Schuster v. LivaNova, PLC et al

Plaintiff: Debra Schuster
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA Inc. and Livanova PLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01901
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH, Sorin Group USA Inc., filed by Debra Schuster.(dmn)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/19/18. (dmn)
October 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a Proposed Order for Doc. 14. Do not refile the Motion. (dmn)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Debra Schuster.(Reilly, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Debra Schuster. (Reilly, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Debra Schuster. Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Reilly, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Debra Schuster. Sorin Group USA Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Reilly, Michael)
September 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case is associated with Master MDL 2816 - assigned in our court at 1:18-MD-2816. (dmn)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred electronically in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:18-cv-01446 containing electronic documents. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District of Pennsylvania Middle. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, MDL Panel. Signed by Clerk on 09/24/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *LivaNova, PLC, Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sorin Group USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Debra Schuster, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Debra Schuster, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2018. Discovery due by 2/26/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Paradisi on behalf of Debra Schuster (Paradisi, Matthew) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Reilly, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4948059.), filed by Debra Schuster.(Reilly, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/28/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuster v. LivaNova, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Schuster
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Represented By: Matthew D Paradisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanova PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?