Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds v. Control Temp Insulation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds
Defendant: Robert Erhlacher and Control Temp Insulation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01706
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Defendants, Control Temp Insulation, LLC and RobertErhlacher, shall file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint (Document No. 1) on or before Monday,November 4, 2018. (eo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to File a Response, by Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2018 10:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized when selecting a trial term (eo)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Ezra Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Samuel)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Control Temp Insulation, LLC, Robert Erhlacher and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Control Temp Insulation, LLC, Robert Erhlacher ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4528068), filed by Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds v. Control Temp Insulation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Insulators Local No. 23 Annuity, Pension, and Health and Welfare Funds
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Erhlacher
Represented By: Samuel Ezra Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Control Temp Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Ezra Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?