Green v. Pan et al
Plaintiff: Lorraine Green
Defendant: Gayle B. Ryan, United States of America, Department of Veterans Affairs and Ming Pan
Case Number: 1:2018cv01962
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting motion #9 to continue case mgmt conference - Initial Case Management Conference cont'd from 11/27/18 TO 1/22/2019 @ 10:00 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/20/18 (ki)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Euliss, Richard)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JOINT) by United States of America. (Euliss, Richard)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER RESCHEDULING Initial Case Management Conference from 11/13/18 TO 11/27/2018 @ 1:30 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/31/18. (ki)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 11/14/2018 @ 10:15 AM - placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of counsel for plaintiff(s). (See order for complet details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/16/18. (ki)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Court of Common Pleas of Lebanon County. (pjr)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States of America. (Euliss, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting defts' motion #2 to subsitute parties & amend caption, dismissing defts M. Pan, G. Ryan, Dept of Veterans Affairs & substituting USA as sole remaining party deft w/ Clrk of Ct to amend caption. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/11/18. (ki)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION substitute parties and amend caption by The United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Euliss, Richard)
October 11, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Rolf Patberg and Cynthia O'Donnell can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The United States Of America from Court of Common Pleas of Lebanon County, case number 2018-00908. () filed by The United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Pan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D Euliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Green
Represented By: Rolf Louis Patberg
Represented By: Cynthia O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?