Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01876
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 AO 121 sent to Register of Copyrights with Copy of Notice and Docket Sheet. (aaa)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bonekemper, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/9/18 (ve)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Bonekemper, Andrew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order)(Bonekemper, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/2/18. (ve)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bonekemper, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane (jw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 AO121 sent to Register of Copyrights with copy of Complaint and Docket Sheet. (aaa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4551974), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Bonekemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?