 57 DISCLOSURE REPORT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McMeekin, John)
March 16, 2018 Filing 56 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company, The Okonite Company Attorney Peter Lejeune is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4369508.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 16, 2018 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Neeson, Peter)
March 16, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cagnoli, Jr on behalf of Morgan Engineering (Cagnoli, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Neeson, Peter)
March 16, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 15, 2018 Filing 52 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company, The Okonite Company Attorney G. Daniel Bruch, Jr. is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4368950.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 51 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Crane Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Okonite Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 49 The Okonite Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by The Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of The Okonite Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 47 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
March 15, 2018 Filing 45 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company, Pfizer, Inc. Attorney Thomas Hanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4368251., filed by on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company, Pfizer, Inc..(Hanna, Thomas)
March 15, 2018 Filing 44 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David J. Singley, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/15/18. (rw)
March 15, 2018 Filing 43 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter J. Neeson, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/15/18. (rw)
March 15, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 14, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Nonconcurrence by Ford Motor Company re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Greenberg, Julie)
March 14, 2018 Filing 41 Proposed Pretrial Order re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Caffrey, Sharon)
March 14, 2018 Filing 40 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Julie S Greenberg on behalf of Ford Motor Company Attorney Julie Greenberg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4367241.. (Greenberg, Julie)
March 14, 2018 Filing 39 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Caffrey, Sharon)
March 14, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ford Motor Company.(Caffrey, Sharon)
March 14, 2018 Filing 37 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ford Motor Company. (Caffrey, Sharon)
March 14, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L Caffrey on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Caffrey, Sharon)
March 14, 2018 Filing 35 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by W. Matthew Reber on behalf of Schneider Electric Attorney W. Reber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4366688.. (Reber, W.)
March 14, 2018 Filing 34 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Foseco, Inc. Attorney Penelope O'Connell is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4366389.. (Jenkins, Walter)
March 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Penelope O'Connell and Associate Counsel Walter Jenkins - bar status verified. (dmn)
March 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner W. Matthew Reber and Associate Counsel Christina Rideout - bar status verified. (dmn)
March 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a Proposed Order and a Certificate of Concurrence-NonConcurrence for Doc. 38. (dmn)
March 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Julie Stanier Greenberg and Associate Counsel Sharon Caffrey - bar status verified. (dmn)
March 13, 2018 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Fontak, Joseph)
March 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph I. Fontak on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Fontak, Joseph)
March 12, 2018 Filing 31 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, LP, Pneumo-Abex Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation Attorney Catherine N. Jasons is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4363503.. (Jasons, Catherine)
March 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 9, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company (Jenkins, Walter)
March 9, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Jenkins, Walter)
March 9, 2018 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Kadish, Eric)
March 9, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Kadish on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Kadish, Eric)
March 9, 2018 Filing 26 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Attorney Peter Neeson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4361389.. (Neeson, Peter)
March 9, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P&H Mining Equipment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Komatsu America Corporation for P&H Mining Equipment, Inc... (Depfer, Joan)
March 9, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of P&H Mining Equipment, Inc. (Depfer, Joan)
March 9, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott F. Griffith on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Griffith, Scott)
March 7, 2018 Filing 22 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David J. Singley on behalf of Mobil Corporation Attorney David Singley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4359494.. (Singley, David)
March 7, 2018 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Mobil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation for Mobil Corporation, Mobil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Singley, David)
March 7, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Mobil Corporation.(Singley, David)
March 7, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Singley & Associate Counsel Zeszutek - Bar Status Verified. (ve)
March 5, 2018 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pfizer, Inc.. (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by McCormick Asbestos Company. (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of McCormick Asbestos Company (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schneider Electric. (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Schneider Electric (Rideout, Christina)
March 5, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Weil-McLain identifying Corporate Parent Marley-Wylain Company, LLC for Weil-McLain. (Turlik, John)
March 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Turlik on behalf of Weil-McLain (Turlik, John)
March 2, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Reading Crane & Engineering. (Gries, Alan)
March 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Gries on behalf of Reading Crane & Engineering (Gries, Alan)
March 2, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney A. Kai Seelaus (lg)
March 1, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Foseco, Inc.. (Jenkins, Walter)
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter S. Jenkins on behalf of Foseco, Inc. (Jenkins, Walter)
March 1, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Aurora Pump Company. (Hadden, James)
March 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Hadden on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Hadden, James)
March 1, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Borgwarner Morse TEC. (Seelaus, A.)
March 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Kai Seelaus on behalf of Borgwarner Morse TEC (Seelaus, A.)
March 1, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile documents 6 & 7 using the correct event. Document 6 appears to be a 'Response' this event can be found under Other Documents. Document 7 appears to be an 'Entry of Appearance' which can also be located under Responses and Replies. (aaa)
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Electric Company. (McShea, John)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CBS Corporation. (McShea, John)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CV-323-AS. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4346767), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Caption, #3 Defendant & Counesl List, #4 Exhibit(s) A, #5 B, #6 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 1a, #7 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 1b, #8 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 1c, #9 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 1d, #10 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 2a, #11 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 2b, #12 C-Sargent Aff with Exs Pt 2c, #13 D-Forman Aff with Exs Pt 1a, #14 D-Forman Aff with Exs Pt 1b, #15 D-Forman Aff with Exs Pt 1c, #16 D-Forman Aff with Exs Pt 2a, #17 D-Forman Aff with Exs Pt 2b, #18 E-DCCP NOR)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisenhower v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher N Santoro
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Susan M Valinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC
Represented By: A. Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Leah A Lewis
Represented By: Susan M Valinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer A McGarrity
Represented By: Lina C Flanigan
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Refractories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Julie S Greenberg
Represented By: Alyson W Lotman
Represented By: Andrew R. Sperl
Represented By: Sharon L Caffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Mark R. Kehoe
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Okonite Company
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Engineering
Represented By: Joseph Cagnoli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Represented By: John M. Borelli
Represented By: Mark R. Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Eric J Kadish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: James P. Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reunion Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Represented By: Thomas Justin Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Neeson
Represented By: Scott F. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Represented By: John C McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A McGarrity
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kerite Company
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo-Abex Corporation
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: Edward T Finch
Represented By: Michele N Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, LP
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering
Represented By: Theresa M Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&H Mining Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. France Refractories Company
Represented By: Damian S Jackson
Represented By: Susan M Valinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HB Fuller Company
Represented By: George S. Bobnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmont Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Refractories
Represented By: John J. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer A McGarrity
Represented By: William F. Kiniry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Asbestos Company
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J Ryan, Jr.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading Crane & Engineering
Represented By: Alan R. Gries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan J Andrisani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric
Represented By: W. Matthew Reber
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph I. Fontak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Represented By: C. James Zeszutek
Represented By: David J. Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rockbestos Wire & Cable Company
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rockbestos Company
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Suprenant Corp.
Represented By: Tiffany J. Giangiulio
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Represented By: Tiffany J Giangiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company
Represented By: Jennifer A McGarrity
Represented By: Lina C Flanigan
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Machines
Represented By: Sean R. Riley
Represented By: Thomas Justin Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Packing Company
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John A. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeler Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company
Represented By: Walter S. Jenkins
Represented By: Lina C Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PH Mining Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries Inc.
Represented By: Joseph I. Fontak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J O'Brien
Represented By: Lauren E Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eisenhower
Represented By: Jason B. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?