Braxton v. Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yvette K. Braxton
Defendant: Ulta Beauty Cosmetics, LLC and Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01981
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2018 6 Featured Case STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint until 12/17/18 #5 , approved by the court. (See stip/order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/13/18. (ki)
November 12, 2018 5 APPROVED (per 11/13/18 order #6 of court) - STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Ulta Beauty Cosmetics, LLC, Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.. (Bocchinfuso, Jessica) Modified on 11/13/2018 (ki).
November 3, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Danielle Hijac on 10/26/18, filed by Yvette K. Braxton. (Pollins, Scott)
October 15, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM emailed to Attorney Susan Pickford (lg)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/15/18. (ki)
October 12, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Ulta Beauty Cosmetics, LLC, Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Ulta Beauty Cosmetics, LLC, Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4569784) filed by Yvette K. Braxton.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Beauty Cosmetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette K. Braxton
Represented By: Scott M. Pollins
Represented By: Susan K. Pickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?