Hesse et al v. Albany Medical Center Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Donald Hesse and Agnes Hesse
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Livanova PLC, Sorin Group USA, Inc. and Albany Medical Center Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv01379
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case is associated with Master MDL 2816 - assigned in our court at 1:18-MD-2816. (ve)
July 12, 2018 11 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00744 containing electronic documents. (ve)
July 12, 2018 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order 14 - Opposition period has expired with no objections filed; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Middle District of Pennsylvania for inclusion into MDL-2816 Sorin 3T Heater-Cooler System Products Liability Litigation (No. II). Case to be assigned to the Hon. John E. Jones, III, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 10, 2018 9 Letter Motion from Michael D. Shalhoub for Sorin Group USA, Inc. requesting Transfer Case to MDL submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Conditional Transfer Order)(Shalhoub, Michael) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 9, 2018 8 Letter Motion from Michael D. Shalhoub for Sorin Group USA, Inc. requesting MDL transfer submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Shalhoub, Michael) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
July 9, 2018 7 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is scheduled for July 26, 2018 at 10:30 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before July 19, 2018. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/9/2018. (mab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 26, 2018 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH and Sorin Group USA, Inc.; Attorney M. Joseph Winebrenner. Phone number is 612-766-7000. Admissions due by 7/11/2018. {Admission letter mailed to counsel on 6/27/2018} (see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 26, 2018 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/26/2018 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/19/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 25, 2018 4 State Court ANSWER to Complaint by Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH and Sorin Group USA, Inc.(see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 25, 2018 3 State Court ANSWER to Complaint by Albany Medical Center Hospital.(see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 25, 2018 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]
June 25, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Saratoga County, case number 20171793 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4427848) filed by Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH and Sorin Group USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Proof of Service as to Sorin Group USA, Inc., #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court Waiver of Service upon Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH and Sorin Group USA, Inc., #4 Exhibit(s) D - State Court Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to CPLR 3217 as to Livanova PLC, #5 Exhibit(s) E - State Court Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Albany Medical Center Hospital, #6 Exhibit(s) F(a) - State Court Answer by Albany Medical Center Hospital, #7 Exhibit(s) F(b) - State Court Answer of Sorin Group Deutschland GmbH and Sorin Group USA, Inc., #8 Exhibit(s) F(c) - State Court Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #9 Exhibit(s) F(d) - State Court Request for Judicial Intervention, #10 Exhibit(s) F(e) - State Court Order Granting Pro Hac Admission, #11 Exhibit(s) F(f) - State Court Notice of Medical, Dental or Podiatric Malpractice Action, #12 Exhibit(s) F(g) - State Court Notice of Entry of Enclosed Decision & Order of the Honorable Thomas D. Nolan, #13 Exhibit(s) F(h) - State Court Stipulated Scheduling Order, #14 Certificate of Service, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hesse et al v. Albany Medical Center Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanova PLC
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Shalhoub
Represented By: Lisa Marie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Medical Center Hospital
Represented By: Randall J. Ezick
Represented By: Richard R. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hesse
Represented By: Ryan M. Finn
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Hesse
Represented By: Ryan M. Finn
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?