Gottfried v. Project Republic Today, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Seth Gottfried
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Project Republic Today, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01882
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving joint stipulation #8 to ext time for defts to respond to complaint until 12/3/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/23/18. (ki)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 APPROVED (per 11/23/18 order #9 of court) - STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extension to answer time by Seth Gottfried, filed by Seth Gottfried. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Seth Gottfried.(Basria, Saba) Modified on 11/23/2018 (ki).
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Seth Gottfried. All Defendants. (Yerger, Sarah)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Saba A. Basria, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/18. (ki)
September 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for petitioner and local counsel. (rw)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/26/18. (ki)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Saba A. Basria on behalf of Seth Gottfried. Attorney Saba A. Basria is seeking special admission. (rw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Copyright report sent to Register of Copyrights. (rw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Project Republic Today, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Project Republic Today, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4552140), filed by Seth Gottfried. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B) (rw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottfried v. Project Republic Today, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Republic Today, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Gottfried
Represented By: Sarah C. Yerger
Represented By: Saba A Basria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?